DAVIS v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Plaintiff: JENNIFER DAVIS
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2018cv00144
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by JENNIFER DAVIS (ELLIS, HUDSON)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by December 28, 2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/17/2018 (CCL)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA filed by AARON EDWARD POHLMANN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Consent Order))(POHLMANN, AARON)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by December 14, 2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/03/2018 (CCL)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA filed by AARON EDWARD POHLMANN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Consent Order))(POHLMANN, AARON)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by AARON EDWARD POHLMANN on behalf of LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA Attorney AARON EDWARD POHLMANN added to party LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA(pty:dft) (POHLMANN, AARON)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ELIZABETH J BONDURANT on behalf of LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA Attorney ELIZABETH J BONDURANT added to party LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA(pty:dft) (BONDURANT, ELIZABETH)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENNIFER DAVIS as to LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (ELLIS, HUDSON)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (ggs)
November 6, 2018 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by Jennifer Davis ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE. (ggs)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3015875, $400 filed by Jennifer Davis (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(ELLIS, HUDSON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: ELIZABETH J BONDURANT
Represented By: AARON EDWARD POHLMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER DAVIS
Represented By: HUDSON T ELLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?