THE DEMOCRATIC PARTY OF GEORGIA v. BURKES et al

Plaintiff: Democratic Party of Georgia
Defendant: Frederick Williams, Ernest Davis, Benny Hand, Annabelle Stubbs, Constance M. Burkes, Charles Lamb, CONSTANCE BURKES, ANNABELLE T STUBBS, CHARLES W LAMB, JR, ERNEST DAVIS, JR and BENNY G HAND
Case Number: 1:2018cv00212
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing Attorney Lindenbaum to pay the pro hac vice fee seven days from the entry of this order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 1/2/2019. (bcl)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Spencer Lee, IV on behalf of CONSTANCE BURKES, ERNEST DAVIS, JR, BENNY G HAND, CHARLES W LAMB, JR, ANNABELLE T STUBBS, FREDERICK WILLIAMS Attorney William Spencer Lee, IV added to party CONSTANCE BURKES(pty:dft), Attorney William Spencer Lee, IV added to party ERNEST DAVIS, JR(pty:dft), Attorney William Spencer Lee, IV added to party BENNY G HAND(pty:dft), Attorney William Spencer Lee, IV added to party CHARLES W LAMB, JR(pty:dft), Attorney William Spencer Lee, IV added to party ANNABELLE T STUBBS(pty:dft), Attorney William Spencer Lee, IV added to party FREDERICK WILLIAMS(pty:dft). Filed manually with permission of Chief Deputy Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(bcl)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by DEMOCRATIC PARTY OF GEORGIA filed by Kurt G. Kastorf. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Directing Entry of Final Judgment)(Kastorf, Kurt)
November 28, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL DARA LINDENBAUM - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (bcl)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Parties to file the appropriate dismissal documents no later than 12/11/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 11/27/2018. (bcl)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS: PI / TRO Hearing held on 11/9/2018. Court Reporter: Sally Gray.Time in Court: 3 hrs 30 mins. (bcl)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT ORDER and COURT ORDER Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 11/9/2018. (bcl)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING HEARING: re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DEMOCRATIC PARTY OF GEORGIA : Hearing set for 11/9/2018 02:00 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. The Defendants are enjoined from certifying votes for the 11/6/2018 election pending this hearing. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 11/9/2018. (bcl)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to DEMOCRATIC PARTY OF GEORGIA (bcl)
November 9, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by DEMOCRATIC PARTY OF GEORGIA ); Document must be refiled to include a description of exhibit(s). (bcl)
November 9, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL DARA LINDENBAUM - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (bcl)
November 9, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by DEMOCRATIC PARTY OF GEORGIA ); Notice to Counsel - Allegra J. Lawrence: Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please login as soon as possible and update your user account via Utilities - Your Account. (bcl)
November 9, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by DEMOCRATIC PARTY OF GEORGIA ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Additionally, information referring to an individual's official capacity should be added in the Party Text. NO NEED TO REFILE. (bcl)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Democratic Party of Georgia filed by Kurt G. Kastorf. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support with Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kastorf, Kurt)
November 8, 2018 NOTICE OF SETTING Evidentiary Hearing for 11/9/2018 10:00 AM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. [Note: Hearing set at the request of Plaintiff upon notifying the Court of its intention to file a request for PI/TRO and request for expedited hearing. Plaintiff is directed by the Court to notify all parties.](jbk)
November 8, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS no longer assigned to the case. (dwb)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3017843, $400 filed by Democratic Party of Georgia (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kastorf, Kurt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE DEMOCRATIC PARTY OF GEORGIA v. BURKES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Williams
Represented By: William Spencer Lee, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benny Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annabelle Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constance M. Burkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSTANCE BURKES
Represented By: William Spencer Lee, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNABELLE T STUBBS
Represented By: William Spencer Lee, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES W LAMB, JR
Represented By: William Spencer Lee, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERNEST DAVIS, JR
Represented By: William Spencer Lee, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENNY G HAND
Represented By: William Spencer Lee, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Democratic Party of Georgia
Represented By: Kurt G. Kastorf
Represented By: Allegra J. Lawrence
Represented By: DARA LINDENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?