HALL v. PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: Keithen B. Hall and KEITHEN BERNARD HALL
Defendant: Progressive Mountain Insurance Company d/b/a Progressive Insurance Company and PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY doing business as PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2024cv00016
Filed: January 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: W LOUIS SANDS
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2024 Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to Local Rule 6.2 re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY (bcl)
March 14, 2024 Filing 18 Request for Local Rule 6.2 Clerks Extension re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY (MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER)
March 14, 2024 Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by KEITHEN BERNARD HALL re #8 MOTION to Dismiss (BEAUCHAMP, ROBERT)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 3/12/2024 (bcl)
March 6, 2024 Filing 15 Request for Local Rule 6.2 Clerks Extension by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY (MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER)
March 6, 2024 Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to Local Rule 6.2 re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY (bcl)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Response to Motion re: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by KEITHEN BERNARD HALL. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 3/4/2024. (bcl)
March 4, 2024 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Object filed by KEITHEN BERNARD HALL ); The PACER login ID and password used to electronically file a document constitutes the Participants electronic signature for all purposes under the Federal Rules. For future reference, all documentsmust be filed filed using the user credentials of the name of the attorney in the signature block. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Do not refile.(bcl)
March 1, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss by KEITHEN BERNARD HALL filed by JESSICA C IDLETT.(IDLETT, JESSICA)
March 1, 2024 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #11 Response to Motion filed by KEITHEN BERNARD HALL ); Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection.(bcl)
February 29, 2024 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by KEITHEN BERNARD HALL re #8 MOTION to Dismiss (BEAUCHAMP, ROBERT)
February 29, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by KEITHEN BERNARD HALL re #8 MOTION to Dismiss (BEAUCHAMP, ROBERT)
February 29, 2024 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #10 Response to Motion filed by KEITHEN BERNARD HALL, #9 Response to Motion filed by KEITHEN BERNARD HALL ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Document #10 must be re-filed using correct event which is Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection.(bcl)
February 28, 2024 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by KEITHEN BERNARD HALL re #8 MOTION to Dismiss (BEAUCHAMP, ROBERT)
February 28, 2024 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by KEITHEN BERNARD HALL re #8 MOTION to Dismiss (BEAUCHAMP, ROBERT)
February 2, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY filed by CHRISTOPHER MEEKS. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - 12/20/21 Correspondence, #3 Exhibit B - 01/20/22 Correspondence, #4 Exhibit C - Jefferson Deposition, #5 Exhibit D - Complaint for Damages, #6 Exhibit E - 04/19/23 Filing)(MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER)
February 2, 2024 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent DRIVE INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC. for PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY. (MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER)
February 2, 2024 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY ); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. These must be added within CM/ECF while the document is being filed.(bcl)
February 1, 2024 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY (MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER)
February 1, 2024 SECOND Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY ); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. These must be added within CM/ECF while the document is being filed.(bcl)
January 30, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by SETH MICHAEL FRIEDMAN on behalf of PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY Attorney SETH MICHAEL FRIEDMAN added to party PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:dft)(FRIEDMAN, SETH)
January 30, 2024 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #4 Notice (Other) filed by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY ); Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Notice of Attorney Appearance The PACER login ID and password used to electronically file a document constitutes the Participants electronic signature for all purposes under the Federal Rules. Document must be re-filed using the user credentials of the name of the attorney in the signature block. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures.(bcl)
January 30, 2024 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY ); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. These must be added within CM/ECF while the document is being filed.(bcl)
January 29, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE Entry of Appearance by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY (MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER)
January 29, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY (MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER)
January 29, 2024 Filing 2 Jurisdictional Statement by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY (MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER)
January 29, 2024 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager.(bcl)
January 26, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Keithen B. Hall Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4555301, $405 filed by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company d/b/a Progressive Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Case Information Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Summons, #4 Exhibit A - Complaint) All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case.(MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HALL v. PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keithen B. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITHEN BERNARD HALL
Represented By: JESSICA C IDLETT
Represented By: ROBERT M BEAUCHAMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Mountain Insurance Company d/b/a Progressive Insurance Company
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER MEEKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY doing business as PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER MEEKS
Represented By: SETH MICHAEL FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?