Grupo Unidos Por El del Canal, S.A. et al v. Autoridad del Canal de Panama
Plaintiff: Webuild, S.p.A., Sacyr, S.A., Jan De Nul, N.V. and Grupo Unidos por el Canal, S.A.
Defendant: Autoridad del Canal de Panama
Case Number: 1:2020cv24867
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Donald L Graham
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Grupo Unidos por el Canal, S.A., Jan De Nul, N.V., Sacyr, S.A., Webuild, S.p.A. re #24 EXPEDITED MOTION for Reconsideration of Order on Motion for Alternative Service re #23 Order on Expedited Motion, filed by Sacyr, S.A., Jan De Nul, N.V., Grupo Unidos por el Canal, S.A., Webuild, S.p.A. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lamm, Carolyn)
December 24, 2020 Filing 24 EXPEDITED MOTION for Reconsideration of Order on Motion for Alternative Service re #23 Order on Expedited Motion, by Grupo Unidos por el Canal, S.A., Jan De Nul, N.V., Sacyr, S.A., Webuild, S.p.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Annex A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamm, Carolyn)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order on Expedited Motion for Alternative Service,denying #22 Expedited Motion EXPEDITED MOTION For Alternative Service and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
December 16, 2020 Filing 22 EXPEDITED MOTION For Alternative Service and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Grupo Unidos por el Canal, S.A., Jan De Nul, N.V., Sacyr, S.A., Webuild, S.p.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamm, Carolyn)
December 16, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service Abroad/International Service by Jan De Nul, N.V., Grupo Unidos por el Canal, S.A., Webuild, S.p.A., Sacyr, S.A.. Autoridad del Canal de Panama served on 12/9/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lamm, Carolyn)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER: granting Plaintiffs' motions to appear pro hac vice. #18 #19 . Attorneys Hansel T. Pham and Matthew N. Drossos are given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Plaintiffs. The Clerk is directed to provide the attorneys with notification of all electronic filings via the email addresses set forth in the motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sda)
December 15, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Matthew N. Drossos. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14038692 by Grupo Unidos por el Canal, S.A., Jan De Nul, N.V., Sacyr, S.A., Webuild, S.p.A.. Responses due by 12/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beguiristain, Maria)
December 15, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Hansel T. Pham. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14038607 by Grupo Unidos por el Canal, S.A., Jan De Nul, N.V., Sacyr, S.A., Webuild, S.p.A.. Responses due by 12/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beguiristain, Maria)
December 7, 2020 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT Regarding Service of Process by Grupo Unidos por el Canal, S.A., Jan De Nul, N.V., Sacyr, S.A., Webuild, S.p.A. (Lamm, Carolyn)
December 7, 2020 Filing 16 Clerk's NOTICE of International Services re Employer's Representative by Grupo Unidos por el Canal, S.A., Jan De Nul, N.V., Sacyr, S.A., Webuild, S.p.A. (mee)
December 7, 2020 Filing 15 Clerk's NOTICE of International Services by Grupo Unidos por el Canal, S.A., Jan De Nul, N.V., Sacyr, S.A., Webuild, S.p.A. (mee)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER: granting Plaintiffs' motion to appear pro hac vice. #13 . Attorney Luke A. Sobota is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Plaintiffs. The Clerk is directed to provide the attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sda)
December 7, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Luke A. Sobota. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13988705 by Grupo Unidos por el Canal, S.A., Jan De Nul, N.V., Sacyr, S.A., Webuild, S.p.A.. Responses due by 12/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamm, Carolyn)
December 4, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #11 ORDER granting #8 Motion For Courts Seal and Signature On Form Requesting Service of Summons and Petition Abroad. See attached document for full details. (pes)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion For Courts Seal and Signature On Form Requesting Service of Summons and Petition Abroad. The Court directs the Clerk to sign and seal the forms at pages 2 and 5, which are attached to the movants' motion as ECF No. 8-1, and ECF No. 8-2. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Donald L. Graham recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 12/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Autoridad del Canal de Panama, Mr. Jorge Fernndez, Panama Canal Authority (Autoridad del Canal de Panam)(mee)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Court's Seal and Signature on Form Requesting Service of Summons and Petition Abroad Under the Inter-American Convention on Letters Rogatory and Additional Protocol by Grupo Unidos por el Canal, S.A., Jan De Nul, N.V., Sacyr, S.A., Webuild, S.p.A.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamm, Carolyn) Modified Event on 11/30/2020 (nc).
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grupo Unidos por el Canal, S.A., Jan De Nul, N.V., Sacyr, S.A., Webuild, S.p.A. (Lamm, Carolyn)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT signed by: Declaration of Nicolas Bouchardie re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award, by Grupo Unidos por el Canal, S.A., Jan De Nul, N.V., Sacyr, S.A., Webuild, S.p.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62, #64 Exhibit 63, #65 Exhibit 64, #66 Exhibit 65, #67 Exhibit 66, #68 Exhibit 67, #69 Exhibit 68, #70 Exhibit 69, #71 Exhibit 70, #72 Exhibit 71, #73 Exhibit 72, #74 Exhibit 73, #75 Exhibit 74, #76 Exhibit 75, #77 Exhibit 76, #78 Exhibit 77)(Lamm, Carolyn)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Grupo Unidos por el Canal, S.A., Jan De Nul, N.V., Sacyr, S.A., Webuild, S.p.A. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Lamm, Carolyn)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Luke A. Sobota, mailing date November 25, 2020. (cw)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - one address per summons. (mee)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Donald L. Graham. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate Partial Arbitration Award. Filing fee $400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13928895, filed by Jan De Nul, N.V., Grupo Unidos del Canal, S.A., Webuild, S.p.A., Sacyr, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Lamm, Carolyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grupo Unidos Por El del Canal, S.A. et al v. Autoridad del Canal de Panama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Webuild, S.p.A.
Represented By: Carolyn Beth Lamm
Represented By: Luke A. Sobota
Represented By: Maria Josefa Beguiristain
Represented By: Matthew N. Drossos
Represented By: Hansel T. Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sacyr, S.A.
Represented By: Carolyn Beth Lamm
Represented By: Luke A. Sobota
Represented By: Maria Josefa Beguiristain
Represented By: Matthew N. Drossos
Represented By: Hansel T. Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan De Nul, N.V.
Represented By: Carolyn Beth Lamm
Represented By: Luke A. Sobota
Represented By: Maria Josefa Beguiristain
Represented By: Matthew N. Drossos
Represented By: Hansel T. Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grupo Unidos por el Canal, S.A.
Represented By: Carolyn Beth Lamm
Represented By: Luke A. Sobota
Represented By: Maria Josefa Beguiristain
Represented By: Matthew N. Drossos
Represented By: Hansel T. Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autoridad del Canal de Panama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?