THOMAS v. DEAL

Petitioner: OTIS THOMAS
Respondent: GOVERNOR NATHAN DEAL
Case Number: 1:2018cv00181
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
0 Judge: THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF
1 Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER directing Plaintiff to supplement #1 MOTION for Change of Venue by December 7, 2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 11/15/2018. (mdm)
September 19, 2018 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to OTIS THOMAS (mdm)
September 19, 2018 US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF no longer assigned to case. (mdm)
September 18, 2018 1 MOTION for Change of Venue filed by OTIS THOMAS. (Attachments: #1 Various Case Related Documents, #2 Envelope)Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(mdm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMAS v. DEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: OTIS THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GOVERNOR NATHAN DEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?