MERIAL INC, et al v. CEVA SANTE ANIMALE SA, et al
Plaintiff: |
MERIAL INC and MERIAL SAS |
Defendant: |
CEVA SANTE ANIMALE SA, HORIZON VALLEY GENERICS INC, TRUE SCIENCE HOLDINGS, LLC and TRURX LLC |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00040 |
Filed: |
April 6, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia |
Office: |
Athens Office |
County: |
Clarke |
Presiding Judge: |
CLAY D LAND |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 26, 2016 |
Filing
125
ORDER. Ceva France's 105 Motion to Dismiss Complaint for insufficient service of process shall be granted unless Plaintiffs properly effect service on Ceva France within 60 days of today's Order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 01/26/2016. (CCL)
|
October 7, 2015 |
Filing
109
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 , 59 Motion to Dismiss Complaint; granting 28 , 62 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 10/07/2015. (CGC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: MERIAL INC, et al v. CEVA SANTE ANIMALE SA, et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: MERIAL INC |
Represented By: |
J Patrick Elsevier |
Represented By: |
MATTHEW WOLFF HOWELL |
Represented By: |
Judy de Leon Jarecki Black |
Represented By: |
Jason Demian Rosenberg |
Represented By: |
Frank G Smith, III |
Represented By: |
EDWARD D TOLLEY |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: MERIAL SAS |
Represented By: |
J Patrick Elsevier |
Represented By: |
MATTHEW WOLFF HOWELL |
Represented By: |
Judy de Leon Jarecki Black |
Represented By: |
Jason Demian Rosenberg |
Represented By: |
Frank G Smith, III |
Represented By: |
EDWARD D TOLLEY |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: CEVA SANTE ANIMALE SA |
Represented By: |
CHARLES A BROWN |
Represented By: |
WILLIAM G JAMES |
Represented By: |
ROBERT C KHAYAT, JR |
Represented By: |
IRA J LEVY |
Represented By: |
JEFFREY A SIMES |
Represented By: |
JOHN COY STULL |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: HORIZON VALLEY GENERICS INC |
Represented By: |
CHARLES A BROWN |
Represented By: |
WILLIAM G JAMES |
Represented By: |
ROBERT C KHAYAT, JR |
Represented By: |
IRA J LEVY |
Represented By: |
JEFFREY A SIMES |
Represented By: |
JOHN COY STULL |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: TRUE SCIENCE HOLDINGS, LLC |
Represented By: |
Susan A. Cahoon |
Represented By: |
RICHARD CHARLES HENN, JR |
Represented By: |
ROBERT P K MOONEY |
Represented By: |
CHARLES ADAM PANNELL, III |
Represented By: |
SHIVEH R ROE |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: TRURX LLC |
Represented By: |
Susan A. Cahoon |
Represented By: |
RICHARD CHARLES HENN, JR |
Represented By: |
ROBERT P K MOONEY |
Represented By: |
CHARLES ADAM PANNELL, III |
Represented By: |
SHIVEH R ROE |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?