Estrada Garcia et al v. Target Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Berenice Estrada Garcia and Norman De Jesus Estrada Garcia
Defendant: Target Corporation and Ligia Jimenez
Case Number: 9:2019cv81522
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #6 Order On Motion to Remand, #7 Transmittal Letter Sent. (kpe)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 Transmittal Letter Sent with Order on Motion to Remand to: 15th Judicial Circuit Court. State Court Case Number: 50-02019-CA012799 (kpe)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order On Motion to Remand. Order granting #3 Motion to Remand. This action is Remanded to the Circuit Court of the Fifteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Palm Beach County, Florida for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk of the Court shall CLOSE THIS CASE in this District. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Target Corporation. Replies due by 12/2/2019. (Derrevere, Jon)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED BRIEFING. In light of the nature of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (DE #3 ), the Court ORDERS expedited briefing on the Motion. Plaintiff must file any response to Defendant's Motion by November 29, 2019. I encourage the Parties to make additional reasonable efforts to confer and resolve the dispute at issue. If the Parties resolve the dispute at issue in Plaintiff's Motion, they must promptly notify the Court. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/20/2019. (kal)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Berenice Estrada Garcia, Norman De Jesus Estrada Garcia. (Eagle, Ashley)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12130775, filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Target's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plt's Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Jon D. Derrevere, Esq., #5 Exhibit 5 - Plt's Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 - Guest Incident Report, #7 Exhibit 7 - Target's Answer to Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 - State Court Docketing, #9 Exhibit 9 - Jimenez' Affidavit, #10 Exhibit 10 - April 3, 2019 Demand Letter, #11 Exhibit 11 - Copies of all Process and Pleadings filed in State Court, #12 Exhibit 12 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Derrevere, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estrada Garcia et al v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Jon Dale Derrevere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ligia Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berenice Estrada Garcia
Represented By: Ashley Renee Eagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman De Jesus Estrada Garcia
Represented By: Ashley Renee Eagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?