Cleghorn Financial OPerations, Inc. v. AMERIS BANK et al
Plaintiff: Cleghorn Financial OPerations, Inc. and CLEGHORN FINANCIAL OPERATIONS INC
Defendant: COLONY BANK, South Georgia Banking Company, AMERIS BANK and COLONY BANKCORP INC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00142
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BENJAMIN J RAZI on behalf of AMERIS BANK (RAZI, BENJAMIN)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by BENJAMIN J RAZI (nop)
September 1, 2020 Filing 28 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by AMERIS BANK Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3556267, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Thomas T. Tate 698879. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of GS)(RAZI, BENJAMIN)
August 27, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by SOUTH GEORGIA BANKING COMPANY (DEMOTT, MATTHEW)
August 27, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #26 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by AMERIS BANK ). Attorneys Benjamin Razi and Thomas D. Tate must file separate Entries of Appearance. Please file asap. (bcl)
August 26, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ROBERT D THOMAS on behalf of AMERIS BANK Attorney ROBERT D THOMAS added to party AMERIS BANK(pty:dft)(THOMAS, ROBERT)
August 24, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MATTHEW DREW DEMOTT on behalf of SOUTH GEORGIA BANKING COMPANY Attorney MATTHEW DREW DEMOTT added to party SOUTH GEORGIA BANKING COMPANY(pty:dft)(DEMOTT, MATTHEW)
August 24, 2020 Filing 24 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER: Pursuant to the Order to Show Cause of 8/11/2020, Plaintiff's counsel Matthew M. Hoesly, Harmeet K. Dhillon, and Nitoj P. Singh responded on 8/17/2020 and have shown cause for failing to comply with this Court's admission policies. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 08/24/2020. (nlvw)
August 21, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #23 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by SOUTH GEORGIA BANKING COMPANY ) - Attorney M. Drew DeMott must file a separate Entry of Appearance. (bcl)
August 20, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MATTHEW E EUTZLER on behalf of SOUTH GEORGIA BANKING COMPANY Attorney MATTHEW E EUTZLER added to party SOUTH GEORGIA BANKING COMPANY(pty:dft)(EUTZLER, MATTHEW)
August 17, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by CLEGHORN FINANCIAL OPERATIONS INC (MCDONOUGH, JAMES)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by MATTHEW MICHAEL HOESLY (nop)
August 13, 2020 Filing 20 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CLEGHORN FINANCIAL OPERATIONS INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3539360, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: JAMES F. MCDONOUGH III 117088. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(HOESLY, MATTHEW)
August 12, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CHRISTOPHER A RILEY on behalf of COLONY BANK, COLONY BANKCORP INC Attorney CHRISTOPHER A RILEY added to party COLONY BANK(pty:dft), Attorney CHRISTOPHER A RILEY added to party COLONY BANKCORP INC(pty:dft)(RILEY, CHRISTOPHER)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by NITOJ P SINGH (nop)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by HARMEET DHILLON (nop)
August 11, 2020 Filing 16 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CLEGHORN FINANCIAL OPERATIONS INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3536460, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: James F. McDonough, III; GA SBN: 117088. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(SINGH, NITOJ)
August 11, 2020 Filing 15 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CLEGHORN FINANCIAL OPERATIONS INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3535898, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: 117088. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(DHILLON, HARMEET)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 8/11/2020. (bcl)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by MICHAEL E ADLER (nop)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CLEGHORN FINANCIAL OPERATIONS INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3534081, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: James F. McDonough, III GA Bar 117088. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing For Michael E. Adler)(ADLER, MICHAEL )
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by BEN J MEISELAS (nop)
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CLEGHORN FINANCIAL OPERATIONS INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3527878, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: JAMES F. MCDONOUGH III 117088. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Meiselas, Ben)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by MARK J GERAGOS (nop)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CLEGHORN FINANCIAL OPERATIONS INC Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3527834, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: JAMES F. MCDONOUGH III 117088. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(GERAGOS, MARK)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CLEGHORN FINANCIAL OPERATIONS INC (MCDONOUGH, JAMES)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CLEGHORN FINANCIAL OPERATIONS INC. (sbd)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to SOUTH GEORGIA BANKING COMPANY. (sbd)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to COLONY BANKCORP INC. (sbd)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to COLONY BANK. (sbd)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AMERIS BANK. (sbd)
July 22, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by CLEGHORN FINANCIAL OPERATIONS INC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately.(sbd)
July 22, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by CLEGHORN FINANCIAL OPERATIONS INC ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE.(sbd)
July 22, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL MARK J GERAGOS, BEN J MEISELAS, MATTHEW M HOESLY, MICHAEL E ADLER, HARMEET K DHILLON, NITOJ P SINGH - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled.(sbd)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERIS BANK, COLONY BANK, COLONY BANKCORP INC, South Georgia Banking Company Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3519481, $400 filed by Cleghorn Financial OPerations, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Ameris Bank, #3 Summons Colony Bank, #4 Summons Colony Bankcorp, #5 Summons South Georgia Banking Company)(MCDONOUGH, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleghorn Financial OPerations, Inc. v. AMERIS BANK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleghorn Financial OPerations, Inc.
Represented By: JAMES F MCDONOUGH, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLEGHORN FINANCIAL OPERATIONS INC
Represented By: JAMES F MCDONOUGH, III
Represented By: HARMEET DHILLON
Represented By: W. Lewis Garrison, Jr.
Represented By: MICHAEL E ADLER
Represented By: Ben J. Meiselas
Represented By: BEN J MEISELAS
Represented By: MATTHEW MICHAEL HOESLY
Represented By: NITOJ P SINGH
Represented By: MARK J GERAGOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLONY BANK
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A RILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Georgia Banking Company
Represented By: MATTHEW DREW DEMOTT
Represented By: MATTHEW E EUTZLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERIS BANK
Represented By: ROBERT D THOMAS
Represented By: BENJAMIN J RAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLONY BANKCORP INC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A RILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?