Federal Trade Commission et al v. Phoebe Putney Health System, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Federal Trade Commission and State of Georgia |
Defendant: |
Phoebe Putney Health System, Inc., Phoebe Putney Memorial Hospital, Inc., Phoebe North, Inc., HCA, Inc., Palmyra Park Hospital Inc. and Hospital Authority of Albany-Dougherty County |
Objector: |
Hospital Authority of Valdosta and Lowndes County |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv00058 |
Filed: |
April 20, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia |
Office: |
Albany Office |
County: |
Dougherty |
Presiding Judge: |
W. Louis Sands |
Nature of Suit: |
Anti-Trust |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 0053 Federal Trade Commission Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 15, 2013 |
Filing
124
ORDER granting 109 Motion for TRO. The Defendants are enjoined from taking any further steps to consolidate Palmyra and Phoebe Putney. It is further ordered that Defendants shall file their brief in response to Plaintiff's PI Motion 110 by Friday, May 31, 2013 and that Plaintiff shall file its brief in reply by Friday, June 7, 2013. Ordered by Judge W. Louis Sands on 5/15/2013. (bcl)
|
May 9, 2013 |
Filing
121
ORDER advising the Parties that no action will be taken on the FTC's motions until entry of an order from the Eleventh Circuit remanding this case to this Court for further proceedings re 117 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for C larification of Response Date or, in the Alternative, Extension of Time to Respond to FTC's Motions for TRO and Preliminary Injunction as to 110 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 109 MOTION filed by Phoebe Putney Health System, Inc., Phoebe Putney Memorial Hospital, Inc., Phoebe North, Inc., Hospital Authority of Albany-Dougherty County. Ordered by Judge W. Louis Sands on 5/8/2013. (bcl) Modified on 5/9/2013 (bcl).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission et al v. Phoebe Putney Health System, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission |
Represented By: |
Peter C Herrick |
Represented By: |
Richard A Feinstein |
Represented By: |
Edward D Hassi |
Represented By: |
Maria M DiMoscato |
Represented By: |
Joseph S. Brownman |
Represented By: |
Stewart R. Brown |
Represented By: |
Thomas H. Brock |
Represented By: |
Norman A Armstrong |
Represented By: |
Sara Y Razi |
Represented By: |
Matthew K. Reilly |
Represented By: |
Scott Reiter |
Represented By: |
W. Stephen Stockwell, Jr |
Represented By: |
Matthew Tabas |
Represented By: |
Willard K Tom |
Represented By: |
Priya Viswanath |
Represented By: |
Oscar Voss |
Represented By: |
Goldie V. Walker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: State of Georgia |
Represented By: |
Sidney Ray Barrett, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Isaac Byrd |
Represented By: |
Samuel Scott Olens |
Represented By: |
Alex F. Sponseller |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Phoebe Putney Health System, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Emmet J. Bondurant, II |
Represented By: |
Robert Michael Brennan |
Represented By: |
James C Egan, Jr |
Represented By: |
John Hinton Parker, Jr |
Represented By: |
Jonathan L Sickler |
Represented By: |
Lee Kavel Van Voorhis |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Phoebe Putney Memorial Hospital, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Emmet J. Bondurant, II |
Represented By: |
Robert Michael Brennan |
Represented By: |
James C Egan, Jr |
Represented By: |
John Hinton Parker, Jr |
Represented By: |
Jonathan L Sickler |
Represented By: |
Lee Kavel Van Voorhis |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Phoebe North, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Emmet J. Bondurant, II |
Represented By: |
Robert Michael Brennan |
Represented By: |
James C Egan, Jr |
Represented By: |
John Hinton Parker, Jr |
Represented By: |
Jonathan L Sickler |
Represented By: |
Lee Kavel Van Voorhis |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: HCA, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Kevin J Arquit |
Represented By: |
Emmet J. Bondurant, II |
Represented By: |
Nicholas F Cohen |
Represented By: |
Paul C Gluckow |
Represented By: |
Aimee H Goldstein |
Represented By: |
Charles Edward Peeler |
Represented By: |
Jennifer Rie |
Represented By: |
Meryl G Rosen |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Palmyra Park Hospital Inc. |
Represented By: |
Kevin J Arquit |
Represented By: |
Emmet J. Bondurant, II |
Represented By: |
Nicholas F Cohen |
Represented By: |
Paul C Gluckow |
Represented By: |
Aimee H Goldstein |
Represented By: |
Charles Edward Peeler |
Represented By: |
Jennifer Rie |
Represented By: |
Meryl G Rosen |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Hospital Authority of Albany-Dougherty County |
Represented By: |
Robert J Baudino, Jr |
Represented By: |
Emmet J. Bondurant, II |
Represented By: |
Michael A Caplan |
Represented By: |
David J. Darrell |
Represented By: |
Ronan Patrick Doherty |
Represented By: |
Frank M Lowrey, IV |
Represented By: |
Amy McCullough |
Represented By: |
Karin A. Middleton |
Represented By: |
Edgar Baughn Wilkin, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Objector: Hospital Authority of Valdosta and Lowndes County |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?