Smith v. Baptist Health South Florida, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eric Smith
Defendant: Baptist Health South Florida, Inc., Boca Raton Regional Hospital, Inc. and Gastro Health LLC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv25196
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eric Smith. Gastro Health LLC. served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/18/2020 (ls)
January 31, 2020 Filing 17 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Partial Filing Fee received on 1/31/2020 in the amount of $ 100.00, receipt number FLS100202614. (vt)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report due by 3/6/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
January 30, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eric Smith. Gastro Health LLC. served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (ls)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Service of Summons by United States Marshal Service. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls) (ls)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Service of Summons by United States Marshal Service. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
January 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server by Eric Smith. Responses due by 1/29/2020 (ls)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Plaintiff shall perfect service by 3/17/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Parties - NONE disclosed by Eric Smith (jas)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Baptist Health South Florida, Inc., Boca Raton Regional Hospital, Inc., Gastro Health LLC.. (jas)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Volunteer Attorney Program. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/19/2019. See DE #6 for full details. (ls)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Monthly installments of $100.00 due 1/30/2020, 2/28/2020, 3/30/2020 and 4/30/2020; granting #4 Motion for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Eric Smith to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: easmith.fl@gmail.com (cds)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Eric Smith. (cds)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Smith. (cds)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baptist Health South Florida, Inc., Boca Raton Regional Hospital, Inc., Gastro Health LLC.. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Eric Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Baptist Health South Florida, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Health South Florida, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boca Raton Regional Hospital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gastro Health LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?