Palacios v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Ana Palacios
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Hector Romero and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP doing business as WALMART SUPER CENTER #2814
Case Number: 1:2022cv23628
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION: Mediation Hearing set for 4/3/2023 at 9:00 AM before Rodney Romano via Zoom video conference Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/29/2022. See attached document for full details. (mab)
December 29, 2022 Filing 22 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Plaintiff and Defendant Selected/Added Rodney Romano as Mediator. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation)(Dixon, Robert)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. THIS CAUSE is before the Court upon a sua sponte review of the record. On November 30, 2022, the Court ordered the parties to select a mediator pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, schedule a time, date and place for mediation, and jointly file a proposed order scheduling mediation on or before December 21, 2022. ECF No. #17 (the "Scheduling Order"). To date, the parties have not complied, nor have they shown cause. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that on or before December 28, 2022, the parties shall comply with the requirements of the Scheduling Order, and jointly file a proposed order scheduling mediation. Failure to comply will result in sanctions, including, but not limited to, dismissal without prejudice without further notice. The parties are reminded that pursuant to the procedures outlined in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, the proposed order is also to be emailed to bloom@flsd.uscourts.gov in Word format. The CM/ECF Administrative Procedures may be viewed at www.flsd.uscourts.gov. All other deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order shall remain strictly in place. Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation due by 12/28/2022. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER STRIKING INITIAL DISCLOSURES: #18 Witness List filed by Ana Palacios, #19 Witness List filed by Ana Palacios. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/13/2022. See attached document for full details. (mab)
December 13, 2022 Filing 19 (STRICKEN per order at DE #20 )Witness List (Amended Initial Disclosures) by Ana Palacios.. (Dixon, Robert) Modified on 12/13/2022 (mab).
December 13, 2022 Filing 18 ( STRICKEN per order at DE #20 )Witness List (Initial Disclosure) by Ana Palacios.. (Dixon, Robert) Modified on 12/13/2022 (mab).
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 1/30/2023., Discovery due by 7/11/2023., Expert Discovery due by 7/11/2023., Joinder of Parties due by 1/30/2023., Mediation Deadline 7/25/2023., In Limine Motions due by 8/2/2023., Dispositive Motions due by 8/2/2023., Motions due by 8/2/2023., Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/23/2023., Jury Trial set for 11/6/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 10/31/2023 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/30/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
November 29, 2022 Filing 16 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manzo, Christine)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND AMENDED MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY DEFENDANT:Motion to Dismiss, DE #8 , is GRANTED, and Count II of the Complaint asserted against Defendant Hector Romero is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Motion to Amend, DE #14 , is DENIED. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (mab)
November 18, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Adopt/Join 12 Order on Motion to Substitute Party, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct , Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint to Substitute Party Defendant ( Responses due by 12/2/2022) by Ana Palacios. (Dixon, Robert)
November 18, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #5 Notice (Other), filed by Ana Palacios. Replies due by 11/28/2022. (Dixon, Robert)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #10 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint to Substitute Party Defendant for failure to comply with the pre-filing conferral requirement in Local Rule 7.1(a)(3). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
November 18, 2022 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #10 MOTION for Order of Sale, Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint to Substitute Party Defendant. Filer Selected the Wrong Motion Relief(s); ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (pcs)
November 17, 2022 Filing 10 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint to Substitute Party Defendant (Responses due by 12/1/2022) by Ana Palacios. (Dixon, Robert) Modified text and Motion Relief on 11/18/2022 (pcs).
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring Plaintiff's expedited response by November 23, 2022, to Defendant Romero's Motion to Dismiss Count II of the Complaint, ECF No. #8 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
November 17, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #5 Notice (Other), . Responses due by 11/23/2022. PER DE#9 (cds)
November 14, 2022 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #5 Notice (Other), by Hector Romero. Responses due by 11/28/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Manzo, Christine)
November 14, 2022 Filing 7 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Corporate Parent WSE Investment LLC, Corporate Parent WSE Management LLC, Corporate Parent Walmart Inc, Corporate Parent Walmart Stores East LLC for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Manzo, Christine)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES: Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/29/2022 Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (mab)
November 7, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) of Filing Civil Cover Sheet and Exhibits to Walmart's Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Comp. Ex. D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit F) (Manzo, Christine)
November 7, 2022 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. State Court Records not included. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the State Court Records attached within 24 hours. (nwn)
November 7, 2022 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (nwn)
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
November 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16080599, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Manzo, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palacios v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Palacios
Represented By: Robert Reza Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Christine Michelle Manzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Romero
Represented By: Nicholas G. Neville
Represented By: Christine Michelle Manzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP doing business as WALMART SUPER CENTER #2814
Represented By: Nicholas G. Neville
Represented By: Christine Michelle Manzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?