HALE v. MUKES
Plaintiff: LIZZIE HALE
Defendant: WAQUANZA MUKES and JOHN DOES 1-3
Case Number: 1:2020cv00146
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE filed by LIZZIE HALE re #5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (JOHNSON, JORDAN)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT MOTION to Stay Discovery and discovery schedule pending resolution of motion for partial judgment on the pleadings re #5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by WAQUANZA MUKES filed by BRIAN EDWARD GOLDBERG. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in support of consent motion to stay discovery and filing discovery schedule pending resolution of motion for partial judgment on the pleadings)(GOLDBERG, BRIAN)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by WAQUANZA MUKES filed by BRIAN EDWARD GOLDBERG. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings)(GOLDBERG, BRIAN)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/4/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WAQUANZA MUKES re #1 Notice of Removal, (GOLDBERG, BRIAN)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to WAQUANZA MUKES (ggs)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against WAQUANZA MUKES Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3522359, $400 filed by WAQUANZA MUKES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Pleadings and process served on defendant, #2 Exhibit B, Answer filed BY defendant MUKES, #3 Exhibit C civil cover sheet)(GOLDBERG, BRIAN) Modified on 7/24/2020 to edit docket text. (ggs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HALE v. MUKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIZZIE HALE
Represented By: JORDAN JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAQUANZA MUKES
Represented By: BRIAN EDWARD GOLDBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?