HORNE et al v. FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: ANNE B HORNE, MELVIN HORNE and HORNE REVOCABLE TRUST 1/10 2009
Defendant: SOUTHERN INSURANCE, FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, JOHN AND OR JANE DOES, SOUTHERN RISK MANAGERS OF CAIRO LLC, SOUTHERN RISK MANAGERS PROPERTIES LLC and CHARLES A THOMAS
Case Number: 1:2019cv00130
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint by FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand.(GLICKAUF, STEPHANIE)
September 23, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #19 Answer to Complaint filed by SOUTHERN INSURANCE ) - For future reference, all parties listed on a document must be selected when filing. Do not refile. (bcl)
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by SOUTHERN INSURANCE, Southern Risk Managers of Cairo, LLC, Southern Risk Managers Properties, LLC, and Charles A. Thomas with Jury Demand.(SCOTT, GAILYA) Modified on 9/23/2019 to add text (bcl).
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by GAILYA MCELROY SCOTT on behalf of SOUTHERN INSURANCE (SCOTT, GAILYA)
September 12, 2019 Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to Local Rule 6.2 re: #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Sever MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (bcl)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 Letter regarding Plaintiffs' request for Clerks Entry of Continuance Response to Motion to Dismiss re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Sever MOTION to Consolidate Cases (HORNE, MELVIN)
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.Civ.P. 15(a)(1)(B) by ANNE B HORNE, MELVIN HORNE, HORNE REVOCABLE TRUST 1/10 2009 re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A - Architectural Drawing 1st & 2nd floor, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B - Letter dated July 1, 2008 Southern Insurance RE Policy Limits, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C - Letter from Frankenmuth, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D - Complaint to Commissioner, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E - Certified Copy of Insurance Policy, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT F - Horne SEV Information, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT G - APPRAISAL (Valuation Report) by Frankenmuth, #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT H - APPRAISAL Report of Dale Boisso, Ph,D, re- valuation of 140 1st Ave NE, Cairo, GA, #9 Exhibit EXHIBIT I - NOTICE Pursuant to OCGA 33-4-6 and OCGA 10-1-390, #10 Exhibit EXHIBIT J - Letter from Frankenmuth Goodman Attorney)(HORNE, MELVIN)
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 2/28/2020. Dispositive motions due by 3/30/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 9/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(bcl)
September 10, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #14 Notice (Other) filed by MELVIN HORNE ); Document must be re-filed to include a description of exhibit(s). (bcl)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE ALL PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.Civ.P. 15(a)(1)(B) by MELVIN HORNE re #1 Notice of Removal,, (HORNE, MELVIN)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response filed by MELVIN HORNE re #9 MOTION to Remand (HORNE, MELVIN)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (, ), MOTION to Sever , MOTION to Consolidate Cases(, ) by FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed by STEPHANIE F GLICKAUF. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(GLICKAUF, STEPHANIE)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY re #9 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipts)(GLICKAUF, STEPHANIE)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SOUTHERN INSURANCE, SOUTHERN RISK MANAGERS OF CAIRO LLC identifying Corporate Parent SOUTHERN INSURANCE for SOUTHERN INSURANCE, SOUTHERN RISK MANAGERS OF CAIRO LLC. (MOFFETT, MATTHEW)
August 22, 2019 Notice of Deficiency - Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately as to SOUTHERN INSURANCE, SOUTHERN RISK MANAGERS OF CAIRO LLC & SOUTHERN RISK MANAGERS PROPERTIES LLC. (bcl)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by MELVIN HORNE filed by MELVIN R HORNE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum In Support Filed by All Plaintiffs)(HORNE, MELVIN)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/9/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Georgia Attorney Admission Fee Met by GAILYA M SCOTT (nop)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 Jurisdictional Statement by FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (GLICKAUF, STEPHANIE)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (GLICKAUF, STEPHANIE)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand.(GLICKAUF, STEPHANIE)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MATTHEW G MOFFETT on behalf of SOUTHERN INSURANCE, SOUTHERN RISK MANAGERS OF CAIRO LLC, SOUTHERN RISK MANAGERS PROPERTIES LLC& CHARLES A THOMAS (MOFFETT, MATTHEW) Modified on 8/1/2019 to add text (bcl).
July 29, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL GAILYA M SCOTT - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (bcl)
July 29, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILENotice to Counsel - STEPHANIE F GLICKAUF - Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER. (bcl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (bcl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against ANNE B. HORNE, MELVIN HORNE, HORNE REVOCABLE TRUST 1 10 2009 BY AND THROUGH TRUSTEES MELVIN AND ANNE HORNE Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3221736, $400 filed by FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Amended Federal Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - LTR to Horne, #5 Exhibit D - LTR to Glickauf, #6 Exhibit E - State Court Removal)(GLICKAUF, STEPHANIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HORNE et al v. FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN INSURANCE
Represented By: GAILYA M SCOTT
Represented By: MATTHEW G MOFFETT
Represented By: GAILYA MCELROY SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: STEPHANIE F GLICKAUF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND OR JANE DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN RISK MANAGERS OF CAIRO LLC
Represented By: GAILYA M SCOTT
Represented By: MATTHEW G MOFFETT
Represented By: GAILYA MCELROY SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN RISK MANAGERS PROPERTIES LLC
Represented By: GAILYA M SCOTT
Represented By: MATTHEW G MOFFETT
Represented By: GAILYA MCELROY SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES A THOMAS
Represented By: GAILYA M SCOTT
Represented By: MATTHEW G MOFFETT
Represented By: GAILYA MCELROY SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNE B HORNE
Represented By: MELVIN R HORNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELVIN HORNE
Represented By: MELVIN R HORNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HORNE REVOCABLE TRUST 1/10 2009
Represented By: MELVIN R HORNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?