JENKINS v. AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: ELLIOT JENKINS
Defendant: AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv00208
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 12/14/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far)
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE Notice of Filing Certification of William Parker by AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of William Parker in Support of Removal)(PHILLIPS, JESSICA)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE GROUP, Other Affiliate HOME-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate PROPERTY-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate AUTO-OWNERS LIFE INSURANCE, Other Affiliate OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY for AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (PHILLIPS, JESSICA)
November 3, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY ); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. Please add Auto Owners Insurance Group.(bcl)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate Home-Owners Insurance Company, Other Affiliate PROPERTY-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate Southern-Owners Insurance Company, Other Affiliate AUTO-OWNERS LIFE INSURANCE, Other Affiliate OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY for AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (PHILLIPS, JESSICA)
November 2, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #2 Answer to Complaint filed by AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY ); Notice to Counsel - Jessica M. Phillips - Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your telephone number via PACER.(bcl)
November 2, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #2 Answer to Complaint filed by AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately.(bcl)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY.(PHILLIPS, JESSICA)
October 29, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY ); Notice to Counsel - Mark W. Nonni - Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER.(bcl)
October 29, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY ); For future reference, documents must be filed to include a description of exhibit(s). Do not refile.(bcl)
October 29, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE.(bcl)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, Early County State Court Case # 2020-046, Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3610679, $400 filed by AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Certificate)(PHILLIPS, JESSICA) Modified on 10/29/2020 to update text (bcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JENKINS v. AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELLIOT JENKINS
Represented By: MARK W NONNI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JESSICA M PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?