Golden et al v. Faro Boat Lifts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Golden Manufacturing, Inc. and William Golden
Defendant: Faro Boat Lifts, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv20889
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Anthony R. Zeuli.. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 3, 2020 Filing 8 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Anthony R. Zeuli. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12695831 by William Golden, Golden Manufacturing, Inc.. Responses due by 4/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischer, Ury)
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Faro Boat Lifts, Inc.. Attorney Ernesto Segundo Medina added to party Faro Boat Lifts, Inc.(pty:dft). (Medina, Ernesto)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Golden Manufacturing, Inc. (Fischer, Ury)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by William Golden, Golden Manufacturing, Inc.. Faro Boat Lifts, Inc. served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. (Fischer, Ury)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Faro Boat Lifts, Inc.. (jas)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (jas)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Faro Boat Lifts, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12528411, filed by William Golden, Golden Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Fischer, Ury)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden et al v. Faro Boat Lifts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Ury Fischer
Represented By: Anthony R. Zeuli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Golden
Represented By: Ury Fischer
Represented By: Anthony R. Zeuli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faro Boat Lifts, Inc.
Represented By: Ernesto Segundo Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?