The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc. et al v. DeSantis et al
Plaintiff: The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., A. M., J. L., R. M., C. A., M. M., D. M., A. C., G. D.L. and M. G.
Defendant: Ronald D. DeSantis, Ashley Moody, Nicholas B. Cox, Ginger Bowden Madden, Jack Campbell, John Durrett, Melissa W. Nelson, William Gladson, Bruce Bartlett, R.J. Larizza, Brian S. Kramer, Monique H. Worrell, Brian Haas, Katherine Fernandez Rundle, Ed Brodsky, Susan S. Lopez, Larry Basford, David A. Aronberg, Dennis W. Ward, Harold F. Pryor, Philip G. Archer, Thomas Bakkedahl, Amira D. Fox and Florida Attorney General
Amicus Curiae: American Immigration Lawyers Association and Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition
Case Number: 1:2023cv22655
Filed: July 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #48 Governor Ronald DeSantis's Motion for Leave to File a Separate Response to the Complaint. The Governor's Response shall not exceed 10 pages, exclusive of the case style, signature block, and any certificates of service. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/12/2023. (lcr)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Separate Response to Complaint by Ronald D. DeSantis. (Meros, Nicholas)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas John Peter Meros, Ryan D. Newman and Samuel R. Elliott on behalf of Ronald D. DeSantis. Attorney Nicholas John Peter Meros added to party Ronald D. DeSantis(pty:dft). (Meros, Nicholas) Attorney names modified on 9/11/2023 (scn).
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #39 the Defendants' Motion to Stay Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (the "Motion"). The Defendants say that "it is difficult for the State Defendants to prepare party-specific arguments on issues like standing and irreparable harm without knowing how the Court will resolve these pending issues." Motion at 2. They add that they "cannot determine at this time whether to seek discovery before a hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction," and that "it would be a better use of the parties' and this Court's resources to stay the briefing pending resolution of the anonymity issue." Ibid. After careful review of the Motion and the Plaintiffs' Response, see #45 , we don't think these reasons are sufficient to justify a protracted stay of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, see #30 . For one thing, if the Defendants want to seek discovery before the preliminary-injunction hearing, they'll have to show "good cause." See, e.g., FTC v. On Point Glob. LLC, 2020 WL 32996, at *2 (S.D. Fla. Jan. 2, 2020) (Scola, J.). For another, the Defendants don't explain how our ruling on the question of anonymity will affect their decision to seek discovery. As to the "difficulty" of preparing party-specific arguments, the same could be said of almost any complex case. "Ultimately, we enjoy broad discretion in deciding how to best manage the cases before us," Sizemore v. Zhao, 2023 WL 5087341, at *1 (S.D. Fla. Aug. 8, 2023) (Altman, J.) (cleaned up). In this case, we think it makes more sense for the parties to brief both motions (for a preliminary injunction and to proceed anonymously) at the same time. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/11/2023. (lcr)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Stay re #30 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing filed by C. A., American Immigration Lawyers Association, A. C., Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, G. D.L., M. G., J. L., A. M., D. M., M. M., R. M., The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc.. Replies due by 9/13/2023. (Chavez, Paul)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #42 the parties' Joint Stipulation and Motion to Stay (the "Motion to Stay"). The Plaintiffs and the Defendant State Attorneys "stipulate and jointly move for a stay of all deadlines for the Defendant State Attorneys," subject to the conditions set forth in the Motion to Stay. Id. at 2. "The other Defendants in this action -- Governor DeSantis, Attorney General Moody, and Statewide Prosecutor Cox -- do not oppose this Stipulation and Joint Motion for a Stay." Ibid. Accordingly, the Motion to Stay is GRANTED, and all deadlines are stayed as to the Defendant State Attorneys. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/5/2023. (lcr)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE in Support re #29 Second MOTION for Leave to File Supporting Documents under Seal and Proceed Anonymously filed by C. A., American Immigration Lawyers Association, A. C., Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, G. D.L., M. G., J. L., A. M., D. M., M. M., R. M., The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc.. (Hernandez Anderson, Anne)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and Joint Motion of the Plaintiffs and Defendant State Attorneys for Stay by C. A., A. C., G. D.L., M. G., J. L., A. M., D. M., M. M., R. M., The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc. (Hernandez Anderson, Anne) Event type Modified on 9/5/2023 (scn).
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE by Nicholas B. Cox, Florida Attorney General re #30 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing, #39 MOTION to Stay re #30 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service Documents) (Percival, James)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PAPERLESS ORDER. The Plaintiffs shall respond to #39 the Defendants' Motion to Stay Briefing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction by September 6, 2023. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/30/2023. (lcr)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadline to #39 MOTION to Stay re #30 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing . Responses due by 9/6/2023. PER DE#40 (cds)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Stay re #30 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing by Nicholas B. Cox, Ronald D. DeSantis, Florida Attorney General. Attorney Natalie Christmas added to party Nicholas B. Cox(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Christmas added to party Florida Attorney General(pty:dft). Responses due by 9/12/2023 (Christmas, Natalie)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 Second MOTION for Leave to File Supporting Documents under Seal and Proceed Anonymously filed by Nicholas B. Cox, Ronald D. DeSantis, Florida Attorney General. Attorney James Percival added to party Nicholas B. Cox(pty:dft), Attorney James Percival added to party Florida Attorney General(pty:dft). Replies due by 9/5/2023. (Percival, James)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #36 Daniel J. Melo's Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Daniel J. Melo may appear and participate in this action on behalf of amicus curiae, the Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to daniel.melo@caircoalition.org. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/28/2023. (lcr)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Corrected MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Daniel J. Melo. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-16873896. Filing Fee $ 200.00 by American Immigration Lawyers Association, Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition. Responses due by 9/8/2023 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Prada, Mark)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction to #31 Consent MOTION for Leave to File amicus brief, #30 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing by American Immigration Lawyers Association, Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition. (Prada, Mark)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #32 Daniel J. Melo's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with Local Rule 4(b) of the Rules Governing the Admission, Practice, Peer Review, and Discipline of Attorneys. The Motion requests a waiver of the pro hac vice filing fee, but the docket text indicates that counsel for amicus curiae have already paid the fee. See #32 . Counsel may re-file the Motion after the Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition ("CAIR") is added to the case as amicus curiae. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/25/2023. (lcr)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #31 the Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of the Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/25/2023. (lcr)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Daniel J. Melo. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16873896 by American Immigration Lawyers Association, Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition. Responses due by 9/8/2023 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Prada, Mark)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Leave to File amicus brief by American Immigration Lawyers Association, Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition. Attorney Mark Andrew Prada added to party American Immigration Lawyers Association(pty:am), Attorney Mark Andrew Prada added to party Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition(pty:am). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Prada, Mark)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing by The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Appendix Index to Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Exh. 1, Declaration of Florida Farmworkers' Association, #4 Exhibit Exh. 2, Declaration of A.M., #5 Exhibit Exh. 3, Declaration of J.L., #6 Exhibit Exh. 4, Declaration of R.M., #7 Exhibit Exh. 5, Declaration of C.A., #8 Exhibit Exh. 6, Declaration of M.M., #9 Exhibit Exh. 7, Declaration of D.M., #10 Exhibit Exh. 8, Declaration of A.C., #11 Exhibit Exh. 9, Declaration of G.D.L., #12 Exhibit Exh. 10, Declaration of M.G., #13 Exhibit Exh. 11, Attorney Declaration)(Montanez, Felix)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Second MOTION for Leave to File Supporting Documents under Seal and Proceed Anonymously by The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Declaration of A.M., #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, Declaration of J.L., #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, Declaration of R.M., #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, Declaration of C.A., #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, Declaration of M.M., #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, Declaration of D.M., #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, Declaration of A.C., #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, Declaration of G.D.L, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, Declaration of M.G.)(Montanez, Felix)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by D. M., A. M., The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., M. G., M. M., J. L., G. D.L., A. C., R. M., C. A.. R.J. Larizza served on 8/22/2023, response/answer due 9/12/2023. (Chavez, Paul)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by D. M., A. M., The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., M. G., M. M., J. L., G. D.L., A. C., R. M., C. A.. Nicholas B. Cox waiver sent on 7/26/2023, response/answer due 9/25/2023; Florida Attorney General waiver sent on 7/26/2023, response/answer due 9/25/2023. (Chavez, Paul)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by D. M., A. M., The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., M. G., M. M., J. L., G. D.L., A. C., R. M., C. A.. Philip G. Archer served on 7/26/2023, response/answer due 8/16/2023; David A. Aronberg served on 7/25/2023, response/answer due 8/15/2023; Thomas Bakkedahl served on 7/25/2023, response/answer due 8/15/2023; Bruce Bartlett served on 7/25/2023, response/answer due 8/15/2023; Larry Basford served on 7/25/2023, response/answer due 8/15/2023; Ginger Bowden Madden served on 7/25/2023, response/answer due 8/15/2023; Ed Brodsky served on 7/26/2023, response/answer due 8/16/2023; Jack Campbell served on 7/26/2023, response/answer due 8/16/2023; Ronald D. DeSantis served on 7/26/2023, response/answer due 8/16/2023; John Durrett served on 7/24/2023, response/answer due 8/14/2023; Katherine Fernandez Rundle served on 7/25/2023, response/answer due 8/15/2023; Amira D. Fox served on 7/27/2023, response/answer due 8/17/2023; William Gladson served on 7/25/2023, response/answer due 8/15/2023; Brian Haas served on 7/25/2023, response/answer due 8/15/2023; Brian S. Kramer served on 8/1/2023, response/answer due 8/22/2023; Susan S. Lopez served on 7/27/2023, response/answer due 8/17/2023; Melissa W. Nelson served on 7/25/2023, response/answer due 8/15/2023; Harold F. Pryor served on 7/26/2023, response/answer due 8/16/2023; Dennis W. Ward served on 7/25/2023, response/answer due 8/15/2023; Monique H. Worrell served on 7/25/2023, response/answer due 8/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Affidavit, #7 Affidavit, #8 Affidavit, #9 Affidavit, #10 Affidavit, #11 Affidavit, #12 Affidavit, #13 Affidavit, #14 Affidavit, #15 Affidavit, #16 Affidavit, #17 Affidavit, #18 Affidavit, #19 Affidavit)(Chavez, Paul)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #24 the Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (the "Motion"). "[A] court may issue a preliminary injunction only on notice to the adverse party." Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a)(1). Although the Plaintiffs certify that they served "a true and correct copy of" the Motion "on all parties of record by e-mail, and U.S. Mail," see Motion at 4, the Defendants have not yet been served in this case, see generally Docket. The Motion is therefore premature. See Doc Dev., LLC v. Ewc Franchise Group, Inc., 2018 WL 2007045, at *1 (S.D. Fla. Mar. 23, 2018) ("There is no indication on the docket [d]efendant has been served with the [complaint], nor has [d]efendant appeared in this action. The [m]otion's Certificate of Service, stating the [m]otion was 'furnished' to two individuals 'via electronic mail,' is not proof of service of the [c]omplaint. [ ] Defendant is not expected or required to respond to a request for a preliminary injunction contained in a motion until it has been served; thus, the request for a preliminary injunction is premature."). The Plaintiffs may re-file their Motion once the Defendants have been served. We also deny without prejudice #17 the Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously. As we've said, the Plaintiffs have not yet filed proof of service on the Docket, so the Motion to Proceed Anonymously is premature. The Plaintiffs may re-file the Motion to Proceed Anonymously once the Defendants have been served. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/8/2023. (lcr)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing by C. A., A. C., G. D.L., M. G., J. L., A. M., D. M., M. M., R. M., The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing, #2 Index to Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11)(Hernandez Anderson, Anne)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 , #20 , #21 , and #22 , the Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Cody Wofsy, Edith Sangueza, Omar Jadwat, and Spencer Amdur may appear and participate in this action on behalf of the Plaintiffs. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to cwofsy@aclu.org, irp_es@aclu.org, ojadwat@aclu.org, and samdur@aclu.org. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/24/2023. (lcr)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Spencer Amdur. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16783929 by C. A., A. C., G. D.L., M. G., J. L., A. M., D. M., M. M., R. M., The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc.. Responses due by 8/4/2023 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chavez, Paul)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Omar Jadwat. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16783892 by C. A., A. C., G. D.L., M. G., J. L., A. M., D. M., M. M., R. M., The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc.. Responses due by 8/4/2023 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chavez, Paul)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for EDITH SANGUEZA. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16783863 by C. A., A. C., G. D.L., M. G., J. L., A. M., D. M., M. M., R. M., The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc.. Responses due by 8/4/2023 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chavez, Paul)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Cody Wofsy. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16783434 by C. A., A. C., G. D.L., M. G., J. L., A. M., D. M., M. M., R. M., The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc.. Responses due by 8/4/2023 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chavez, Paul)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #17 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously and to File Supporting Exhibits Under Seal & Memorandum in Support Thereof (Miscellaneous Relief) . Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (kpe)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously and to File Supporting Exhibits Under Seal & Memorandum in Support Thereof by C. A., A. C., G. D.L., M. G., J. L., A. M., D. M., M. M., R. M.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez Anderson, Anne) Modified relief on 7/21/2023 (kpe).
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #13 Evelyn Wiese's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Evelyn Wiese may appear and participate in this action on behalf of the Plaintiffs. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to ewiese@aijustice.org. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/20/2023. (lcr)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #12 Cassandra Charles's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Cassandra Charles may appear and participate in this action on behalf of the Plaintiffs. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to cassandra.charles@splcenter.org. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/20/2023. (lcr)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Philip G. Archer, David A. Aronberg, Thomas Bakkedahl, Bruce Bartlett, Larry Basford, Ginger Bowden Madden, Ed Brodsky, Jack Campbell, Nicholas B. Cox, Ronald D. DeSantis, John Durrett, Katherine Fernandez Rundle, Florida Attorney General, Amira D. Fox, William Gladson, Brian Haas, Brian S. Kramer, R.J. Larizza, Susan S. Lopez, Melissa W. Nelson, Harold F. Pryor, Dennis W. Ward, Monique H. Worrell. (jas)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Evelyn Wiese. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16777429 by C. A., A. C., G. D.L., M. G., J. L., A. M., D. M., M. M., R. M., The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc.. Responses due by 8/2/2023 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Evelyn Wiese, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez Anderson, Anne)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Cassandra Charles. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16777418 by C. A., A. C., G. D.L., M. G., J. L., A. M., D. M., M. M., R. M., The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc.. Responses due by 8/2/2023 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Cassandra Charles, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez Anderson, Anne)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #9 Emma Winger's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Emma Winger may appear and participate in this action on behalf of the Plaintiffs. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to EWinger@immcouncil.org. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/19/2023. (lcr)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #8 Katherine Melloy Goettel's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Katherine Melloy Goettel may appear and participate in this action on behalf of the Plaintiffs. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to KGoettel@immcouncil.org. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/19/2023. (lcr)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Emma Winger. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16774422 by C. A., A. C., G. D.L., M. G., J. L., A. M., D. M., M. M., R. M., The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc.. Responses due by 8/1/2023 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Emma Winger, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez Anderson, Anne)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Katherine Melloy Goettel. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16774417 by C. A., A. C., G. D.L., M. G., J. L., A. M., D. M., M. M., R. M., The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc.. Responses due by 8/1/2023 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Katherine Melloy Goettel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez Anderson, Anne)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by C. A., A. C., G. D.L., M. G., J. L., A. M., D. M., M. M., R. M., The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc. re #1 Complaint filed by D. M., G. D.L., R. M., A. M., A. C., The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., M. M., C. A., J. L. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Governor Ronald D. DeSantis, #2 Summon(s) Attorney General Ashley Moody, #3 Summon(s) Statewide Prosecutor Nicholas B. Cox, #4 Summon(s) Ginger Bowden Madden, #5 Summon(s) Jack Campbell, #6 Summon(s) John Durrett, #7 Summon(s) Melissa Nelson, #8 Summon(s) William Gladson, #9 Summon(s) Bruce Bartlett, #10 Summon(s) R.J. Larizza, #11 Summon(s) Brian S. Kramer, #12 Summon(s) Monique H. Worrell, #13 Summon(s) Brian Haas, #14 Summon(s) Katherine Fernandez Rundle, #15 Summon(s) Ed Brodsky, #16 Summon(s) Susan S. Lopez, #17 Summon(s) Larry Basford, #18 Summon(s) Dave Aronberg, #19 Summon(s) Dennis W. Ward, #20 Summon(s) Harold F. Pryor, #21 Summon(s) Philip G. Archer, #22 Summon(s) Thomas Bakkedahl, #23 Summon(s) Amira D. Fox) (Hernandez Anderson, Anne)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER in Cases with Multiple Defendants. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (apz)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Evelyn Wiese, Katherine Melloy Goettel, Emma Winger, Cassandra Charles, Cody Wofsy, Spencer Amdur, Omar Jadwat, Edith Sangueza, mailing date July 18, 2023, (pt)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by C. A., A. C., G. D.L., M. G., J. L., A. M., D. M., M. M., R. M., The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hernandez Anderson, Anne)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (rbe)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16769364, filed by D. M., A. M., The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc., M. M., J. L., G. D.L., A. C., R. M., C. A..(Hernandez Anderson, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc. et al v. DeSantis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Farmworker Association of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Amien Kacou
Represented By: Christina Isabel LaRocca
Represented By: Daniel Boaz Tilley
Represented By: Felix Alberto Montanez
Represented By: Katherine Holloway Blankenship
Represented By: Maite C De Barros
Represented By: Paul Raymond Chavez
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Katherine Melloy Goettel
Represented By: Spencer Amdur
Represented By: Cassandra Charles
Represented By: Edith Sangueza
Represented By: Emma Winger
Represented By: Evelyn Wiese
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. M.
Represented By: Amien Kacou
Represented By: Christina Isabel LaRocca
Represented By: Daniel Boaz Tilley
Represented By: Felix Alberto Montanez
Represented By: Katherine Holloway Blankenship
Represented By: Maite C De Barros
Represented By: Paul Raymond Chavez
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Represented By: Cassandra Charles
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Spencer Amdur
Represented By: Edith Sangueza
Represented By: Emma Winger
Represented By: Evelyn Wiese
Represented By: Katherine Melloy Goettel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. L.
Represented By: Christina Isabel LaRocca
Represented By: Daniel Boaz Tilley
Represented By: Felix Alberto Montanez
Represented By: Katherine Holloway Blankenship
Represented By: Maite C De Barros
Represented By: Paul Raymond Chavez
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Represented By: Amien Kacou
Represented By: Emma Winger
Represented By: Cassandra Charles
Represented By: Evelyn Wiese
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Spencer Amdur
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Edith Sangueza
Represented By: Katherine Melloy Goettel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. M.
Represented By: Amien Kacou
Represented By: Christina Isabel LaRocca
Represented By: Daniel Boaz Tilley
Represented By: Felix Alberto Montanez
Represented By: Katherine Holloway Blankenship
Represented By: Maite C De Barros
Represented By: Paul Raymond Chavez
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Represented By: Evelyn Wiese
Represented By: Cassandra Charles
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Edith Sangueza
Represented By: Emma Winger
Represented By: Katherine Melloy Goettel
Represented By: Spencer Amdur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. A.
Represented By: Amien Kacou
Represented By: Christina Isabel LaRocca
Represented By: Daniel Boaz Tilley
Represented By: Felix Alberto Montanez
Represented By: Katherine Holloway Blankenship
Represented By: Maite C De Barros
Represented By: Paul Raymond Chavez
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Represented By: Cassandra Charles
Represented By: Edith Sangueza
Represented By: Emma Winger
Represented By: Evelyn Wiese
Represented By: Katherine Melloy Goettel
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Spencer Amdur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. M.
Represented By: Amien Kacou
Represented By: Christina Isabel LaRocca
Represented By: Daniel Boaz Tilley
Represented By: Felix Alberto Montanez
Represented By: Katherine Holloway Blankenship
Represented By: Maite C De Barros
Represented By: Paul Raymond Chavez
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Cassandra Charles
Represented By: Emma Winger
Represented By: Evelyn Wiese
Represented By: Katherine Melloy Goettel
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Edith Sangueza
Represented By: Spencer Amdur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. M.
Represented By: Amien Kacou
Represented By: Christina Isabel LaRocca
Represented By: Daniel Boaz Tilley
Represented By: Felix Alberto Montanez
Represented By: Katherine Holloway Blankenship
Represented By: Maite C De Barros
Represented By: Paul Raymond Chavez
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Cassandra Charles
Represented By: Katherine Melloy Goettel
Represented By: Edith Sangueza
Represented By: Emma Winger
Represented By: Evelyn Wiese
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Spencer Amdur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. C.
Represented By: Amien Kacou
Represented By: Christina Isabel LaRocca
Represented By: Daniel Boaz Tilley
Represented By: Felix Alberto Montanez
Represented By: Katherine Holloway Blankenship
Represented By: Maite C De Barros
Represented By: Paul Raymond Chavez
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Represented By: Emma Winger
Represented By: Spencer Amdur
Represented By: Cassandra Charles
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Edith Sangueza
Represented By: Evelyn Wiese
Represented By: Katherine Melloy Goettel
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. D.L.
Represented By: Maite C De Barros
Represented By: Paul Raymond Chavez
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Represented By: Amien Kacou
Represented By: Christina Isabel LaRocca
Represented By: Daniel Boaz Tilley
Represented By: Felix Alberto Montanez
Represented By: Katherine Holloway Blankenship
Represented By: Edith Sangueza
Represented By: Katherine Melloy Goettel
Represented By: Emma Winger
Represented By: Evelyn Wiese
Represented By: Spencer Amdur
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Cassandra Charles
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. G.
Represented By: Amien Kacou
Represented By: Christina Isabel LaRocca
Represented By: Daniel Boaz Tilley
Represented By: Felix Alberto Montanez
Represented By: Katherine Holloway Blankenship
Represented By: Maite C De Barros
Represented By: Paul Raymond Chavez
Represented By: Anne Janet Hernandez Anderson
Represented By: Cody Wofsy
Represented By: Edith Sangueza
Represented By: Cassandra Charles
Represented By: Katherine Melloy Goettel
Represented By: Emma Winger
Represented By: Evelyn Wiese
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Spencer Amdur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D. DeSantis
Represented By: Ryan Dean Newman
Represented By: Nicholas John Peter Meros
Represented By: Samuel Francis Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas B. Cox
Represented By: James Percival
Represented By: Natalie Christmas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginger Bowden Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Durrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa W. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gladson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.J. Larizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian S. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monique H. Worrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Fernandez Rundle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Brodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan S. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Basford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Aronberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis W. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold F. Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip G. Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Bakkedahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amira D. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Attorney General
Represented By: James Percival
Represented By: Natalie Christmas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Immigration Lawyers Association
Represented By: Mark Andrew Prada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition
Represented By: Mark Andrew Prada
Represented By: Daniel J. Melo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?