FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN v. GROWING PROPERTIES LLC et al
Plaintiff: FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN
Defendant: Growing Properties, LLC, James Daniel Taylor, Willie Hampton and GROWING PROPERTIES LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00218
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by JAMES DANIEL TAYLOR with Jury Demand.(BURMEISTER, JEFFREY)Attorney JEFFREY A BURMEISTER added to party JAMES DANIEL TAYLOR(pty:dft)
January 27, 2022 Filing 13 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 2/28/2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 1/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far)
January 25, 2022 Filing 12 Jurisdictional Statement by GROWING PROPERTIES LLC (DENT, JOSEPH)
January 25, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GROWING PROPERTIES LLC (DENT, JOSEPH)
January 25, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by GROWING PROPERTIES LLC, WILLIE HAMPTON with Jury Demand.(DENT, JOSEPH)Attorney JOSEPH W DENT added to party GROWING PROPERTIES LLC(pty:dft), Attorney JOSEPH W DENT added to party WILLIE HAMPTON(pty:dft)
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN filed by SEAN P FARRELL.(FARRELL, SEAN)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by SEAN P FARRELL on behalf of FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN Attorney SEAN P FARRELL added to party FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN(pty:pla)(FARRELL, SEAN)
December 21, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN ); Document has the incorrect civil action number. For future filings, the civil action number should be reflected as 1:21-cv-218-LAG. NO NEED TO REFILE. (vs)
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN as to GROWING PROPERTIES LLC. (FRIEDMAN, SETH)
December 9, 2021 Filing 6 Jurisdictional Statement by FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN (FRIEDMAN, SETH)
December 9, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN identifying Other Affiliate FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, Other Affiliate Truck Insurance Exchange, Other Affiliate FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE for FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN. (FRIEDMAN, SETH)
December 9, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #4 Waiver of Service Executed filed by FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN ); For future reference, all documents must be filedtext-searchable PDF format. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 9. Do not refile.(bcl)
December 9, 2021 SECOND Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN ); All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1.(bcl)
December 8, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN as to JAMES DANIEL TAYLOR. (FRIEDMAN, SETH)
December 7, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN as to WILLIE HAMPTON. (FRIEDMAN, SETH)
December 7, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN ); All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1.(bcl)
December 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to GROWING PROPERTIES LLC, WILLIE HAMPTON, JAMES DANIEL TAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(bcl)
December 3, 2021 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager.(bcl)
December 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Growing Properties, LLC, Willie Hampton, James Daniel Taylor Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3960891, $402 filed by FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Growing Properties, LLC, #4 Summons to James Daniel Taylor, #5 Summons to Willie Hampton)(FRIEDMAN, SETH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN v. GROWING PROPERTIES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN
Represented By: SETH MICHAEL FRIEDMAN
Represented By: SEAN P FARRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growing Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Daniel Taylor
Represented By: JEFFREY A BURMEISTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Hampton
Represented By: JOSEPH W DENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GROWING PROPERTIES LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH W DENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?