BIRD v. Sumter County Board of Education et al

Plaintiff: WILLIAM BIRD
Defendant: Sumter County Board of Education, EDITH GREEN, Carolyn Whitehead, MEDA KRENSON, MICHAEL LEWIS, WILLA FITZPATRICK, KEVIN PLESS, MICHAEL BUSMAN, ALICE GREEN, MICHAEL MOCK, SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND VOTER REGISTRATION and SHERRY RATLIFF
Cross_claimant: SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND VOTER REGISTRATION
Cross_defendant: MICHAEL BUSMAN, WILLA FITZPATRICK, ALICE GREEN, EDITH GREEN, MEDA KRENSON, MICHAEL LEWIS, MICHAEL MOCK, KEVIN PLESS, Sumter County Board of Education and Carolyn Whitehead
Case Number: 1:2012cv00076
Filed: May 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Albany Office
County: Sumter
Presiding Judge: W. Louis Sands
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 84 Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendant shall remit to Plaintiff within 30 days of the entry of this order $29,400.00 in attorney's fees and $1,184.74 in costs for a total of $30,584.74. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS on 5/27/2014. (bcl)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER for Plaintiff to submit evidence regarding the reasonableness of his requested attorney's fees within 14 days of entry of this Order. Defendant may file a response to such evidence, if filed, within 14 days of Plaintiff's submission of said evidence. Failure to submit the proper evidence may result in the denial of Plaintiff's request for attorney's fees. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS on 4/3/14. (wks)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice. The preliminary in junction ordered by the Court on 6/21/2012 is lifted. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W. Louis Sands on 10/28/2013. (bcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BIRD v. Sumter County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM BIRD
Represented By: WILLIAM W CALHOUN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumter County Board of Education
Represented By: David Arthur Siegel
Represented By: MAURICE L KING, Jr.
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDITH GREEN
Represented By: David Arthur Siegel
Represented By: MAURICE L KING, Jr.
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Whitehead
Represented By: David Arthur Siegel
Represented By: MAURICE L KING, Jr.
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDA KRENSON
Represented By: David Arthur Siegel
Represented By: MAURICE L KING, Jr.
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL LEWIS
Represented By: David Arthur Siegel
Represented By: MAURICE L KING, Jr.
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLA FITZPATRICK
Represented By: David Arthur Siegel
Represented By: MAURICE L KING, Jr.
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN PLESS
Represented By: David Arthur Siegel
Represented By: MAURICE L KING, Jr.
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BUSMAN
Represented By: MAURICE L KING, Jr.
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Represented By: David Arthur Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALICE GREEN
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Represented By: MAURICE L KING, Jr.
Represented By: David Arthur Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL MOCK
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Represented By: MAURICE L KING, Jr.
Represented By: David Arthur Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND VOTER REGISTRATION
Represented By: WILLIAM DALLAS NESMITH, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERRY RATLIFF
Represented By: WILLIAM DALLAS NESMITH, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND VOTER REGISTRATION
Represented By: WILLIAM DALLAS NESMITH, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: MICHAEL BUSMAN
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Represented By: MAURICE L KING, Jr.
Represented By: David Arthur Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: WILLA FITZPATRICK
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Represented By: MAURICE L KING, Jr.
Represented By: David Arthur Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: ALICE GREEN
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Represented By: MAURICE L KING, Jr.
Represented By: David Arthur Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: EDITH GREEN
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Represented By: MAURICE L KING, Jr.
Represented By: David Arthur Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: MEDA KRENSON
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Represented By: MAURICE L KING, Jr.
Represented By: David Arthur Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: MICHAEL LEWIS
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Represented By: MAURICE L KING, Jr.
Represented By: David Arthur Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: MICHAEL MOCK
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Represented By: MAURICE L KING, Jr.
Represented By: David Arthur Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: KEVIN PLESS
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Represented By: MAURICE L KING, Jr.
Represented By: David Arthur Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Sumter County Board of Education
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Represented By: MAURICE L KING, Jr.
Represented By: David Arthur Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Carolyn Whitehead
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Represented By: MAURICE L KING, Jr.
Represented By: David Arthur Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?