NOVA v. JONES et al
Plaintiff: TONY E NOVA
Defendant: JANE DOE, TWO UNKNOWN STATE CLASSIFICATION OFFICERS, C. Greene, P HERON, Gomez, KENNETH S STEELY, JOHN DOE, ONE UNKNOWN CLASSFICATION SUPERVISOR SUWANNEE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, UNKNOWN OFFICER, Julie L. Jones, ONE UNKNOWN CHAIRPERSON OF SOUTH BAY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY CLASSIFICATION TEAM, ONE UNKNOWN CLASSIFICATION OFFICER SUWANNEE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, UNKNOWN CLASSIFICATION OFFICER and HARRISON
Case Number: 1:2019cv21668
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
April 30, 2019 Filing 16 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jua)
April 30, 2019 Filing 15 Case transferred in from Florida Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00250. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR TRANSFER - The #13 report and recommendation is accepted and adopted as the court's opinion. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, Miami Division. The clerk must take all steps necessary to effect the transfer. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 4/29/2019. (cle)
April 25, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed re: #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The deadline to file Objections to the R&R has expired. No Objections have been filed. (cle)
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - re #12 Third Amended Complaint. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, Miami Division, for all further proceedings. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 3/26/2019. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 4/23/2019. (cle)
March 15, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #12 Amended Complaint. (rcb)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against HARRISON, P HERON, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, filed by TONY E NOVA. (rcb)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - re: #10 Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form so Plaintiff can file a third amended complaint. Plaintiff shall have until 3/11/2019, to file a third amended civil rights complaint. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's third amended complaint or no later than 3/11/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 2/11/2019. (cle) *** 1983 Complaint Form sent to the Plaintiff as directed. ***
October 23, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed re: #10 Amended Complaint. (cle)
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against C GREENE, P HERON, ONE UNKNOWN CHAIRPERSON OF SOUTH BAY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY CLASSIFICATION TEAM, ONE UNKNOWN CLASSIFICATION OFFICER SUWANNEE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, and UNKNOWN OFFICER, filed by TONY E NOVA. (cle)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form so Plaintiff can file a second amended complaint. Plaintiff shall have until 11/6/2018, to file a second amended civil rights complaint. Plaintiff's motion for an enlargement of time, ECF No. #6 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel, ECF No. #8 , is DENIED. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's amended complaint or no later than 11/6/2018. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 10/3/2018. (cle) *** 1983 Complaint Form sent to Plaintiff as directed. ***
August 1, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed re: #7 Amended Complaint and #8 MOTION For Appointment of Counsel. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (cle)
July 30, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by TONY E NOVA. (cle)
July 30, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GOMEZ, C GREENE, P HERON, JULIE L JONES, ONE UNKNOWN CHAIRPERSON OF SOUTH BAY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY CLASSIFICATION TEAM, ONE UNKNOWN CLASSFICATION SUPERVISOR SUWANNEE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, ONE UNKNOWN CLASSIFICATION OFFICER SUWANNEE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, UNKNOWN CLASSIFICATION OFFICER, filed by TONY E NOVA. (cle)
July 11, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed re: #6 MOTION for Enlargement of Time. (cle)
July 9, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Enlargement of Time, filed by TONY E NOVA. (cle)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - re: #1 Complaint. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form so that Plaintiff can file the amended complaint. Plaintiff shall have until 7/26/2018, to file an amended civil rights complaint. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's amended complaint or no later than 7/26/2018. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 6/26/2018. (cle) *** 1983 Complaint Form sent to Plaintiff as directed. ***
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS - Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff is not required to pay an initial partial filing fee. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order with appropriate cover letter, to the Department of Corrections. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 6/22/2018. (vkm)***ORDER MAILED TO DOC AS DIRECTED***
May 23, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed re: #1 Complaint and #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (cle)
May 23, 2018 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se. (cle)
May 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by TONY E NOVA. (cle)
May 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HARRISON, P HERON, JULIE L JONES, ONE UNKNOWN CHAIRPERSON OF SOUTH BAY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY CLASSIFICATION TEAM, ONE UNKNOWN CLASSIFICATION SUPERVISOR SUWANNEE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, ONE UNKNOWN CLASSIFICATION OFFICER SUWANNEE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, KENNETH S STEELY, and TWO UNKNOWN STATE CLASSIFICATION OFFICERS, filed by TONY E NOVA. (cle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NOVA v. JONES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWO UNKNOWN STATE CLASSIFICATION OFFICERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P HERON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH S STEELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE UNKNOWN CLASSFICATION SUPERVISOR SUWANNEE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN OFFICER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE UNKNOWN CHAIRPERSON OF SOUTH BAY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY CLASSIFICATION TEAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE UNKNOWN CLASSIFICATION OFFICER SUWANNEE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN CLASSIFICATION OFFICER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONY E NOVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?