De Rivas v. United States Army et al.,
Plaintiff: Gloria De Rivas
Defendant: United States Army and United States of America, United States Of America and United States Army
Case Number: 1:2020cv23717
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:0134
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 12 Clerks Notice to Filer re #10 Certificate of Service,. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see d.e. 11 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. It is not necessary to refile this document. (mee)
October 29, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Gloria De Rivas. United States Army served on 10/26/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. See d.e. #10 for image. (mee)
October 29, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gloria De Rivas (Weisberg, Michael)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to United States Army.(mee)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to United States Of America. (mee)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Answer to Complaint,. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [ 6 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es). It is not necessary to refile this document. (mee)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Gloria De Rivas. See d.e. #5 . for image. (mee)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Gloria De Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(Weisberg, Michael)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwing G. Torres for all discovery disputes and non-dispositive pretrial motions. Notice of Court Practice. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (mee)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 20cv23717 against United States Army and United States of America. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13471615, filed by Gloria De Rivas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Exhibit)(Weisberg, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Rivas v. United States Army et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army and United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria De Rivas
Represented By: Michael Peter Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?