South Spanish Trail, LLC v. Globenet Cabos Submarinos America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: South Spanish Trail, LLC
Defendant: John Does 1-100, Globenet Cabos Submarinos America, Inc., Caribbean Crossings Ltd., Inc., United States Of America, Syniverse Technologies, LLC, Facebook, Inc., Telia Carrier U.S. Inc., Claro Enterprise Solutions, LLC, Zenlayer Inc, Hurricane Electric LLC, Cogent Communications Inc., China Unicom (America) Operations Limited, CenturyLink Communications, LLC d/b/a Lumen Technologies Group f/k/a Qwest Communications Company, LLC, Equinix LLC, China Telecom (Americas) Corporation, Zayo Group, LLC, Twitch Interactive, Inc., PCCW Global, Inc., Momentum Telecom, Inc, Microsoft Corporation, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Facebook Miami, Inc, Sprint Communications Company L.P., EdgeUno, Inc., Gold Telecom Inc. and Tata Communications (America) Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Internal Improvement Trust Fund of the State of Florida
Counter Defendant: Florida Inland Navigation District
Case Number: 9:2021cv80728
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Aileen M Cannon
2 Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
3 Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 110 Initial Disclosure(s) by China Unicom (America) Operations Limited (Kligler, Carly)
June 11, 2021 Filing 109 Initial Disclosure(s) by Verizon Business Network Services Inc. (Kligler, Carly)
June 10, 2021 Filing 108 Initial Disclosure(s) by EdgeUno, Inc. (Kligler, Carly)
June 10, 2021 Filing 107 RESPONSE in Support re #81 MOTION to Vacate The Clerk's Default filed by Facebook Miami, Inc. (Kligler, Carly)
June 7, 2021 Filing 106 Amended CROSSCLAIM against Board of Trustees of the Internal Improvement Trust Fund of the State of Florida, Florida Inland Navigation District, United States Of America, filed by South Spanish Trail, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A (Coastal Minerals Deed), #2 Exhibit Ex B (PBC ICW Easement Agreement), #3 Exhibit Ex C (Recorded Certified copy of Order on 1929 Deed), #4 Exhibit Ex D (Petition in condemnation), #5 Exhibit Ex E (Federal Judgment), #6 Exhibit Ex F (FIND Map Page 30), #7 Exhibit Ex G (1942 Easement), #8 Exhibit Ex H (2020 Consent), #9 Exhibit Ex I (ACOE.5.17.17.SST), #10 Exhibit Ex J (FCC Release and Order re China Unicom), #11 Exhibit Ex K (FCC Release and Order re China Telecom), #12 Exhibit Ex L (Exec Order 13913 re National Security), #13 Exhibit Ex M (June 2021 Executive Order), #14 Exhibit Ex N (2020-06-09 PSI Staff Report - Threats to U.S. Communications Networks), #15 Exhibit Ex O (Paul Weiss Article), #16 Exhibit Ex P (Letter from City to Federal Govt), #17 Exhibit Ex Q (Exec Order 13925 re Censorship), #18 Exhibit Ex R (FIND Notice), #19 Exhibit Ex S (ACOE Public Notice))(Boegem, Sacha)
June 4, 2021 Filing 105 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference Reset for 7/6/2021 02:00 PM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Aileen M. Cannon via the Zoom platform. The Zoom link and information will be emailed to the parties of record. (tgs)
June 3, 2021 Filing 104 Initial Disclosure(s) by Momentum Telecom, Inc (Kligler, Carly)
June 3, 2021 Filing 103 Initial Disclosure(s) by PCCW Global, Inc. (Kligler, Carly)
June 3, 2021 Filing 102 Initial Disclosure(s) by Syniverse Technologies, LLC (Kligler, Carly)
June 3, 2021 Filing 101 Initial Disclosure(s) by Tata Communications (America) Inc. (Kligler, Carly)
June 3, 2021 Filing 100 Initial Disclosure(s) by Telia Carrier U.S. Inc. (Kligler, Carly)
June 3, 2021 Filing 99 Initial Disclosure(s) by Zayo Group, LLC (Kligler, Carly)
June 3, 2021 Filing 98 RESPONSE to Motion re #81 MOTION to Vacate The Clerk's Default filed by South Spanish Trail, LLC. Replies due by 6/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Amended Notice of Taking Deposition)(Boegem, Sacha)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #94 Parties' Corrected Joint Motion for Rule 16 Conference. See Notice of Hearing 96 . Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 6/3/2021. (jrt)
June 2, 2021 Filing 96 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 6/15/2021 02:00 PM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Aileen M. Cannon via the Zoom platform. The Zoom link and information will be emailed to the parties of record. The parties shall sign into the hearing ten (10) minutes prior to the scheduled start time. (tgs)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 PAPERLESS ORDER: In light of #94 Parties' Corrected Joint Motion for Rule 16 Conference, Parties' previous Joint Motion for Rule 16 Conference #93 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 6/2/2021. (jrt)
June 1, 2021 Filing 94 Corrected MOTION for Hearing re #93 Joint MOTION for Hearing [Joint Motion for Rule 16 Conference] by Globenet Cabos Submarinos America, Inc.. (Bideau, Mark)
June 1, 2021 Filing 93 Joint MOTION for Hearing [Joint Motion for Rule 16 Conference] by Globenet Cabos Submarinos America, Inc.. (Bideau, Mark)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #91 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant/Cross-Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant/Cross-Plaintiff shall respond to Cross-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss #64 , #67 , and #80 on or before June 14, 2021. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 5/28/2021. (jrt)
May 27, 2021 Filing 91 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Motions to Dismiss filed by Cross-Defendants, Board of Trustees of the Internal Improvement Trust Fund of the State of Florida, Florida Inland Navigation District and United States of America by South Spanish Trail, LLC. Responses due by 6/10/2021 (Boegem, Sacha)
May 26, 2021 Filing 90 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Twitch Interactive, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for Twitch Interactive, Inc. (Kane, Robert)
May 26, 2021 Filing 89 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Twitch Interactive, Inc. and Twitch Interactive, Inc... Attorney Robert Russell Kane, III added to party Twitch Interactive, Inc.(pty:dft). (Kane, Robert)
May 26, 2021 Filing 88 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Corporation.. Attorney Robert Russell Kane, III added to party Microsoft Corporation(pty:dft). (Kane, Robert)
May 26, 2021 Filing 87 Clerks Notice to Filer re #85 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement, #86 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties/mediator. (pcs)
May 25, 2021 Filing 86 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Doe #4 n/k/a Twitch Interactive, Inc. by John Does 1-100 identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for John Does 1-100 (Kane, Robert)
May 25, 2021 Filing 85 Corporate Disclosure Statement of John Doe #20 n/k/a Microsoft Corporation by John Does 1-100 (Kane, Robert)
May 25, 2021 Filing 84 Third-Party Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT of Caribbean Crossing, LTD., Inc. against Board of Trustees of the Internal Improvement Trust Fund of the State of Florida by Board of Trustees of the Internal Improvement Trust Fund of the State of Florida. (Newhall, Timothy)
May 25, 2021 Filing 83 Third-Party Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT of Globenet Cabos Submarinos America, Inc. against Board of Trustees of the Internal Improvement Trust Fund of the State of Florida by Board of Trustees of the Internal Improvement Trust Fund of the State of Florida. (Newhall, Timothy)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CERTIFICATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart added. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 5/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (kza)
May 21, 2021 Filing 81 MOTION to Vacate The Clerk's Default by Facebook Miami, Inc. Responses due by 6/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kligler, Carly)
May 19, 2021 Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by Florida Inland Navigation District. Responses due by 6/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chapter 4426, Laws of Florida (1895), #2 Exhibit B - Chapter 13664, Laws of Florida (1929), #3 Exhibit C - October 29, 1929 Deed, #4 Exhibit D - July 18, 1932 Deed)(Newhall, Timothy)
May 19, 2021 Filing 79 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Facebook Miami, Inc (Kligler, Carly)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Raag Singhal recused. Case reassigned to Judge Aileen M. Cannon for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (bms)
May 18, 2021 Filing 77 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Zenlayer Inc (Kligler, Carly)
May 18, 2021 Filing 76 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Sprint Communications Company L.P. (Kligler, Carly)
May 18, 2021 Filing 75 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Hurricane Electric LLC (Kligler, Carly)
May 18, 2021 Filing 74 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Gold Telecom Inc. (Kligler, Carly)
May 18, 2021 Filing 73 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Facebook, Inc. (Kligler, Carly)
May 18, 2021 Filing 72 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Equinix LLC (Kligler, Carly)
May 18, 2021 Filing 71 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Cogent Communications Inc. (Kligler, Carly)
May 18, 2021 Filing 70 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Claro Enterprise Solutions, LLC (Kligler, Carly)
May 18, 2021 Filing 69 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by China Telecom (Americas) Corporation (Kligler, Carly)
May 18, 2021 Filing 68 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by CenturyLink Communications, LLC d/b/a Lumen Technologies Group f/k/a Qwest Communications Company, LLC (Kligler, Carly)
May 18, 2021 Filing 67 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, Cross-Plaintiff SOUTH SPANISH TRAIL'S Cross-Complaint by United States Of America. Responses due by 6/1/2021 (Leinicke, John)
May 18, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE of Compliance and NOTICE of Filing by United States Of America re 63 Administrative Order (Attachments: #1 SOUTH SPANISH TRAIL'S Amended Complaint) (Leinicke, John)
May 18, 2021 Filing 65 Clerks Non-Entry of Default as to Board of Trustees of the Internal Improvement Trust Fund of the State of Florida - Motions Terminated: #60 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,. Reason: Responsive pleading (i.e. Motion for Extention of Time to File Answer to Complaint, Motion to Dismiss Complaint, etc) has been filed Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 5/18/2021. (pcs)
May 17, 2021 Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, Crossclaims of South Spanish Trail, LLC by Board of Trustees of the Internal Improvement Trust Fund of the State of Florida. Responses due by 6/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ch. 4426, Laws of Florida (1895), #2 Exhibit B - Ch. 13664, Laws of Florida (1929), #3 Exhibit C - 10/29/1929 Florida East Coast Canal Company Deed, #4 Exhibit D - 7/18/1932 Deed, #5 Exhibit E - 9/28/2000 Recording of Easement, #6 Exhibit F - 10/27/2003 Recording of Easement)(Newhall, Timothy)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PAPERLESS Administrative Order. Defendant United States of America is hereby ORDERED to separately file a legible copy of [1-3] the Amended Complaint by May 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/17/2021. (jhy)
May 17, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/17/2021. (jhy)
May 17, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE by South Spanish Trail, LLC OF FILING VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verified Return of Service) (Boegem, Sacha)
May 17, 2021 Filing 60 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Board of Trustees of the Internal Improvement Trust Fund of the State of Florida by South Spanish Trail, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Cross-Claim)(Boegem, Sacha)
May 17, 2021 Filing 59 PAPERLESS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING: Status Conference Re: Case Management/Posture Matters set for 5/18/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Roy K. Altman. (pcs) (mpt)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart and Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II recused. Case reassigned to Judge Raag Singhal and Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (bms)
May 14, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Leeds Newhall on behalf of Florida Inland Navigation District. Attorney Timothy Leeds Newhall added to party Florida Inland Navigation District(pty:cd). (Newhall, Timothy)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon recused. Case reassigned to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (jmd)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 AMENDED OMNIBUS ORDER denying #20 Motion to Dismiss; denying #27 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OMNIBUS ORDER denying #36 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying #37 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #39 Motion to Strike #36 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendants' Affirmative Defense Based Upon Avulsion, #37 Plaintiff's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, , #39 MOTION to Strike #25 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Request for Judicial Notice, #29 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Invalidity & Termination of Florida QC Easements Relied Upon by Def, #14 MOTION to Quash to Quash Service of Process by Globenet Cabos Submarinos Bermuda, Ltd. and Globenet Cabos Submarinos S.A., #15 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by John Doe 1 Akamai, 2 Aldea, 5 BT Global, 11 Columbus, 18 Inteliglobe, 22 Netflix, #16 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by Softlayer Dutch Holdings B.V.'s, #17 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by Silica Networks Argentina S.A. and Silica Networks Chile S.A., #18 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, , #19 MOTION to Vacate the Clerk's Default by Facebook Miami, Inc., #21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim for Mesne Profits in the Form of Disgorgement of Defendants' Profits, #23 Joint MOTION for Hearing /Rule 16 Conference, #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #14 MOTION to Quash to Quash Service of Process by Globenet Cabos Submarinos Bermuda, Ltd. and Globenet Cabos Submarinos S.A., #21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Rega, #25 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Request for Judicial Notice, #29 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Invalidity & Termination of Florida QC Easements Relied Upon by Defendants ; denying #14 Motion to Quash; denying #15 Motion to Quash; denying #16 Motion to Quash; denying #17 Motion to Quash; denying #18 Motion to Dismiss; denying #19 Motion to Vacate #36 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendants' Affirmative Defense Based Upon Avulsion, #37 Plaintiff's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, , #39 MOTION to Strike #25 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Request for Judicial Notice, #29 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Invalidity & Termination of Florida QC Easements Relied Upon by Def, #14 MOTION to Quash to Quash Service of Process by Globenet Cabos Submarinos Bermuda, Ltd. and Globenet Cabos Submarinos S.A., #15 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by John Doe 1 Akamai, 2 Aldea, 5 BT Global, 11 Columbus, 18 Inteliglobe, 22 Netflix, #16 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by Softlayer Dutch Holdings B.V.'s, #17 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by Silica Networks Argentina S.A. and Silica Networks Chile S.A., #18 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, , #19 MOTION to Vacate the Clerk's Default by Facebook Miami, Inc., #21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim for Mesne Profits in the Form of Disgorgement of Defendants' Profits, #23 Joint MOTION for Hearing /Rule 16 Conference, #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #14 MOTION to Quash to Quash Service of Process by Globenet Cabos Submarinos Bermuda, Ltd. and Globenet Cabos Submarinos S.A., #21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Rega, #25 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Request for Judicial Notice, #29 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Invalidity & Termination of Florida QC Easements Relied Upon by Defendants ; denying #21 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting #23 Motion for Hearing; denying as moot #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer ; denying #25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying #29 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Status Conference Re: Case Management/Posture Matters set for 5/18/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Roy K. Altman. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
May 10, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per DE #54 Status Conference Re: Case Management/Posture Matters set for 5/18/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Roy K. Altman. (pcs)
May 7, 2021 Filing 53 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Vacate the Clerk's Default by Facebook Miami, Inc. filed by South Spanish Trail, LLC. Replies due by 5/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Amended Notice of Taking Deposition)(Boegem, Sacha)
May 7, 2021 Filing 52 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by Silica Networks Argentina S.A. and Silica Networks Chile S.A., #15 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by John Doe 1 Akamai, 2 Aldea, 5 BT Global, 11 Columbus, 18 Inteliglobe, 22 Netflix, #14 MOTION to Quash to Quash Service of Process by Globenet Cabos Submarinos Bermuda, Ltd. and Globenet Cabos Submarinos S.A., #16 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by Softlayer Dutch Holdings B.V.'s filed by South Spanish Trail, LLC. Replies due by 5/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve John Doe Defendants, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3-Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Extention of Time to Serve John Doe Defts, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4-Dec 14 2020 Hearing Transcript Excerpts, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5-Order on Plaintiff's Motion Pursuant to Court Orders for Production)(Boegem, Sacha)
May 7, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re #18 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, Facebook's Notice of Joinder. Attorney Carly Abramson Kligler added to party Facebook, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kligler, Carly)
May 7, 2021 Filing 50 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #47 Notice (Other), 49 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Facebook, Inc.. (Schultz, Alec)
May 7, 2021 Filing 49 Clerks Notice to Filer re #47 Notice (Other),. Parties/Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties/mediator. (pcs)
May 7, 2021 Filing 48 Clerks Notice to Filer re #45 Notice of Striking. Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (pcs)
May 6, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE by John Does 1-100 re #18 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, Facebook's Notice of Joinder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kligler, Carly)
May 6, 2021 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 Joint MOTION for Hearing /Rule 16 Conference filed by South Spanish Trail, LLC. Replies due by 5/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Letter from Florida Department of Environmental Protection to Globenet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3-First Amended Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4-SST's Answer Affirmative Defenses and Cross-Claim to First Amended Counterclaim, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5-SST's Motion for Extension of Time, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6-Order on Globenets Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7-Consent to Use Easement)(Boegem, Sacha)
May 6, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Striking #42 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Joint Motion for Rule 16 Conference by South Spanish Trail, LLC (Boegem, Sacha) Modified to link to document on 5/7/2021 (pcs).
May 6, 2021 Filing 44 Statement of: Globenet Cabos Submarinos America, Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Globenet Cabos Submarinos America, Inc. (Kane, Robert)
May 6, 2021 Filing 43 Statement of: Caribbean Crossings Ltd, Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Caribbean Crossings Ltd., Inc. (Kane, Robert)
May 6, 2021 Filing 42 STRICKEN per DE #45 . Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Defendants' Joint Motion for Rule 16 Conference by South Spanish Trail, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Response to Defendants' Joint Motion for Rule 16 Conference)(Boegem, Sacha) Modified on 5/7/2021 (pcs).
May 5, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE by Caribbean Crossings Ltd., Inc. of Withdrawal of Affirmative Defense No. 17 (Kane, Robert)
May 5, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE by Globenet Cabos Submarinos America, Inc. of Withdrawal of Affirmative Defense No. 15 (Kane, Robert)
May 4, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION to Strike #25 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Request for Judicial Notice, #29 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Invalidity & Termination of Florida QC Easements Relied Upon by Defendants, #27 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Lack of Agreement with Authority from Globenet, #36 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendants' Affirmative Defense Based Upon Avulsion by Caribbean Crossings Ltd., Inc., Globenet Cabos Submarinos America, Inc.. Responses due by 5/18/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A, #2 Exhibit EX B, #3 Exhibit EX C, #4 Exhibit EX D, #5 Exhibit EX E)(Kane, Robert)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER OF TRANSFER to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 5/3/2021. Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
April 30, 2021 Filing 37 Plaintiff's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by South Spanish Trail, LLC. Responses due by 5/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint)(Boegem, Sacha)
April 30, 2021 Filing 36 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendants' Affirmative Defense Based Upon Avulsion by South Spanish Trail, LLC. Responses due by 5/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1925 Plat, General Acts and Resolution and 1941 Plat)(Boegem, Sacha)
April 30, 2021 Filing 35 Initial Disclosure(s) Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by South Spanish Trail, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order on Palm Beach County ICW Land, LLC's Motion to Intervene)(Boegem, Sacha)
April 30, 2021 Filing 34 Initial Disclosure(s) Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by South Spanish Trail, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order on Palm Beach County ICW Land, LLC's Motion to Intervene)(Boegem, Sacha)
April 30, 2021 Filing 33 Initial Disclosure(s) Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by South Spanish Trail, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order on Coastal Energy Resources LLC's Motion to Intervene)(Boegem, Sacha)
April 30, 2021 Filing 32 Initial Disclosure(s) Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by South Spanish Trail, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order on Coastal Energy Resources LLC's Motion to Intervene)(Boegem, Sacha)
April 30, 2021 Filing 31 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by South Spanish Trail, LLC (Boegem, Sacha)
April 30, 2021 Filing 30 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by South Spanish Trail, LLC (Boegem, Sacha)
April 30, 2021 Filing 29 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Invalidity & Termination of Florida QC Easements Relied Upon by Defendants by South Spanish Trail, LLC. Responses due by 5/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, #3 Exhibit Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, #4 Exhibit General Acts and Resolutions, #5 Exhibit Environmental and Land Use Law Section, #6 Exhibit Affidavit)(Boegem, Sacha)
April 30, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #14 MOTION to Quash to Quash Service of Process by Globenet Cabos Submarinos Bermuda, Ltd. and Globenet Cabos Submarinos S.A., #21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Rega John Doe Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time filed by John Does 1-100. Replies due by 5/7/2021. (Schultz, Alec)
April 30, 2021 Filing 27 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Lack of Agreement with Authority from Globenet by South Spanish Trail, LLC. Responses due by 5/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Caribbean Crossings' Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, #2 Exhibit License Agreement Between Atlantica USA LLC and Caribbean Crossing LTD)(Boegem, Sacha)
April 30, 2021 Filing 26 Clerks Notice to Filer re #24 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Various Re-filed Motions . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. AND Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
April 30, 2021 Filing 25 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Request for Judicial Notice by South Spanish Trail, LLC. Responses due by 5/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Voiding 1929 QCD and Motion to Test Legal Sufficiency of 1929 QCD)(Boegem, Sacha)
April 30, 2021 Filing 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #14 MOTION to Quash to Quash Service of Process by Globenet Cabos Submarinos Bermuda, Ltd. and Globenet Cabos Submarinos S.A., #21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim for Mesne Profits in the Form of Disgorgement of Defendants' Profits, #18 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, , #16 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by Softlayer Dutch Holdings B.V.'s, #20 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, , #19 MOTION to Vacate the Clerk's Default by Facebook Miami, Inc., #17 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by Silica Networks Argentina S.A. and Silica Networks Chile S.A., #15 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by John Doe 1 Akamai, 2 Aldea, 5 BT Global, 11 Columbus, 18 Inteliglobe, 22 Netflix by South Spanish Trail, LLC. Responses due by 5/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order on Case Management Conference)(Boegem, Sacha) Modified Relief and to add document links on 4/30/2021 (ls).
April 28, 2021 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Hearing /Rule 16 Conference by Board of Trustees of the Internal Improvement Trust Fund of the State of Florida, Caribbean Crossings Ltd., Inc., Globenet Cabos Submarinos America, Inc., John Does 1-100. (Schultz, Alec)
April 28, 2021 Filing 22 Notice of Reassignment of Assistant U.S. Attorney by John Steven Leinicke on behalf of United States Of America. Attorney Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski terminated.. Attorney John Steven Leinicke added to party United States Of America(pty:dft). (Leinicke, John)
April 23, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim for Mesne Profits in the Form of Disgorgement of Defendants' Profits by Caribbean Crossings Ltd., Inc., Globenet Cabos Submarinos America, Inc.. Responses due by 5/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Martin Case)(Kane, Robert)
April 23, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by John Does 1-100. Attorney Robert Russell Kane, III added to party John Does 1-100(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(Kane, Robert)
April 23, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Vacate the Clerk's Default by Facebook Miami, Inc. by John Does 1-100. Responses due by 5/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kligler, Carly)
April 23, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by John Does 1-100. Responses due by 5/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kligler, Carly)
April 23, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by Silica Networks Argentina S.A. and Silica Networks Chile S.A. by John Does 1-100. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kligler, Carly)
April 23, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by Softlayer Dutch Holdings B.V.'s by John Does 1-100. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kligler, Carly)
April 23, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by John Doe 1 Akamai, 2 Aldea, 5 BT Global, 11 Columbus, 18 Inteliglobe, 22 Netflix by John Does 1-100. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Kligler, Carly)
April 23, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Quash to Quash Service of Process by Globenet Cabos Submarinos Bermuda, Ltd. and Globenet Cabos Submarinos S.A. by John Does 1-100. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kligler, Carly)
April 22, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Carly Abramson Kligler re #10 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney Carly Abramson Kligler has not completed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. After filing a Notice in all pending cases, Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (pt)
April 21, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by United States Of America (Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony)
April 21, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Leeds Newhall on behalf of Board of Trustees of the Internal Improvement Trust Fund of the State of Florida (Newhall, Timothy)
April 21, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Carly Abramson Kligler (Kligler, Carly)
April 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Russell Kane, III on behalf of Caribbean Crossings Ltd., Inc., Globenet Cabos Submarinos America, Inc. (Kane, Robert)
April 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alec Huff Schultz on behalf of John Does 1-100. Attorney Alec Huff Schultz added to party John Does 1-100(pty:dft). (Schultz, Alec)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carly Abramson Kligler on behalf of John Does 1-100. Attorney Carly Abramson Kligler added to party John Does 1-100(pty:dft). (Kligler, Carly)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States Of America re 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case of Filing State Court Docket Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket Report) (Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Compliance with 28 USC 1446(d) by United States Of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Removal) (Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony)
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Attachment 3 of State Court Records is Blank. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the State Court Records attached within 24 hours. (pcs)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant, South Spanish Trail, LLC's, Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Cross-Claim to First Amended Counterclaim) Filing fee $402.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Counterclaim, #5 Exhibit Cross-Claim)(Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony) State Court Answer filed. Modified on 4/16/2021 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South Spanish Trail, LLC v. Globenet Cabos Submarinos America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Represented By: Robert Russell Kane, III
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Represented By: Alec Huff Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globenet Cabos Submarinos America, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Johnson Fishfeld
Represented By: Elisa Hevia Baca
Represented By: Robert Russell Kane, III
Represented By: Humberto H. Ocariz
Represented By: Mark Frederick Bideau
Represented By: Jared Reed Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caribbean Crossings Ltd., Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Johnson Fishfeld
Represented By: Elisa Hevia Baca
Represented By: Robert Russell Kane, III
Represented By: Humberto H. Ocariz
Represented By: Mark Frederick Bideau
Represented By: Jared Reed Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski
Represented By: John Steven Leinicke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syniverse Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telia Carrier U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claro Enterprise Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenlayer Inc
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hurricane Electric LLC
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cogent Communications Inc.
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Unicom (America) Operations Limited
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenturyLink Communications, LLC d/b/a Lumen Technologies Group f/k/a Qwest Communications Company, LLC
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equinix LLC
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Telecom (Americas) Corporation
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zayo Group, LLC
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitch Interactive, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Russell Kane, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCCW Global, Inc.
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Momentum Telecom, Inc
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Robert Russell Kane, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Business Network Services Inc.
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Miami, Inc
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EdgeUno, Inc.
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Telecom Inc.
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tata Communications (America) Inc.
Represented By: Carly Abramson Kligler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Internal Improvement Trust Fund of the State of Florida
Represented By: Anita J Patel
Represented By: Timothy Leeds Newhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Spanish Trail, LLC
Represented By: Carrie Stolzer Robinson
Represented By: Sacha Aaron Boegem
Represented By: Ricardo Alberto Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Florida Inland Navigation District
Represented By: Timothy Leeds Newhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?