RIVERSIDE TURF FARM INC et al v. FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Plaintiff: RIVERSIDE TURF FARM INC and FRANK B FLANDERS
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00102
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 Acknowledgment of Electronic Case Transfer Out by District of Eastern District of Michigan; Case Number 2:19-cv-12376. (bcl)
August 12, 2019 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Eastern District of Michigan. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 8/26/2019. (bcl)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring proceedings Eastern District of Michigan for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (bcl)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring proceedings Eastern District of Michigan for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (bcl)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER STAYING CASE for 120 days or until the Parties notify the Court that the Panel has issued a decision on the Transfer Motion. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 07/08/2019. (mdm)
July 9, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #9 Acknowledgment of Service filed by RIVERSIDE TURF FARM INC, FRANK B FLANDERS ); Wrong event used, the correct event is "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED" - NO NEED TO REFILE, docket entry corrected by case manager. (ggs)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to FORD MOTOR COMPANY filed by FRANK B FLANDERS, RIVERSIDE TURF FARM INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified mail return receipts)(SEABORN, L) Modified on 7/9/2019 to correct event and to edit docket text. (ggs).
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Staying Case by FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Frazier, Delia)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by L SHANE SEABORN (nop)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by All Plaintiffs Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3195470, $100 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(SEABORN, L)
June 19, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): Notice of Deficiency, ); Case Administrator Deficiency. Notice entered in wrong case; please disregard. (bcl)
June 19, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by RIVERSIDE TURF FARM INC, FRANK B FLANDERS ); Notice to Counsel - Daniel Studstill - Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER. (bcl)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (bcl)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to FRANK B FLANDERS, RIVERSIDE TURF FARM INC. (bcl)
June 18, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by FRANK B FLANDERS, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by RIVERSIDE TURF FARM INC ) - For future reference, per page 7 of the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, the name on the document and the name associated with the participants login ID must be the same. (bcl)
June 18, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by RIVERSIDE TURF FARM INC, FRANK B FLANDERS ); Notice to Counsel - Hudson & Seaborn - Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER; Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. (bcl)
June 18, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL L SHANE SEABORN - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (bcl)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FRANK B FLANDERS (SEABORN, L)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RIVERSIDE TURF FARM INC (SEABORN, L)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FORD MOTOR COMPANY Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3189223, $400 filed by RIVERSIDE TURF FARM INC, FRANK B FLANDERS (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(SEABORN, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIVERSIDE TURF FARM INC et al v. FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIVERSIDE TURF FARM INC
Represented By: L SHANE SEABORN
Represented By: CHARLES HUDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK B FLANDERS
Represented By: L SHANE SEABORN
Represented By: CHARLES HUDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?