MINSKY v. U.S. LEGAL SUPPORT, INC
Plaintiff: DARA MINSKY
Defendant: U.S. LEGAL SUPPORT, INC
Case Number: 9:2018cv80954
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: Palm Beach (Office: West Palm Beach)
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2611
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Filing 11 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by U.S. LEGAL SUPPORT, INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Allison)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER for Magistrate Judge Bruce Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 8/21/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Status Conference set for 6/19/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Jury Trial set for 9/3/2019 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 8/28/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), Order of Requirements, and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for Discovery Matters.. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/20/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 16, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by U.S. LEGAL SUPPORT, INC. (Kahn, Allison)
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. LEGAL SUPPORT, INC identifying Other Affiliate Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A., Other Affiliate Richard Celler Legal, P.A., Other Affiliate Allison O Kahn, Other Affiliate Noah E Storch, Other Affiliate Richard Celler for U.S. LEGAL SUPPORT, INC (Kahn, Allison)
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allison Oasis Kahn on behalf of U.S. LEGAL SUPPORT, INC. Attorney Allison Oasis Kahn added to party U.S. LEGAL SUPPORT, INC(pty:dft). (Kahn, Allison)
July 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Noah E Storch on behalf of DARA MINSKY (Storch, Noah)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to U.S. LEGAL SUPPORT, INC. (lh)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Jury demand when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (lh)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lh)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. LEGAL SUPPORT, INC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10833830, filed by DARA MINSKY. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Celler, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MINSKY v. U.S. LEGAL SUPPORT, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARA MINSKY
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Represented By: Richard Bernard Celler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. LEGAL SUPPORT, INC
Represented By: Allison Oasis Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?