ASH PAINT & BODY INC v. OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: Ash Paint & Body, Inc. d/b/a Georgia Truck Service and ASH PAINT & BODY INC doing business as GEORGIA TRUCK SERVICE
Defendant: OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY and Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00154
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 3/19/2021. Dispositive motions due by 4/19/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(bcl)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 Jurisdictional Statement by ASH PAINT & BODY INC (TURNER, MICHAEL)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASH PAINT & BODY INC (TURNER, MICHAEL)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand.(TAYLOR, WAYNE)Attorney WAYNE D TAYLOR added to party AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:dft)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Correspondence re: Service of Process Upon Defendant AXIS Surplus Insurance Company by ASH PAINT & BODY INC (TURNER, MICHAEL)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/21/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE GROUP, Corporate Parent OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate HOME-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate PROPERTY-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate AUTO-OWNERS LIFE INSURANCE, Other Affiliate AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE GROUP, Other Affiliate AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY for OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (DIETRICHS, MARK)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Jurisdictional Statement by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (DIETRICHS, MARK)
August 20, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately.Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed.(bcl)
August 20, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE.(bcl)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand.(DIETRICHS, MARK)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3543626, $400 filed by OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Underpleadings, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Removal)(DIETRICHS, MARK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASH PAINT & BODY INC v. OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MARK T DIETRICHS
Represented By: ALEXANDER A MIKHALEVSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Represented By: WAYNE D TAYLOR
Represented By: MICHELLE ALAMEDA SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ash Paint & Body, Inc. d/b/a Georgia Truck Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASH PAINT & BODY INC doing business as GEORGIA TRUCK SERVICE
Represented By: JEFFERY REMINGTON HUGGINS
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVIS TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?