Baluja v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Maria Baluja
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2020cv14180
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Michael J. Astrue, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s))(lk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Maria Baluja (Attachments: #1 Proposed summons on the Attorney General of the United States, #2 Proposed summons on the Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, #3 Proposed summons on the US Attorney) (Steinberg, Michael)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service NOT Ordered. The Plaintiff may proceed without paying the filing fee. However this Court is not directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the Defendant with process. Instead it is the Plaintiffs responsibility to serve the Defendant with the summons and copies of the Complaint in compliance with Rule 4(i), Fed.R.Civ.P. The Plaintiff promptly shall file the Returns of Service. The Defendant shall answer the Complaint within sixty (60) days of the service of process date, as Rule 12(a)(2), Fed.R.Civ.P., requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 6/10/2020. (ip00)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maria Baluja. (Steinberg, Michael)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Filing fees not paid. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee, and electronically pay the correct fees of $400.00 within 24 hours of this notice. (jbs)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Maria Baluja. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Steinberg, Michael) No IFP was filed or filing fee paid. Modified text on 6/5/2020 (jbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baluja v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Baluja
Represented By: Michael A. Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?