BOYD v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: WILLIAM JOE BOYD and JOANN BOYD PITTS
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Not Classified By Court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Case Number: 1:2021cv00057
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Referring Judge: THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Filing 11 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mdm)
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(mdm)
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mdm)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER finding as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and Directing Service. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 4/30/2021 (TQL)
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by WILLIAM JOE BOYD.(mdm)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 Consent to proceed before a full-time U.S. Magistrate Judge in accordance with the terms and conditions set forth in 28 U.S.C 636(c)(1) and (2). (mdm)
April 19, 2021 US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF added. US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER no longer assigned to case. (mdm)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Plaintiffs to clarify who the proper Plaintiff is, and to submit that person's motion to proceed IFP. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 4/12/2021. (TQL)
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to WILLIAM JOE BOYD, JOANN BOYD PITTS. (bcl)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (bcl)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by WILLIAM JOE BOYD, JOANN BOYD PITTS.. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(bcl)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by WILLIAM JOE BOYD, JOANN BOYD PITTS. (bcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOYD v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (NOTICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM JOE BOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANN BOYD PITTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?