TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY v. BURNETTE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC
Plaintiff: THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY and TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY
Defendant: Burnette Construction & Develpment, Inc. d/b/a Burnette Roofing & Constrction and BURNETTE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00096
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 8/19/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BURNETTE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC (PURVIS, WILLIAM)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 Jurisdictional Statement by BURNETTE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC (PURVIS, WILLIAM)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BURNETTE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC (PURVIS, WILLIAM)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by BURNETTE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC with Jury Demand.(PURVIS, WILLIAM)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 ***DISREGARD - REFILED AT TAB 12*** Corporate Disclosure Statement by BURNETTE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC (PURVIS, WILLIAM) Modified on 7/9/2019 (ggs).
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 ***DISREGARD - REFILED AT TAB 11*** Jurisdictional Statement by BURNETTE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC (PURVIS, WILLIAM) Modified on 7/9/2019 (ggs).
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 ***DISREGARD - REFILED AT TAB 10*** DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BURNETTE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC (PURVIS, WILLIAM) Modified on 7/9/2019 (ggs).
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 ***DISREGARD - REFILED AT TAB 9*** ANSWER to Complaint by BURNETTE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC with Jury Demand.(PURVIS, WILLIAM)Attorney WILLIAM JUSTIN PURVIS added to party BURNETTE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC(pty:dft) Modified on 7/9/2019 (ggs).
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY as to BURNETTE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC. (WILLCOX, C)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BURNETTE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC. (bcl)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY. (bcl)
June 5, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY )- Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. (bcl)
June 5, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Additionally, aliases must be added using the alias tab wen adding defendants to the case. NO NEED TO REFILE. (bcl) Modified on 6/5/2019 (bcl).
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3178389, $400 filed by THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Summons Burnette Roofing & Construction, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(WILLCOX, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY v. BURNETTE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnette Construction & Develpment, Inc. d/b/a Burnette Roofing & Constrction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURNETTE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC
Represented By: WILLIAM JUSTIN PURVIS
Represented By: JAY HOLDER SMITH, JR
Represented By: DANIEL C HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: C JASON WILLCOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: C JASON WILLCOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?