Castillo et al v. United States Of America et al
Plaintiff: Gladys Castillo
Defendant: Florida United Radiology, LC, Okeechobee Hospital, Inc., Raulerson GYN LLC, Dr. James Bradfield, United States Of America, Dr. Alexander Vennos and Florida United Radiology, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2018cv14377
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (See DE #14 for image). Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/30/2018. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying #13 Motion for Extension of Time, Scheduling Order, and Order Referring Case to Mediation. Discovery due by 5/30/2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/30/2018. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
October 25, 2018 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report re #11 Scheduling Order,,,, Order of Requirements,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, by United States Of America. Responses due by 11/8/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodriguez, Marlene)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 10/12/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 9/30/2019 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 9/25/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 8/14/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/11/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by Okeechobee Hospital, Inc. Notice of Appearance. Attorney Andrew Allen Rief added to party Okeechobee Hospital, Inc.(pty:dft). (Rief, Andrew)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT on Removal by United States Of America (Rodriguez, Marlene)
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal and Amended Complaint by United States Of America. (Rodriguez, Marlene)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by James Bradfield, Raulerson GYN LLC . Attorney Adam Williams Rhys added to party James Bradfield(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Williams Rhys added to party Raulerson GYN LLC(pty:dft). (Rhys, Adam)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/17/2018. See attached document for full details. (nkl)
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): James Bradfield, Alexander Vennos, Florida United Radiology, LC, Okeechobee Hospital, Inc. and Raulerson GYN LLC. (Rodriguez, Marlene)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States Of America re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Notice of Filing State Court Docket and Records (Attachments: #1 Exhibit state docket, #2 Exhibit state civil cover sheer, #3 Exhibit state complaint, #4 Exhibit state summons, #5 Exhibit state summons, #6 Exhibit state summons, #7 Exhibit state summons, #8 Exhibit state summons, #9 Exhibit state summons, #10 Exhibit state summons, #11 Exhibit state answer and aff defnses by Bradfield and Raulerson GYN, #12 Exhibit state answer and affirmative defenses by okeechobee hospital, #13 Exhibit state answer by Vennos and Florida Radiology, #14 Exhibit plaintiff reply to affirmative defenses, #15 Exhibit plaintiff's reply tto affirmative defenses, #16 Exhibit plaintiff's reply to affirmative defenses, #17 Exhibit plaintiff's state court motion for leave to file amended complaint, #18 Exhibit state court amended complaint, #19 Exhibit state order granting leave to file amended complaint, #20 Exhibit state answer to amended complaint by vennos and florida radiology, #21 Exhibit state answer to amended complaint by Okeechobee Hospital, #22 Exhibit state answer to amended complaint by Bradfield and Raulerson GYN) (Rodriguez, Marlene)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case.Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (cbr)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cbr)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Notice of Removal) Filing fee $400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Complaint Cover Sheet, #4 Amended Complaint, #5 Certification)(Rodriguez, Marlene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo et al v. United States Of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida United Radiology, LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okeechobee Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Allen Rief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raulerson GYN LLC
Represented By: Adam Williams Rhys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. James Bradfield
Represented By: Adam Williams Rhys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Marlene Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Alexander Vennos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida United Radiology, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Castillo
Represented By: Diana Santa Maria
Represented By: Michael A. Petruccelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?