ELLINGTON v. LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC et al
Plaintiff: EDWARD ELLINGTON
Defendant: LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC and LOWE'S COMPANIES INC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00141
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LOWE'S COMPANIES INC, LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC identifying Corporate Parent LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC. for LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC. (SWARTZ, JAMES)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by LOWE'S COMPANIES INC, LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC.(SWARTZ, JAMES)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EDWARD ELLINGTON as to LOWE'S COMPANIES INC. (HOWELL, ROBERT)
August 17, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC, LOWE'S COMPANIES INC ); Wrong event used - No need to refile, the correct event is Stipulation.(mdm)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT STIPULATION re: Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint (IFP), by LOWE'S COMPANIES INC, LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC filed by JAMES JOSEPH SWARTZ, JR.(SWARTZ, JAMES) Modified on 8/17/2020 to revise docket text. (mdm)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EDWARD ELLINGTON as to LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC. (HOWELL, ROBERT)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC. (mdm)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LOWE'S COMPANIES INC. (mdm)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to EDWARD ELLINGTON (mdm)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by EDWARD ELLINGTON (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - Lowe's Companies, #3 Summons Summons - Lowe's Home Centers, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - Right to Sue Notice, #5 Exhibit Exhibt B - Pro Desk Standards, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C - May 17, 2019 letter, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D - May 21, 2019 letter, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E - Accomodation Substantiation Form, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F - June 8, 2020 letter, #10 Exhibit Exhibit G - May 27, 2020 letter, #11 Exhibit Exhibit H - June 10, 2020 letter, #12 Exhibit Exhibit I - June 16, 2020 letter, #13 Exhibit Exhibit J - Activity Stream)(HOWELL, ROBERT) Modified on 7/21/2020 to edit docket text. (mdm)
July 21, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by EDWARD ELLINGTON ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. Please refile using the event COMPLAINT IFP, so that a second filing fee is not paid.(mdm)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 ***ERROR IN FILING - FILED CORRECTLY AT #2 *** COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3519077, $400 filed by EDWARD ELLINGTON (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - Lowe's Companies, #3 Summons Summons - Lowe's Home Centers, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - Right to Sue Notice, #5 Exhibit Exhibt B - Pro Desk Standards, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C - May 17, 2019 letter, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D - May 21, 2019 letter, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E - Accomodation Substantiation Form, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F - June 8, 2020 letter, #10 Exhibit Exhibit G - May 27, 2020 letter, #11 Exhibit Exhibit H - June 10, 2020 letter, #12 Exhibit Exhibit I - June 16, 2020 letter, #13 Exhibit Exhibit J - Activity Stream)(HOWELL, ROBERT) Modified on 7/21/2020 (mdm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELLINGTON v. LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC
Represented By: JAMES JOSEPH SWARTZ, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOWE'S COMPANIES INC
Represented By: JAMES JOSEPH SWARTZ, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD ELLINGTON
Represented By: ROBERT D HOWELL
Represented By: ALFRED NICHOLAS CORRIERE
Represented By: MELISSA D PEELER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?