ONESOUTH BANK v. SUMMER TIME MELONS LLC et al
Plaintiff: OneSouth Bank
Defendant: Summer Time Melons, LLC, Global Produce Sales, Inc., Aaron Curt Titshaw, SUMMER TIME MELONS LLC and GLOBAL PRODUCE SALES INC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00156
Filed: October 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Request for Local Rule 6.2 Clerks Extension re #7 MOTION to Remand by SUMMER TIME MELONS LLC (CADLE, IVY)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to re: #7 MOTION to Remand filed by ONESOUTH BANK (bcl)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 5/15/2023. Dispositive motions due by 6/14/2023. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 11/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(bcl)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by AMANDA M MORRIS on behalf of ONESOUTH BANK Attorney AMANDA M MORRIS added to party ONESOUTH BANK(pty:pla)(MORRIS, AMANDA)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order The joint, proposed Scheduling/Discovery Order requested from the parties by the Court's Rules 16/26 Order is now PAST DUE. Unless the proposed order is received within 14 days from this date, the case file will be referred to the district judge for possible sanctions.Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 12/2/2022 by GLOBAL PRODUCE SALES INC, ONESOUTH BANK, SUMMER TIME MELONS LLC, AARON CURT TITSHAW. Related document: #5 Order - Rules 16/26.(bcl)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by ONESOUTH BANK filed by GORDON GRANT GREENWOOD. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion to Remand)(GREENWOOD, GORDON)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ONESOUTH BANK identifying Corporate Parent OneSouth Financial, Inc. for ONESOUTH BANK. (GREENWOOD, GORDON)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by GLOBAL PRODUCE SALES INC, SUMMER TIME MELONS LLC ); All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1. ***PLAINTIFF ONESOUTH BANK MUST FILE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE IMMEDIATELY***(bcl)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 11/14/2022. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 10/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(fad)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by GLOBAL PRODUCE SALES INC, SUMMER TIME MELONS LLC ) - For future reference, documents must be filed to include a description of attachment(s). A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. An example of a properly identified attachment would be Exhibit A Letter from A. Hamilton to A. Burr. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 13. Do not refile.(bcl)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by GLOBAL PRODUCE SALES INC, SUMMER TIME MELONS LLC ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager.(bcl)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by GLOBAL PRODUCE SALES INC, SUMMER TIME MELONS LLC ); All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1.(bcl)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Global Produce Sales, Inc., Summer Time Melons, LLC (CADLE, IVY)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Global Produce Sales, Inc., Summer Time Melons, LLC.(CADLE, IVY)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court by Global Produce Sales, Inc., Summer Time Melons, LLC (CADLE, IVY)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Summer Time Melons, LLC, Global Produce Sales, Inc. Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4202497, $402 filed by Summer Time Melons, LLC, Global Produce Sales, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case.(CADLE, IVY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ONESOUTH BANK v. SUMMER TIME MELONS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OneSouth Bank
Represented By: GORDON GRANT GREENWOOD
Represented By: AMANDA M MORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summer Time Melons, LLC
Represented By: IVY NEAL CADLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Produce Sales, Inc.
Represented By: IVY NEAL CADLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Curt Titshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUMMER TIME MELONS LLC
Represented By: IVY NEAL CADLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOBAL PRODUCE SALES INC
Represented By: IVY NEAL CADLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?