PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. ISRAEL
Plaintiff: PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Defendant: HAROLD J ISRAEL
Case Number: 1:2019cv00116
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION identifying Corporate Parent PNC BANCORP INC., Corporate Parent PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP INC. for PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Ross, Jeremy)
July 18, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. (bcl)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Jurisdictional Statement by PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Ross, Jeremy)
July 12, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. (esl)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Ross, Jeremy)
July 11, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #4 Complaint filed by PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ); The Corporate Disclosure Statement and the Jurisdictional Statement should not be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. Please refile the Corporate Disclosure Statement and the Jurisdictional Statement by using the separate events for each located under Other Filings / Other Documents. (mdm)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Jurisdictional Statement by PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Ross, Jeremy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against HAROLD J ISRAEL filed by PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet SAME AS, #2 Exhibit TERM NOTE, #3 Exhibit LOAN REAMORT REQ, #4 Exhibit PAYOFF INFO 5/31, #5 Exhibit AMENDED RESTATED NTE, #6 Exhibit LOAN AMORT REQ, #7 Exhibit PAYOFF INFO 5/31, #8 Required Form JURISDICTIONAL STMNT, #9 Required Form CORP DISCLOSURE, #10 Summons SAME AS)(Ross, Jeremy) Modified on 7/10/2019 (esl). Complaint re-filed to remedy deficiencies
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (esl)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (esl)
July 10, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related documents: #1 Complaint, filed by PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ); A total of three deficiencies: (1)Complaint must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. (2) Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (3) Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. (esl)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HAROLD J ISRAEL Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3206905, $400 filed by PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet AS STATED, #2 Exhibit TERM NOTE, #3 Exhibit LOAN REAMORT FILE, #4 Exhibit PAYOFF INFORMATION, #5 Exhibit AMENDED RESTATED NOTE, #6 Exhibit LOAN REAMORT FILE, #7 Exhibit PAYOFF INFORMATION, #8 Summons AS STATED)(Ross, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAROLD J ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Jeremy Brent Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?