SUMTER ELECTRIC MEMBERSHIP CORPORATION et al v. FORSTALL COMPANY INC et al
Plaintiff: ANDREW PAYNE, SUMTER ELECTRIC MEMBERSHIP CORPORATION, FEDERATED RURAL ELECTRIC INSURANCE EXCHANGE and A & L PAYNE FARM GP
Defendant: FORESTALL COMPANY INC and MICHAEL PETER SMITH
Case Number: 1:2019cv00088
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED #1 Notice of Removal, against All Defendants by A & L PAYNE FARM GP, ANDREW PAYNE, SUMTER ELECTRIC MEMBERSHIP CORPORATION, FEDERATED RURAL ELECTRIC INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Limited Release and Assignment, #2 Exhibit B - Amendment to Limited Release)(Peterson, Hugh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 1/15/2020. Dispositive motions due by 2/14/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(bcl)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A & L PAYNE FARM GP, FEDERATED RURAL ELECTRIC INSURANCE EXCHANGE, ANDREW PAYNE, SUMTER ELECTRIC MEMBERSHIP CORPORATION (Peterson, Hugh)
July 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Submission of Discovery and Scheduling Order re #8 Order - Rules 16/26 by FORESTALL COMPANY INC, MICHAEL PETER SMITH filed by JOEL L MCKIE.(MCKIE, JOEL)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to First Amended Complaint by FORESTALL COMPANY INC, MICHAEL PETER SMITH filed by JOEL L MCKIE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2016 Herbicide Application Contract -- Exhibit 1)(MCKIE, JOEL)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 6/25/2019. (bcl)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 7/22/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE filed by A & L PAYNE FARM GP, FEDERATED RURAL ELECTRIC INSURANCE EXCHANGE, ANDREW PAYNE, SUMTER ELECTRIC MEMBERSHIP CORPORATION re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, : (Peterson, Hugh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED #1 Notice of Removal, against All Defendants by A & L PAYNE FARM GP, ANDREW PAYNE, SUMTER ELECTRIC MEMBERSHIP CORPORATION, FEDERATED RURAL ELECTRIC INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Limited Release and Assignment)(Peterson, Hugh)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 Jurisdictional Statement by FORESTALL COMPANY INC (MCKIE, JOEL)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to Forestall Company Inc., Michael Peter Smith (ggs)
May 30, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Michael Peter Smith, Forestall Company Inc. ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. (ggs)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, : by Forestall Company Inc., Michael Peter Smith filed by JOEL L MCKIE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2016 Herbicide Application Contract)(MCKIE, JOEL)
May 30, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Michael Peter Smith, Forestall Company Inc. ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Plaintiff corporate entities, please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (ggs)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Forestall Company Inc. (MCKIE, JOEL)
May 30, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Michael Peter Smith, Forestall Company Inc. ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE, corrections made by case manager. (ggs)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3174060, $400 filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Waiver of Service, #3 Exhibit All Pleadings, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCKIE, JOEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUMTER ELECTRIC MEMBERSHIP CORPORATION et al v. FORSTALL COMPANY INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORESTALL COMPANY INC
Represented By: AUSTIN ATKINSON
Represented By: JOEL L MCKIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL PETER SMITH
Represented By: AUSTIN ATKINSON
Represented By: JOEL L MCKIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW PAYNE
Represented By: Hugh Peterson, III
Represented By: TYLER P BISHOP
Represented By: Hugh Brown McNatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUMTER ELECTRIC MEMBERSHIP CORPORATION
Represented By: Hugh Peterson, III
Represented By: TYLER P BISHOP
Represented By: Hugh Brown McNatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERATED RURAL ELECTRIC INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Represented By: Hugh Peterson, III
Represented By: TYLER P BISHOP
Represented By: Hugh Brown McNatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A & L PAYNE FARM GP
Represented By: Hugh Peterson, III
Represented By: TYLER P BISHOP
Represented By: Hugh Brown McNatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?