United States Of America v. RAPOWER-3 LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Gregory Shepard, RAPOWER-3 LLC, International Automated Systems, Inc., Neldon Johnson, LTB1 LLC and Roger Freeborn
Case Number: 1:2019mc24256
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:0754
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 10/16/2019 in the amount of $ 47.00, receipt number FLS100196396. (vt)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Jonathan O. Hafen, Jeffrey A. Balls, Michael S. Lehr, John K. Mangum, Erin Healy Gallagher, Erin R. Hines, Christopher R Moran, mailing date October 16, 2019, (pt)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jao)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. (jao)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Order (Complaint) for Appointment of Receiver. Filing fee $ 47.00 (Not Paid), filed by Neldon Johnson, International Automated Systems, Inc., Roger Freeborn, RAPOWER-3 LLC, Wayne Klein, LTB1 LLC, Gregory Shepard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Other Court Documents)(jao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. RAPOWER-3 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Shepard
Represented By: Michael S. Lehr
Represented By: Jonathan O. Hafen
Represented By: Jeffery A. Balls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAPOWER-3 LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Lehr
Represented By: Jonathan O. Hafen
Represented By: Jeffery A. Balls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Automated Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S. Lehr
Represented By: Jonathan O. Hafen
Represented By: Jeffery A. Balls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neldon Johnson
Represented By: Michael S. Lehr
Represented By: Jonathan O. Hafen
Represented By: Jeffery A. Balls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTB1 LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Lehr
Represented By: Jonathan O. Hafen
Represented By: Jeffery A. Balls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Freeborn
Represented By: Michael S. Lehr
Represented By: Jonathan O. Hafen
Represented By: Jeffery A. Balls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Christopher Robert Moran
Represented By: John K. Mangum
Represented By: Erin R. Hines
Represented By: Erin Healy Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?