May v. United States Of America
Plaintiff: Victor May
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv23422
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 PAPERLESS Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/26/2020. (br)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Adopting #4 Report and Recommendations. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling. Movant's Motion under 28 U.S.C. [Section] 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody [ECF No. 1] is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case, and any pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2255 case re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Victor May; Recommending that this case be DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction as an unauthorized successive 2255 motion, and the case CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 9/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Form) (br)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra Chase on behalf of United States Of America. Attorney Alexandra Chase added to party United States Of America(pty:dft). (Chase, Alexandra)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (pcs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 12-cr-20719), filed by Victor May.(pcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: May v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Alexandra Chase
Represented By: Noticing 2255 US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?