CENTENNIAL BANK v. JACOBSON et al
Plaintiff: CENTENNIAL BANK
Defendant: REMY JACOBSON, JEAN MARC JACOBSON and VANESSA V JACOBSON
Case Number: 1:2020cv22104
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to JEAN MARC JACOBSON by CENTENNIAL BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service)(Carpenter, James)
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by REMY JACOBSON, VANESSA V JACOBSON. Attorney Joseph Hyam Serota added to party REMY JACOBSON(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Hyam Serota added to party VANESSA V JACOBSON(pty:dft). Responses due by 7/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Note, #2 Exhibit Mortgage)(Serota, Joseph)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. (Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2020 at 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 6/26/2020). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Reissued as to JEAN MARC JACOBSON, REMY JACOBSON, VANESSA V JACOBSON. (mc)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Alias Summonses by CENTENNIAL BANK re #3 Summons Issued (Carpenter, James)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JEAN MARC JACOBSON, REMY JACOBSON, VANESSA V JACOBSON. (jbs)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JEAN MARC JACOBSON, REMY JACOBSON, VANESSA V JACOBSON. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-AFLSDC-12911981, payment transferred from : 20CV22102, filed by CENTENNIAL BANK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit EXHIBITS A-G, #3 Summon(s))(Carpenter, James) Modified text on 6/4/2020 to reflect correct case number re payment transferred from (bb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTENNIAL BANK v. JACOBSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REMY JACOBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEAN MARC JACOBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANESSA V JACOBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTENNIAL BANK
Represented By: Thomas Peter Angelo
Represented By: James Whitcomb Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?