LUKE v. GULLEY
Plaintiff: DEMETRIUS RASHARD LUKE
Defendant: JAMEEL H GULLEY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00122
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by JAMEEL H GULLEY re #8 MOTION to Take Deposition from Defendant Jameel Gulley & Dougherty Judicial Circuit District Attorney Gregory Edwards (LOKEN, JACOB)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Hearing re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by DEMETRIUS RASHARD LUKE filed by JAMES NORMAN FINKELSTEIN. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit which shows that Defendant's allegations of fact in motion to dismiss are false, #2 Affidavit Affidavit which shows that Defendant's allegations of fact in motion to dismiss are false)(FINKELSTEIN, JAMES)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response filed by JAMEEL H GULLEY re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (LOKEN, JACOB)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #4 MOTION to Stay All Discovery, #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by DEMETRIUS RASHARD LUKE filed by JAMES NORMAN FINKELSTEIN.(FINKELSTEIN, JAMES)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Take Deposition from Defendant Jameel Gulley & Dougherty Judicial Circuit District Attorney Gregory Edwards by DEMETRIUS RASHARD LUKE filed by JAMES NORMAN FINKELSTEIN.(FINKELSTEIN, JAMES)
August 13, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #5 Response to Motion filed by DEMETRIUS RASHARD LUKE ); Document must be re-filed using correct event - Motion to Stay. (bcl)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE filed by DEMETRIUS RASHARD LUKE re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (FINKELSTEIN, JAMES)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE filed by DEMETRIUS RASHARD LUKE re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (FINKELSTEIN, JAMES)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE filed by DEMETRIUS RASHARD LUKE re #4 MOTION to Stay All Discovery, #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (FINKELSTEIN, JAMES)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay All Discovery by JAMEEL H GULLEY filed by JACOB W LOKEN. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(LOKEN, JACOB)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JAMEEL H GULLEY filed by JACOB W LOKEN. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Arrest Warrant, #3 Exhibit B - Indictment, #4 Exhibit C - Order Granting Nolle Prosequi)(LOKEN, JACOB)
July 19, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by JAMEEL H GULLEY ); Notice to Counsel - Howard J. Stiller - Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER. (bcl)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JAMEEL H GULLEY. (bcl)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against JAMEEL H GULLEY Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3215154, $400 filed by JAMEEL H GULLEY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Amended Complaint), #3 Exhibit C (Process, pleadings and orders), #4 Exhibit D (Notice of filing notice of removal), #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(CHOY, SUN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LUKE v. GULLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMEEL H GULLEY
Represented By: SUN S CHOY
Represented By: JACOB W LOKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMETRIUS RASHARD LUKE
Represented By: Howard J. Stiller
Represented By: JAMES NORMAN FINKELSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?