SMART v. SLEEP MEDICINE ASSOCIATES OF ATHENS INC et al
Plaintiff: EDWARD G SMART
Defendant: ATHENA MEDICAL CLINIC AND SLEEP MEDICINE ASSOCIATES, DOCTOR DEEPAK K DAS and SLEEP MEDICINE ASSOCIATES OF ATHENS INC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00089
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Athens Office
County: Clarke
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Filing 16 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #15 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery in this case is hereby STAYED pending this Court's resolution of #6 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 8/23/2018. (ssh)
August 16, 2018 Filing 15 JOINT MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Defs' Motion to Dismiss by DEEPAK K DAS, SLEEP MEDICINE ASSOCIATES OF ATHENS INC filed by Leslie Evan Cline.(Cline, Leslie)
August 3, 2018 Filing 14 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/4/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 8/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(lap)
August 3, 2018 Filing 13 ***DISREGARD - REFILED AT TAB 14***RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/4/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 8/3/2018. (lap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2018: #1 Required Form) (lap). Modified on 8/3/2018 (ggs).
August 2, 2018 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DEEPAK K DAS, SLEEP MEDICINE ASSOCIATES OF ATHENS INC (Cline, Leslie)
August 2, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by DEEPAK K DAS, SLEEP MEDICINE ASSOCIATES OF ATHENS INC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by EDWARD G SMART.(Cline, Leslie)
August 2, 2018 ***DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR - CORPORATE DISCLOSURE FILED AT TAB 8*** Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #11 Answer to Complaint filed by SLEEP MEDICINE ASSOCIATES OF ATHENS INC, DEEPAK K DAS ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (ggs) Modified on 8/2/2018 (ggs).
July 26, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Subpoena Phone Records, filed by EDWARD G SMART.(ggs) Modified on 7/26/2018 to edit docket text. (ggs).
July 26, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by EDWARD G SMART re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (ggs)
July 23, 2018 REMARK: Party name corrected as to Defendant ATHENA MEDICAL CLINIC AND SLEEP MEDICINE ASSOCIATES. Name corrected to SLEEP MEDICINE ASSOCIATES OF ATHENS INC d/b/a ATHENA MEDICAL CLINIC. (ggs)
July 23, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #7 Memorandum in Support filed by ATHENA MEDICAL CLINIC AND SLEEP MEDICINE ASSOCIATES, DEEPAK K DAS ); The Memorandum is Support of a motion should be pulled in as an attachment to the motion and not filed as a separate docket entry. NO NEED TO RE-FILE, for future reference only. (ggs)
July 20, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATHENA MEDICAL CLINIC AND SLEEP MEDICINE ASSOCIATES, DEEPAK K DAS (Cline, Leslie)
July 20, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by ATHENA MEDICAL CLINIC AND SLEEP MEDICINE ASSOCIATES, DEEPAK K DAS re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Cline, Leslie)
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ATHENA MEDICAL CLINIC AND SLEEP MEDICINE ASSOCIATES, DEEPAK K DAS filed by Leslie Evan Cline.(Cline, Leslie)
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leslie Evan Cline on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Leslie Evan Cline added to party ATHENA MEDICAL CLINIC AND SLEEP MEDICINE ASSOCIATES(pty:dft), Attorney Leslie Evan Cline added to party DEEPAK K DAS(pty:dft) (Cline, Leslie)
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EDWARD G SMART as to ATHENA MEDICAL CLINIC AND SLEEP MEDICINE ASSOCIATES, DEEPAK K DAS. (ggs)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ATHENA MEDICAL CLINIC AND SLEEP MEDICINE ASSOCIATES. (ggs)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DEEPAK K DAS. (ggs)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ATHENA MEDICAL CLINIC AND SLEEP MEDICINE ASSOCIATES, DEEPAK K DAS Filing Fee $ 400, Manual Receipt Number 41548, filed by EDWARD G SMART. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ggs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMART v. SLEEP MEDICINE ASSOCIATES OF ATHENS INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD G SMART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATHENA MEDICAL CLINIC AND SLEEP MEDICINE ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOCTOR DEEPAK K DAS
Represented By: Leslie Evan Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLEEP MEDICINE ASSOCIATES OF ATHENS INC
Represented By: Leslie Evan Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?