ANDERSON v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: BARRETT ANDERSON
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00135
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Referring Judge: THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned - #5 Order to Show Cause sent to BARRETT ANDERSON returned as undeliverable. ***PLACED INMATE NUMBER ON ENVELOPE AND REMAILED #5 Order to Show Cause.*** (mdm)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directed to Petitioner. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 8/25/2020. (TQL)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned - #3 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, #2 Consent to Proceed Form Sent filed by BARRETT ANDERSON sent to BARRETT ANDERSON returned as undeliverable. (mdm)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (mdm)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to BARRETT ANDERSON. (mdm)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSagainst UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by BARRETT ANDERSON (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mdm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANDERSON v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BARRETT ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?