LASH v. PERKINS et al
Plaintiff: STEVEN LASH
Defendant: NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, KENNETH ARNETT PERKINS, NATIONWIDE TRUCK LINES, INC. and NATIONWIDE TRUCK LINES INC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00023
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by NATIONWIDE TRUCK LINES INC, KENNETH ARNETT PERKINS re #11 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Recast Amended Complaint for Damages)(MELNICK, WAYNE)
March 11, 2021 Filing 12 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 9/13/2021. Dispositive motions due by 9/27/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 3/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling/Discovery Order)(dht)
February 23, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by STEVEN LASH filed by ROBERT M BEAUCHAMP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix Appendix for Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Exhibits Part One, #4 Exhibit Exhibits Part Two)(BEAUCHAMP, ROBERT)
February 23, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #9 Motion to Remand filed by STEVEN LASH ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. Per Page 13 of the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing, a motion and any supporting documents filed concurrently with that motion (e.g., memorandum in support, statement of material facts, exhibits, affidavits) should be filed in a single docket entry. The Motion to Remand will need to be converted into a text searchable PDF format and refiled attaching #10 MEMORANDUM in Support as a supporting document. (mdm)
February 22, 2021 Filing 10 ***FILED IN ERROR - FILED CORRECTLY AT #11 *** MEMORANDUM in Support filed by STEVEN LASH re: #9 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits Part One, #2 Exhibit Exhibits Part Two, #3 Appendix Exhibits)(BEAUCHAMP, ROBERT) Modified on 2/24/2021 to edit docket text. (mdm)
February 22, 2021 Filing 9 ***FILED IN ERROR - FILED CORRECTLY AT #11 *** MOTION to Remand by STEVEN LASH filed by ROBERT M BEAUCHAMP.(BEAUCHAMP, ROBERT) Modified on 2/24/2021 to edit docket text. (mdm)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 3/11/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 2/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far)
January 29, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate NCC OF AMERICA LTD for NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY. (DICK, LAUREN)
January 29, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Amended Document filed by NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY ); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case.Document must be re-filed using correct event Corporate Disclosure Statement.(mdm)
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY,amending #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (DICK, LAUREN)
January 28, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY ); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case.(mdm)
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 Jurisdictional Statement by NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY (DICK, LAUREN)
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY (DICK, LAUREN)
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 Jurisdictional Statement by NATIONWIDE TRUCK LINES INC, KENNETH ARNETT PERKINS (MELNICK, WAYNE)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONWIDE TRUCK LINES INC, KENNETH ARNETT PERKINS (MELNICK, WAYNE)
January 27, 2021 Notice of Deficiency: Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. NATIONWIDE TRUCK LINES INC & NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY are notified to file the required corporate disclosures immediately. Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. Notice to Counsel - CHRISTOPHER S LEE, your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER. (mdm)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against STEVEN LASH Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3692994, $402 filed by NATIONWIDE TRUCK LINES, INC., KENNETH ARNETT PERKINS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Nationwide Truck Lines' First Continuing Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(MELNICK, WAYNE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LASH v. PERKINS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: William H. Major, III
Represented By: LAUREN DICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH ARNETT PERKINS
Represented By: WAYNE S MELNICK
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONWIDE TRUCK LINES, INC.
Represented By: WAYNE S MELNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONWIDE TRUCK LINES INC
Represented By: WAYNE S MELNICK
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN LASH
Represented By: JESSICA C IDLETT
Represented By: ROBERT M BEAUCHAMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?