LIGHT FOR LIFE INC et al v. OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC et al
Plaintiff: LIGHT FOR LIFE INC and DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG
Defendant: CHANG SUP SHIM, JUSTIN KIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC and PAUL IM
Counter Defendant: GINA CHO
Case Number: 3:2012cv00038
Filed: March 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Athens Office
County: Hart
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2015 Text Only Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge C ASHLEY ROYAL: Jury Trial scheduled on 3/16/2015 settled prior to voir dire. The Court convened and the jury was notified of the settlement. Court Reporter: Tammy Fletcher. (lap)
March 16, 2015 Filing 80 CONSENT ORDER Dismissing Case. Ordered by U.S. District Judge C ASHLEY ROYAL on 3/16/2015. (Attachments: #1 Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release)(ggs)
March 11, 2015 Filing 81 Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge C ASHLEY ROYAL: Pretrial Conference held on 3/11/2015. Court Reporter: Tammy Fletcher. (lap)
March 6, 2015 Filing 78 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by KEISHA O COLEMAN on behalf of OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC Attorney KEISHA O COLEMAN added to party OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC(pty:dft) (COLEMAN, KEISHA)
March 6, 2015 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Followup Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2015 at 10:00 AM in Macon before U.S. District Judge C ASHLEY ROYAL. (lap)
February 25, 2015 Filing 79 Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge C ASHLEY ROYAL: Pretrial Conference held on 2/25/2015. Court Reporter: Tammy Fletcher. (lap)
February 23, 2015 Proposed Pretrial Order Received and forwarded to chambers (ggs)
February 19, 2015 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (EASLEY, ERIN)
February 19, 2015 Notice of Deficiency; Pursuant to Local Rule 5.1 Discovery is not filed in the Middle District of Georgia - (related document(s): #77 Certificate of Service ). (ggs)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying #75 Motion to Continue. The parties are ORDERED to participate in mediation prior to the trial scheduled for March 16, 2015. Within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, the parties are ORDERED to INFORM the Court as to the date mediation is scheduled. Immediately following said mediation, the parties are FURTHER ORDERED to SUBMIT a Mediation Report regarding the result of the mediation. Ordered by U.S. District Judge C ASHLEY ROYAL on 2/17/15 (lap)
February 17, 2015 Filing 75 MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference and Trial Date (with Consent) by OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC filed by BYUNG J PAK.(PAK, BYUNG)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER for Pretrial Conference: Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2015 at 11:00 AM in Athens before U.S. District Judge C ASHLEY ROYAL. Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 12:00 noon on Monday, February 23, 2015. Ordered by U.S. District Judge C ASHLEY ROYAL on 2/12/15. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(lap)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #62 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #64 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Ordered by U.S. District Judge C ASHLEY ROYAL on 2/12/15 (lap)
February 12, 2015 NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING: Jury Trial specially set for 3/16/2015 at 9:00 AM in Athens before U.S. District Judge C ASHLEY ROYAL. (lap)
January 26, 2015 Filing 72 EXHIBIT(S) Response of Plaintiffs to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts and Statement of Facts as to which Plaintiffs Contend Genuine Dispute Remains by DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC re #64 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Affidavit of David Byung Kook Kang in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment)(EASLEY, ERIN)
January 26, 2015 Filing 71 EXHIBIT(S) Response of Plaintiffs to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts and Statement of Facts as to which Plaintiffs Contend Genuine Dispute Remains by DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC re #62 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Affidavit of David Byung Kook Kang in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment)(EASLEY, ERIN)
January 26, 2015 Notice of Deficiency; Other - The Exhibit to both of these documents must be rescanned and filed as an Exhibit and linked back to both documents. The existing document has only every other page (i.e. 1, 3, 5, etc.) Please scan in all pages and refile. (related document(s): #65 Response to Motion, filed by LIGHT FOR LIFE INC, DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, #66 Response to Motion, filed by LIGHT FOR LIFE INC, DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG ). (ggs)
January 23, 2015 Filing 70 REPLY to Response filed by OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC(a Georgia nor-for-profit corporation) re #64 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (PAK, BYUNG)
January 23, 2015 Filing 69 REPLY to Response filed by PAUL IM, JUSTIN KIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM re #62 MOTION for Summary Judgment (PAK, BYUNG)
January 23, 2015 Filing 68 STIPULATION of Dismissal by DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC (SANFORD, BYRON)
January 12, 2015 Notice of Deficiency; Dismissal must be signed by all parties who have appeared or by leave of court. Please refer to Fed.R.Civ.P 41a(1) (A)(ii) - (related document(s): #67 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by LIGHT FOR LIFE INC, DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG ). (ggs)
January 9, 2015 Filing 67 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC (EASLEY, ERIN)
January 9, 2015 Filing 66 RESPONSE filed by DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC re #62 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts and Statement of Facts as to which Plaintiffs Contend Genuine Dispute Remains)(EASLEY, ERIN)
January 9, 2015 Filing 65 RESPONSE filed by DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC re #64 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts and Statement of Facts as to which Plaintiffs Contend Genuine Dispute Remains)(EASLEY, ERIN)
December 19, 2014 Filing 64 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC(a Georgia nor-for-profit corporation) filed by BYUNG J PAK.(PAK, BYUNG)
December 19, 2014 Filing 63 Statement of Material Facts filed by PAUL IM, JUSTIN KIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM re #62 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Justin Kim, #2 Exhibit B: Declaration of Andrew Kang, #3 Exhibit C: Declaration of Alice Glenn, #4 Exhibit D: Declaration of Chang Shim, #5 Exhibit E: Declaration of Paul Im, #6 Exhibit F: Transcript of David Byung Kook Kang Deposition)(PAK, BYUNG)
December 19, 2014 Filing 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment by PAUL IM, JUSTIN KIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM filed by BYUNG J PAK. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(PAK, BYUNG)
November 7, 2014 Filing 61 NOTICE of Deposition of David Byung Kook Kang by PAUL IM, JUSTIN KIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM (PAK, BYUNG)
November 7, 2014 Filing 60 NOTICE of Deposition of Gina Cho (Amended) by PAUL IM, JUSTIN KIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM (PAK, BYUNG)
November 7, 2014 Notice of Deficiency; Discovery is not to be filed. Please see MDGA Local Rule 5.1. (related document(s): #61 Notice (Other) filed by JUSTIN KIM, CHANG SUP SHIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, PAUL IM, #60 Notice (Other) filed by JUSTIN KIM, CHANG SUP SHIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, PAUL IM ). (ggs)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying #57 Motion to Stay. Discovery must be complete by November 19, 2014. Dispostive motions are due by December 19, 2014. No extensions to the briefing schedule will be granted. Ordered by U.S. District Judge C ASHLEY ROYAL on 9/5/14 (lap)
September 5, 2014 Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge C ASHLEY ROYAL: Telephone Conference held on 9/4/2014. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded.) (lap)
August 27, 2014 NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING ON MOTION re #57 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Stay Discovery: Telephone Conference/Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2014 at 10:00 AM before U.S. District Judge C ASHLEY ROYAL. Call will be initiated by the Court. (lap)
August 18, 2014 Filing 57 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Stay Discovery by GINA CHO, DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG filed by BYRON M G SANFORD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from Dr. Edward Wysong)(SANFORD, BYRON)
May 20, 2014 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #56 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney KATRINA M QUICKER terminated. Ordered by U.S. District Judge C ASHLEY ROYAL on 5/20/2014. (adp)
May 19, 2014 Filing 56 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by PAUL IM, JUSTIN KIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM filed by KATRINA M QUICKER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Withdrawal of Appearance)(QUICKER, KATRINA)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Extending Limited Stay for six (6) months from the date of this Order. At the conclusion of the six (6) month extension of the partial stay of proceedings, the parties shall have a period of four (4) additional months in which to complete all remaining discovery. Ordered by U.S. District Judge C. Ashley Royal on 11/19/13. (lap)
November 18, 2013 Remark: Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' and Counter-Defendant's Motion for a Stay of Proceedings Per Instructions From Telphone Conference of November 12, 2013 Received and Emailed to Chambers. (cma)
November 15, 2013 Filing 54 Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge C. Ashley Royal: Telephone Conference held on 11/12/2013 (Court Reporter Digitally Recorded.) (lap)
October 25, 2013 Filing 53 REPORT filed by BYRON M G SANFORD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Report of Dr Edward Wysong, M.D.)(SANFORD, BYRON)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER for Medical Status Report. Discovery is extended to 11/12/13. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 9/19/13. (lap)
September 19, 2013 Filing 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge C. Ashley Royal: Telephone Conference held on 9/12/2013 (Court Reporter Digitally Recorded.) (lap)
September 19, 2013 NOTICE of SETTING Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 11/12/2013 at 11:00 AM before Judge C. Ashley Royal. Call will be initiated by the Court. (lap)
August 1, 2013 NOTICE of SETTING Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 9/12/2013 at 11:00 AM before Judge C. Ashley Royal. Call will be initiated by the Court. (lap)
July 31, 2013 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GINA CHO, DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC re #49 Affidavit (Easley, ERIN)
July 31, 2013 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT re #48 MOTION to Stay Of Proceedings by GINA CHO, DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC (Easley, ERIN)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #48 Parties' Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings. All proceedings are hereby STAYED for sixty (60) days until Monday, September 30, 2013, for good cause shown. It is further ORDERED that a telephone conference is set for 11:00 a.m. on Thursday, September 12, 2013; counsel shall be prepared to discuss the propriety of extending the temporary stay beyond the sixty (60) days herein granted, modifying it, or simply allowing it to expire. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 07/31/2013. (lmh)
July 26, 2013 Filing 48 MOTION to Stay Of Proceedings by GINA CHO, DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC filed by BYRON M G SANFORD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(SANFORD, BYRON)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #47 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Parties have until August 7, 2013, to complete discovery and until September 23, 2013, to file Daubert motions and dispositive motions. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 05/13/2013. (lmh)
May 10, 2013 Filing 47 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by PAUL IM, JUSTIN KIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM filed by Katrina M Quicker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quicker, Katrina)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #45 Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants' Motion for Additional Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. All parties are hereby authorized to serve no more than twenty (20) additional interrogatories and no more than twenty (20) additional document requests in excess of L.R. 33.1 and 34. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 03/29/2013. (lmh)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying #34 Motion for Entry of Default; denying #42 Motion for Leave to Amend. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 3/26/13 (lap)
February 26, 2013 Filing 45 MOTION for Discovery by GINA CHO, DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC filed by ERIN A SCHAUB. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Motion Requesting Permission for Additional Interrogatories and Document Requests)(SCHAUB, ERIN)
February 26, 2013 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ISIDOR J KIM on behalf of PAUL IM, JUSTIN KIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM (KIM, ISIDOR)
January 30, 2013 Filing 43 RESPONSE filed by PAUL IM, JUSTIN KIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM re #42 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Quicker, Katrina)
January 9, 2013 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC filed by DAVID MARK MESSER.(MESSER, DAVID)
January 4, 2013 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHANG SUP SHIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, JUSTIN KIM, PAUL IM as to GINA CHO. (Quicker, Katrina)
December 27, 2012 Filing 40 ANSWER to #36 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by GINA CHO, DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC(a Georgia not-for-profit corporation).(SANFORD, BYRON)
December 26, 2012 Filing 39 ANSWER to #22 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC(a Georgia not-for-profit corporation).(SANFORD, BYRON)
December 26, 2012 Filing 38 RESPONSE filed by DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC (a Georgia not-for-profit corporation) re #34 MOTION for Entry of Default as to (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Default, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum in Support) (SANFORD, BYRON)
December 17, 2012 Filing 37 Summons Issued as to GINA CHO on 12/17/2012. (ggs)
December 11, 2012 Filing 36 AMENDED ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against GINA CHO, DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC by CHANG SUP SHIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, JUSTIN KIM, PAUL IM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Quicker, Katrina)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Joinder. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 12/6/12 (lap)
December 5, 2012 Filing 34 MOTION for Entry of Default as to by JUSTIN KIM filed by BYUNG J PAK. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment)(PAK, BYUNG)
November 26, 2012 Filing 33 REPLY to Response filed by PAUL IM, JUSTIN KIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM re #25 MOTION for Joinder (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quicker, Katrina)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 4/9/13. Dispositive motions due by 5/24/13. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 11/20/12. (lap)
November 15, 2012 Proposed Scheduling/Discovery Order Received and forwarded to Chambers. (ggs)
November 15, 2012 Filing 31 ***DISREGARD - PROPOSED ORDER TO BE E-MAILED TO CLERK*** 16/26 Discovery Report filed by PAUL IM, DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, JUSTIN KIM, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM. Related document: #18 Order - Rules 16/26.(SCHAUB, ERIN) Modified on 11/16/2012 (ggs).
November 9, 2012 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order. by PAUL IM, DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, JUSTIN KIM, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM filed by ERIN A SCHAUB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SCHAUB, ERIN)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #30 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order. Parties have until November 15, 2012, to file their Joint Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 11/09/20. (lmh)
November 8, 2012 Filing 29 RESPONSE filed by DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC re #25 MOTION for Joinder (SCHAUB, ERIN)
November 8, 2012 Filing 28 STIPULATION by PAUL IM, DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, JUSTIN KIM, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM (SCHAUB, ERIN)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 11/2/12 (lap)
October 22, 2012 Filing 26 ***Arbitration Opt Out Letter by Defendants (Quicker, Katrina)
October 18, 2012 Filing 25 MOTION for Joinder by PAUL IM, JUSTIN KIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM filed by Katrina M Quicker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Quicker, Katrina)
October 10, 2012 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIGHT FOR LIFE INC (SANFORD, BYRON)
October 9, 2012 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC (Quicker, Katrina)
October 9, 2012 Filing 22 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC by CHANG SUP SHIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, PAUL IM, JUSTIN KIM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Certificate of Service)(Quicker, Katrina)
October 8, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BYUNG J PAK on behalf of All Defendants (PAK, BYUNG)
October 5, 2012 Filing 20 MOTION for Reconsideration re #17 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, by PAUL IM, JUSTIN KIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM filed by Katrina M Quicker. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quicker, Katrina)
October 1, 2012 Filing 19 Arbitration Referral Letter sent 10/1/2012 (hrm)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery Order due by 11/8/12. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 9/24/12. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(lap)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER finding as moot #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 9/24/12 (lap)
July 30, 2012 Filing 16 REPLY to Response filed by PAUL IM, JUSTIN KIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Amended Complaint) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Amended Complaint) (Quicker, Katrina)
July 13, 2012 Filing 15 RESPONSE filed by DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Amended Complaint) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Amended Complaint) (SANFORD, BYRON)
June 29, 2012 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Amended Complaint) by PAUL IM, JUSTIN KIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM filed by Katrina M Quicker. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Quicker, Katrina)
June 20, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katrina M Quicker on behalf of PAUL IM, JUSTIN KIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM (Quicker, Katrina)
June 12, 2012 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (SANFORD, BYRON)
June 12, 2012 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants.,filed by LIGHT FOR LIFE INC, DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exibit A - Certificates of Registration of Copyrights, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - WIPO Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - WIPO Panel Order 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Trademark Applications)(SANFORD, BYRON)
May 29, 2012 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by PAUL IM, JUSTIN KIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM filed by RICHARD W MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Certificate of Service, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, RICHARD)
April 25, 2012 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint by PAUL IM, JUSTIN KIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM (MILLER, RICHARD)
April 25, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by RICHARD W MILLER on behalf of PAUL IM, JUSTIN KIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM (MILLER, RICHARD)
April 18, 2012 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (SCHAUB, ERIN)
March 30, 2012 Filing 6 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG, LIGHT FOR LIFE INC (ggs)
March 30, 2012 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to JUSTIN KIM on 3/30/2012. (ggs)
March 30, 2012 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CHANG SUP SHIM on 3/30/2012. (ggs)
March 30, 2012 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PAUL IM on 3/30/2012. (ggs)
March 30, 2012 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC on 3/30/2012. (ggs)
March 30, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PAUL IM, JUSTIN KIM, OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC, CHANG SUP SHIM. Filing Fee $350, Receipt Number 1329401, filed by LIGHT FOR LIFE INC, DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIGHT FOR LIFE INC et al v. OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIGHT FOR LIFE INC
Represented By: DAVID MARK MESSER
Represented By: BYRON M G SANFORD
Represented By: ERIN A EASLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID BYUNG KOOK KANG
Represented By: DAVID MARK MESSER
Represented By: BYRON M G SANFORD
Represented By: ERIN A EASLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHANG SUP SHIM
Represented By: RICHARD W MILLER
Represented By: KATRINA M QUICKER
Represented By: BYUNG J PAK
Represented By: ISIDOR J KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTIN KIM
Represented By: RICHARD W MILLER
Represented By: KATRINA M QUICKER
Represented By: BYUNG J PAK
Represented By: ISIDOR J KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OUR FIRM FOUNDATION FOR KOREANS INC
Represented By: RICHARD W MILLER
Represented By: KEISHA O COLEMAN
Represented By: KATRINA M QUICKER
Represented By: BYUNG J PAK
Represented By: ISIDOR J KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL IM
Represented By: RICHARD W MILLER
Represented By: KATRINA M QUICKER
Represented By: BYUNG J PAK
Represented By: ISIDOR J KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: GINA CHO
Represented By: BYRON M G SANFORD
Represented By: ERIN A EASLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?