United States Of America v. Cuthill's, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: James E. Hall, II, Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc., Cuthill's, Inc. and Anthony E. Cuthill
Case Number: 9:2019cv81650
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States Of America. Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. waiver sent on 1/22/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Causey, Daniel)
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States Of America. Anthony E. Cuthill waiver sent on 12/12/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Causey, Daniel)
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Martin Weinberg on behalf of James E. Hall, II. Attorney John Martin Weinberg added to party James E. Hall, II(pty:dft). (Weinberg, John)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE. Final Discovery Status Conference set for 5/20/2020 02:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 1/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 1/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: (Fact Discovery due by 6/15/2020., Expert Discovery due by 7/1/2020., Jury Trial set for 10/13/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 10/7/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 9/9/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), Order of Requirements, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for Discovery Matters., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States Of America (Causey, Daniel)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc., Anthony E. Cuthill, Cuthill's, Inc., James E. Hall, II. (pcs)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(Causey, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Cuthill's, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Hall, II
Represented By: John Martin Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuthill's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony E. Cuthill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Daniel B. Causey, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?