SAWYER et al v. COPART OF CONNECTICUT INC
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL SAWYER and DOUGLAS SAWYER
Defendant: COPART OF CONNECTICUT, INC. and COPART OF CONNECTICUT INC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00113
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Athens Office
County: Walton
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 4/5/2019. Dispositive motions due by 5/6/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 10/10/18. (lap)
September 20, 2018 REMARK: The parties have up through and including October 8, 2018 to submit the Proposed Scheduling/Discovery Order. (lap)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 9/24/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 8/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(lap)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by COPART OF CONNECTICUT INC.(Sanders, Valerie)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CRYSTAL SAWYER, DOUGLAS SAWYER (ggs)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 Jurisdictional Statement by COPART OF CONNECTICUT, INC. (Sanders, Valerie)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COPART OF CONNECTICUT, INC. identifying Corporate Parent COPART INC., Other Affiliate 31 W 120 WEST BARTLETT LLC, Other Affiliate COPART CATASTROPHE RESPONSE FLEET LLC, Other Affiliate COPART LAND HOLDINGS LLC, Other Affiliate CRASHED TOYS LLC, Other Affiliate CWH SERVICES LLC, Other Affiliate NAZARETH CHURCH ROAD LLC, Other Affiliate QCSA EQUIPMENT INC, Other Affiliate QCSA MINNESOTA LLC, Other Affiliate QCSA OF HAMMOND LLC, Other Affiliate QCSA OF INDIANA LLC, Other Affiliate QCSA/SPRINGFIELD INC, Other Affiliate QUAD CITY SALVAGE AUCTION INC, Other Affiliate SALVAGE WHOLESALE AUCTION NETWORK LLC, Other Affiliate STORAGE DIRECT LLC, Other Affiliate QCSA/MADISON LLC for COPART OF CONNECTICUT, INC.. (Sanders, Valerie)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against CRYSTAL SAWYER, DOUGLAS SAWYER Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2950774, $400 filed by COPART OF CONNECTICUT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Copies of Superior Court Pleadings), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanders, Valerie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAWYER et al v. COPART OF CONNECTICUT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL SAWYER
Represented By: David F. Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS SAWYER
Represented By: David F. Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COPART OF CONNECTICUT, INC.
Represented By: Valerie S. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COPART OF CONNECTICUT INC
Represented By: Valerie S. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?