Trump v. United States of America Featured Case
Plaintiff: Donald J. Trump
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 9:2022cv81294
Filed: August 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: West Palm Beach Office
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Motion for Judicial Review
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by United States Of America re 74 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,. No Transcript Requested. (Gonzalez, Juan)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 With the approval of the District Court and pursuant to the authority granted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 53(c)(1)(A)-(B), the Special Master has reviewed the parties' proposed protective orders, ECF Nos. 102 and 111 , and hereby issues the attached Judicial Protective Order. Signed by Special Master Raymond J. Dearie on 9/23/2022. See attached document for full details.
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 The Special Master grants the parties' motion for modest scheduling relief, ECF No. 108 . The attached Amended Case Management Plan reflects the parties' requested deadlines for the selection and engagement of a document review vendor and the production of Seized Materials. The Amended Case Management Plan also extends the deadlines for the parties to review and confer as to the Seized Materials to reflect that Plaintiff may not have access to the Seized Materials until September 30, 2022.Cognizant of the November 30 deadline for completion imposed by the Court, no further extensions will be granted in the absence of a timely showing of unforeseeable and extraordinary circumstances.Signed by Special Master Raymond J. Dearie on 9/23/2022. See attached document for full details.
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Judicial Protective Order by Donald J. Trump (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kise, Christopher)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE of Striking 107 Notice (Other) filed by Donald J. Trump by Donald J. Trump (Kise, Christopher)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Clerk's Notice to Filer re 107 Notice (Other). Proposed Order Docketed as Main Document; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then resubmit the proposed order as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures (jas)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION for Extension of Time to contract with vendor and produce materials re 106 Order, by United States Of America. Responses due by 10/7/2022 (Edelstein, Julie)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STRICKEN per DE# 110 , NOTICE of Filing Plaintiff's Proposed Judicial Protective Order by Donald J. Trump (Kise, Christopher) Modified text on 9/23/2022 (jas).
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Pursuant to the Order Appointing Special Master 91 and the Order Following Partial Stay 104 , the Special Master respectfully directs the parties as set forth in the attached Case Management Plan. Signed by Special Master Raymond J. Dearie on 9/22/2022. See attached document for full details.
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER FOLLOWING PARTIAL STAY. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 9/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (aes)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 PAPERLESS ORDER denying 99 Motion. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 9/20/2022. (dsy)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE by United States Of America of Filing of Proposed Protective Order (Edelstein, Julie)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Movant-Intervenor (Pro-Se) Raj K. Patel's Second Amended Dkt. 87 by Raj K. Patel. (jas)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Letter to Judge Aileen M. Cannon from Steven A. Colon. (jas)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 EMERGENCY MOTION That All Judicial Government Employees With Whom This Claim as Filed Comply With the Laws Set Forth Herein and the Issuance of the Indictments Set Forth Herein by Joseph Lednardi. (jas)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE by Donald J. Trump re 94 Order Proposed Agenda (Halligan, Lindsey)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE by United States Of America re 94 Order Proposed Agenda (Edelstein, Julie)
September 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Julie A. Edelstein on behalf of United States Of America. Attorney Julie A. Edelstein added to party United States Of America(pty:dft). (Edelstein, Julie)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE and Proposed Orders by Raj K. Patel. (jas) (jas).
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Movant-Intervenor (Pro Se) Raj K. Patel's Amended Amended Dkt. 87 by Raj K. Patel. (jas)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER. Signed by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 9/16/2022. See attached document for full details. (dsy)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Joint REPLY to Response to Motion re 49 Joint MOTION to Intervene / The News Media's Joint Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Obtaining Access to Court Records and to Unseal Same, With Supporting Memorandum of Law / THE NEWS MEDIA'S REPLY/NOTICE THAT THEIR JOINT MOTION TO INTERVENE IS RIPE FOR ADJUDICATION filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Associated Press, Bloomberg Lp, CBS Broadcasting Inc., Cable News Network, Inc., Dow Jones & Company, Inc., E.W. Scripps Company, Gray Media Group, Inc., NBCUniversal Media LLC, The New York Times Company, The Palm Beach Post, Times Publishing Company, WP Company LLC. (LoCicero, Carol)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 53 the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Elizabeth Seidlin-Bernstein. The Court reserves the power to withdraw permission for special appearance at any time. Failure to abide by any court order or failure to appear at any scheduled matter may result in immediate revocation of counsel's pro hac vice status. Local counsel must be ready to adequately represent the party at any time. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 9/16/2022. (dsy)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 9/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (dsy)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 DECLARATION OF SPECIAL MASTER. See attached document for full details. (dsy) Modified text on 9/16/2022 (ar2).
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DENYING 69 MOTION FOR PARTIAL STAY PENDING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 9/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (dsy)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM in Support re 69 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by United States Of America. (Gonzalez, Juan)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Movant-Intervenor Raj K. Patel's Amended Reply to Defendant's Responses re 48 Response to 1 COMPLAINT/Motion for Judicial Oversight and Additional Relief or Response to 69 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Raj K. Patel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(jas) (Main Document 87 replaced on 9/16/2022 in order to rearrange pages in correct order) (pcs).
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE by United States Of America Respecting the Courts Appointment of a Special Master (Gonzalez, Juan)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 SUPPLEMENT Pleading re: Special Master Nominations by Donald J. Trump (Kise, Christopher)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 RESPONSE to Motion re 69 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Donald J. Trump. Replies due by 9/19/2022. (Kise, Christopher)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Joint RESPONSE to Court's Order, Docket Entry 64 by United States Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Gonzalez, Juan)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Joint MOTION to Unseal Notice of Status of Privilege Review Team's Filter Process by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Associated Press, Bloomberg Lp, CBS Broadcasting Inc., Cable News Network, Inc., Dow Jones & Company, Inc., E.W. Scripps Company, Gray Media Group, Inc., NBCUniversal Media LLC, The New York Times Company, The Palm Beach Post, WP Company LLC. (Tobin, Charles)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re 74 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by United States Of America. Date received by USCA: 9/9/2022. USCA Case Number: 22-13005-F. (kpe)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Clerk's Notice to Filer re 68 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 74 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. It is not necessary to refile this document. (kpe)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 74 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (kpe)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal as to 64 Order by United States Of America. Filing fee $ 505.00. USA/FPD Filer - No Filing Fee Required. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (kpe) See DE 68 for image. Modified text on 9/9/2022 (kpe).
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 PAPERLESS ORDER: In formulating the proposed order of appointment to be filed tomorrow, which shall include the special master's schedule and order of operations, the parties are instructed to consider Defendant's position as to the approximately 100 documents discussed in the Motion for Partial Stay 69 . Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 9/8/2022. (dsy)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 PAPERLESS ORDER: Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion for a Partial Stay Pending Appeal 69 on or before September 12, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 9/8/2022. (dsy)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION To Unseal Notice of Status of Privilege Review Team's Filter Process by United States Of America. (Lacosta, Anthony)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony W. Lacosta on behalf of United States Of America. Attorney Anthony W. Lacosta added to party United States Of America(pty:dft). (Lacosta, Anthony)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by United States Of America. Responses due by 9/22/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Gonzalez, Juan)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE by United States Of America of Appeal (Gonzalez, Juan)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Filing Illustration to the Court. (jas)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Letter to Judge Aileen M. Cannon in Regards to Special Master from Philip Rakita. (jas)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Letter to Judge Aileen M. Cannon in Regards to Special Master from Angela D. Gupta. (jas)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION for Consideration of Special Master Appointment by Robert Rosenberg. (jas) Restricted document per chambers on 9/12/2022 (mf).
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION to Consider Special Master by Joseph M. Inman. (jas)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 PAPERLESS ORDER denying 36 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or for Relief From Judgment. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 9/6/2022. (dsy)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 PAPERLESS ORDER denying 42 43 44 45 46 47 the Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consents to Designations, and Requests to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. In light of the Court's ruling on the Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae 65 , these Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice are denied. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 9/6/2022. (dsy)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PAPERLESS ORDER denying 41 Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae. Upon review of the Motion, the Court appreciates the movants' willingness to participate in this matter but does not find the proposed appointment of amici curiae to be warranted. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 9/6/2022. (dsy)
September 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 9/5/2022. See attached document for full details. (AMC)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Letter to Judge Aileen M. Cannon from O'Rane M. Cornish, Sr.. (jas)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Aileen M. Cannon: Motion Hearing held on September 1, 2022. The Court heard argument from the parties on 1 Motion for Judicial Oversight and Additional Relief. Investigative Team Status Report [ECF No. 39] and Detailed Property Inventory [ECF No. 39-1] to be unsealed. Order to follow. Total time in court: 105 minutes. Attorney Appearances: Lindsey Halligan, James M. Trusty, M. Evan Corcoran, Christopher Michael Kise, Jay Bratt, Juan Antonio Gonzalez, Julie Edelstein, Sophia Brill. Court Reporter: Diane Miller, 772-467-2337 / Diane_Miller@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ad)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 (DUPLICATE OF DE# 60 PER FILER) AMENDED REPLY to 48 Response to 1 Motion for Judicial Oversight and Additional Relief by Raj K. Patel. (jas) Modified Text on 9/1/2022 (cds).
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Michael Kise on behalf of Donald J. Trump. Attorney Christopher Michael Kise added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:pla). (Kise, Christopher)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPLY to 48 Response to 1 Motion for Judicial Oversight and Additional Relief by Raj K. Patel. (jas)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Plaintiff's REPLY to 48 Response/Reply (Other) to United States' Response to Motion for Judicial Oversight and Additional Relief by Donald J. Trump. (Halligan, Lindsey)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by L. Martin Reeder, Jr on behalf of The Palm Beach Post. Attorney L. Martin Reeder, Jr added to party The Palm Beach Post(pty:ip). (Reeder, L.)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eugene Branch Minchin on behalf of American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Dow Jones & Company, Inc.. Attorney Eugene Branch Minchin added to party American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Eugene Branch Minchin added to party Dow Jones & Company, Inc.(pty:ip). (Minchin, Eugene)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deanna Kendall Shullman on behalf of American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Dow Jones & Company, Inc.. Attorney Deanna Kendall Shullman added to party American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Deanna Kendall Shullman added to party Dow Jones & Company, Inc.(pty:ip). (Shullman, Deanna)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel Elise Fugate on behalf of American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Dow Jones & Company, Inc.. Attorney Rachel Elise Fugate added to party American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Rachel Elise Fugate added to party Dow Jones & Company, Inc.(pty:ip). (Fugate, Rachel)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Elizabeth Seidlin-Bernstein. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15914351 by Associated Press, Bloomberg Lp, Cable News Network, Inc., E.W. Scripps Company, Gray Media Group, Inc., NBCUniversal Media LLC, WP Company LLC. Responses due by 9/14/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tobin, Charles)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles David Tobin on behalf of Associated Press, Bloomberg Lp, Cable News Network, Inc., E.W. Scripps Company, Gray Media Group, Inc., NBCUniversal Media LLC, WP Company LLC. Attorney Charles David Tobin added to party Associated Press(pty:ip), Attorney Charles David Tobin added to party Bloomberg Lp(pty:ip), Attorney Charles David Tobin added to party Cable News Network, Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Charles David Tobin added to party E.W. Scripps Company(pty:ip), Attorney Charles David Tobin added to party Gray Media Group, Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Charles David Tobin added to party NBCUniversal Media LLC(pty:ip), Attorney Charles David Tobin added to party WP Company LLC(pty:ip). (Tobin, Charles)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Richard Caramanica on behalf of CBS Broadcasting Inc., The New York Times Company, Times Publishing Company. Attorney Mark Richard Caramanica added to party CBS Broadcasting Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Mark Richard Caramanica added to party The New York Times Company(pty:ip), Attorney Mark Richard Caramanica added to party Times Publishing Company(pty:ip). (Caramanica, Mark)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dana Jane McElroy on behalf of CBS Broadcasting Inc., The New York Times Company, Times Publishing Company. Attorney Dana Jane McElroy added to party CBS Broadcasting Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Dana Jane McElroy added to party The New York Times Company(pty:ip), Attorney Dana Jane McElroy added to party Times Publishing Company(pty:ip). (McElroy, Dana)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Joint MOTION to Intervene / The News Media's Joint Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Obtaining Access to Court Records and to Unseal Same, With Supporting Memorandum of Law by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Associated Press, Bloomberg Lp, Cable News Network, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., Dow Jones & Company, Inc., E.W. Scripps Company, The Palm Beach Post, Gray Media Group, Inc., NBCUniversal Media LLC, The New York Times Company, Times Publishing Company, WP Company LLC. Attorney Carol Jean LoCicero added to party CBS Broadcasting Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Carol Jean LoCicero added to party The New York Times Company(pty:ip), Attorney Carol Jean LoCicero added to party Times Publishing Company(pty:ip). (LoCicero, Carol)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per DE# 11 . Dispositive Motions due by 5/10/2023. (swr) Modified on 8/31/2022.
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) terminated, Deadline set in error. (swr)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR JUDICIAL OVERSIGHT AND ADDITIONAL RELIEF by United States Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Gonzalez, Juan)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Fred Wertheimer. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15913582 by Former Federal and State Government Officials. Responses due by 9/13/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Certification, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Jay)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Norman Eisen. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15913581 by Former Federal and State Government Officials. Responses due by 9/13/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Certification, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Jay)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David K. Kessler. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15913576 by Former Federal and State Government Officials. Responses due by 9/13/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Certification, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Jay)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Harris Fischman. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15913570 by Former Federal and State Government Officials. Responses due by 9/13/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Certification, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Jay)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Roberto Finzi. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15913567 by Former Federal and State Government Officials. Responses due by 9/13/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Certification, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Jay)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brad S. Karp. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15913560 by Former Federal and State Government Officials. Responses due by 9/13/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Certification, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Jay)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Brief As Amici Curiae in Opposition to Former President Trump's Motion for Judicial Oversight and Additional Relief by Former Federal and State Government Officials. Attorney Jay Brian Shapiro added to party Former Federal and State Government Officials(pty:am). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amici Brief, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Jay)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 (UNSEALED) Notice by Investigative Team of Status of Review by United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (pcs) Modified to Unsealed PER DE# 62 on 9/2/2022 (cds).
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re: 37 Amended Certificate of Service filed by Raj K. Patel, 36 MOTION to Alter, or MOTION to Amend, 30 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Relief from Judgment or Order. Document(s) missing required signature(s) (Fed.R.Civ.P. 11(a)). (jas)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Raj K. Patel re 21 MOTION to Intervene, 25 MOTION to E-File. (jas)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Alter Judgment (Responses due by 9/13/2022), MOTION to Amend/Correct 30 Order on Motion to Intervene,, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, (Responses due by 9/13/2022), MOTION for Relief from Judgment or Order by Raj K. Patel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (jas)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 40 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (pcs)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE by National Security Counselors, Inc. of Potential Special Master Candidates. Attorney Andrew Franklin Knopf added to party National Security Counselors, Inc.(pty:ip). (Attachments: # 1 Letter, # 2 Att. 1 - Curricula vitae, # 3 Att. 2 - Supreme Court amici brief) (Knopf, Andrew)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 33 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Length. The page limitation for Defendant's response is hereby enlarged from twenty (20) pages to forty (40) pages. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 8/29/2022. (dsy)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Unopposed Motion To Exceed Page Length by United States Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Gonzalez, Juan)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Donald J. Trump. United States Of America served on 8/29/2022, response/answer due 10/28/2022. (Halligan, Lindsey)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE by United States Of America of Receipt of Preliminary Order and Attorney Appearance. Attorney Juan Antonio Gonzalez, Jr added to party United States Of America(pty:dft). (Gonzalez, Juan)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings as to Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2022 01:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Aileen M. Cannon, per DE# 29 PRELIMINARY ORDER ON MOTION FOR JUDICIAL OVERSIGHT AND ADDITIONAL RELIEF. (jas)
August 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PAPERLESS ORDER denying 21 Motion to Intervene and 22 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Upon consideration of the submissions and Rule 24 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court does not find the requested relief to be warranted. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 8/27/2022. (dsy)
August 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PRELIMINARY ORDER ON MOTION FOR JUDICIAL OVERSIGHT AND ADDITIONAL RELIEF. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 8/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (AMC)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUPPLEMENT to 1 Complaint and 10 Court Order by Donald J. Trump (Halligan, Lindsey)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER denying 25 Motion to E-file. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 8/26/2022. (dsy)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Summons Issued as to United States Of America. (jas)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to E-File by Raj K. Patel. (jas)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Raj K. Patel to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: rajp2010@gmail.com (jas)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Raj K. Patel. (jas)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Raj K. Patel. (jas)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Intervention and Memorandum in Support Granting the Motion for Intervention by Raj K. Patel. (jas)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Donald J. Trump re 1 Complaint filed by Donald J. Trump (Halligan, Lindsey)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated contact information for attorney Lindsey Halligan re 17 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. (cw)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address information for attorney Lindsey Halligan re 17 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney has not followed the required procedures for updating their address with the Court. Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their address. See the Court's website for detailed instructions. www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information. (cw)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Lindsey Halligan (Halligan, Lindsey)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 #13 the Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consents to Designation, and Requests to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys James M. Trusty and M. Evan Corcoran. The Court reserves the power to withdraw permission for special appearance at any time. Failure to abide by any court order or failure to appear at any scheduled matter may result in immediate revocation of counsels' pro hac vice status. Local counsel must be ready to adequately represent the party at any time. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 8/24/2022. (dsy)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re: #13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for M. Evan Corcoran. Filing Fee $200.00 Receipt #15943 filed by Donald J. Trump, #11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James M. Trusty. Filing Fee $200.00 Receipt #15943 filed by Donald J. Trump. Document(s) were filed conventionally that should have been filed electronically (CM/ECF Administrative Procedures). (jas)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of #13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for M. Evan Corcoran. Filing Fee $200.00 Receipt #15943 by Donald J. Trump. (jas)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for M. Evan Corcoran. Filing Fee $200.00 Receipt #15943 by Donald J. Trump. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jas)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of #11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James M. Trusty. Filing Fee $200.00 Receipt #15943 by Donald J. Trump. (jas)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James M. Trusty. Filing Fee $200.00 Receipt #15943 by Donald J. Trump. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order. (jas)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court is in receipt of #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Judicial Oversight and Additional Relief. To facilitate appropriate resolution, on or before August 26, 2022, Plaintiff shall file a supplement to the Motion further elaborating on the following: (1) the asserted basis for the exercise of this Court's jurisdiction, whether legal, equitable/anomalous, or both; (2) the framework applicable to the exercise of such jurisdiction; (3) the precise relief sought, including any request for injunctive relief pending resolution of the Motion; (4) the effect, if any, of the proceeding before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart; and (5) the status of Plaintiff's efforts to perfect service on Defendant. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 8/23/2022. (AMC)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #5 #6 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consents to Designation, and Requests to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for M. Evan Corcoran and James M. Trusty. Local counsel is instructed to refile the motions in strict accordance with Local Rule 4(b) of the Rules Governing the Admission, Practice, Peer Review, and Discipline of Attorneys. A sample motion can be found on the Court's website at https://www.flsd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-appearance. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 8/23/2022. (dsy)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re: #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for M. Evan Corcoran. Filing Fee $200.00 Receipt #15943 filed by Donald J. Trump, #6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James M. Trusty. Filing Fee $200.00 Receipt #15943 filed by Donald J. Trump. Document(s) were filed conventionally that should have been filed electronically (CM/ECF Administrative Procedures). (jas)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Clerks Receipt for Filing Fee, Two Pro Hac Vice Motions DE#5 , #6 received on 8/22/2022 in the amount of $802.00, receipt number 15943. (jas)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James M. Trusty. Filing Fee $200.00 Receipt #15943 by Donald J. Trump. Responses due by 9/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (jas)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for M. Evan Corcoran. Filing Fee $200.00 Receipt # 15943 by Donald J. Trump. Responses due by 9/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jas)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re: #1 Complaint filed by Donald J. Trump. Document(s) were filed conventionally that should have been filed electronically (CM/ECF Administrative Procedures). (jas)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of #1 COMPLAINT/Motion for Judicial Oversight and Additional Relief by Donald J. Trump. (jas)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT/Motion for Judicial Oversight and Additional Relief against United States of America. Filing fees $ 402.00, filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(jas)
August 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT/Motion for Judicial Oversight and Additional Relief against United States of America. Filing fees $ 402.00, filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trump v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Lindsey Halligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?