SNOWDEN v. WALTON
Petitioner: STEVEN THOMAS SNOWDEN
Respondent: JOHN I WALTON
Case Number: 1:2019cv00207
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF
Referring Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by STEVEN THOMAS SNOWDEN ; ORDER finding as moot #6 Petitioner's first Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and granting #12 Petitioner's second Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 1/6/2020. (TQL)
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by STEVEN THOMAS SNOWDEN. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(dht) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2020: #3 Grievance forms) (dht).
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion for Immediate Assist Under Medical Distress and Relief Within Medical Care and Treatment as Well with States Plea Agreements; adopting #5 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 12/23/2019. (bcl)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (second) for Petitioner to either pay the filing fee or seek to proceed IFP. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 12/10/2019. (TQL)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 Notice with Regard to Filing of Pleadings and Other Papers. (mdm)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address upon release. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mdm)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against JOHN I WALTON by STEVEN THOMAS SNOWDEN (Attachments: #1 Grievance Form, #2 Envelope)(mdm)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by STEVEN THOMAS SNOWDEN. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(mdm)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #4 Petitioner's MOTION for Immediate Assist Under Medical Distress and Relief Within Medical Care and Treatment. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 12/4/2019. (TQL)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Immediate Assist Under Medical Distress and Relief Within Medical Care and Treatment Filed by STEVEN THOMAS SNOWDEN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(mdm)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Petitioner to either pay the filing fee or seek to proceed IFP. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 11/18/2019. (TQL)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (mdm)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS,filed by STEVEN THOMAS SNOWDEN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mdm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SNOWDEN v. WALTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STEVEN THOMAS SNOWDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN I WALTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?