MICHAEL et al v. GRP MADISON LLC et al
Plaintiff: HILLARY A MICHAEL, WILLIAM T RUSSELL and JOSHUA R MICHAEL
Defendant: GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC, GRP MADISON LLC and GREENFUELS ENERGY LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00019
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GRP MADISON LLC identifying Corporate Parent GRP OPERATING LLC for GRP MADISON LLC. (SCHWARTZ, EDWIN)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC identifying Corporate Parent GREENFUELS ENERGY LLC, Other Affiliate GRP OPERATING LLC for GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC. (SCHWARTZ, EDWIN) Modified on 3/20/2019 to correct docket text. (ggs).
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GREENFUELS ENERGY LLC identifying Other Affiliate GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC, Other Affiliate GREENFUELS INTERNATIONAL LLC for GREENFUELS ENERGY LLC. (SCHWARTZ, EDWIN) Modified on 3/20/2019 to correct docket text.(ggs).
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC, GREENFUELS ENERGY LLC, GRP MADISON LLC (Horder, Richard)
March 19, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by GREENFUELS ENERGY LLC, GRP MADISON LLC, GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC ); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case, during the filing process in CM/ECF. It is not sufficient to simply have them listed on the document attached, they must also be entered into CM/ECF. During the filing process, the following user message appeared: "Corporate disclosure statement must be filed with ALL corporate parents and subsidiary corporations (other affiliate(s)) added during the filing of the document. Additionally, any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock must likewise be added. Failure to add the corporate parents and/or any publicly held corporation identified in your corporate disclosure statement will result in a request to re-file.". Corporate parents and/or subsidiary companies were listed on the document but were not added by the filer during the filing process. ADDITIONALLY, please file a separate corporate statement for each corporation, do not combine into one document. (ggs)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 4/29/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 3/18/2019. (ggs)
March 18, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #8 Answer to Complaint, filed by GREENFUELS ENERGY LLC, GRP MADISON LLC, GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (ggs)
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC, GREENFUELS ENERGY LLC, GRP MADISON LLC with Jury Demand.(Horder, Richard)Attorney Richard A. Horder added to party GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Richard A. Horder added to party GREENFUELS ENERGY LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Richard A. Horder added to party GRP MADISON LLC(pty:dft)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSHUA R MICHAEL, WILLIAM T RUSSELL, HILLARY A MICHAEL as to GREENFUELS ENERGY LLC. (SNIFF, TYLER)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSHUA R MICHAEL, WILLIAM T RUSSELL, HILLARY A MICHAEL as to GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC. (SNIFF, TYLER)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSHUA R MICHAEL, WILLIAM T RUSSELL, HILLARY A MICHAEL as to GRP MADISON LLC. (SNIFF, TYLER)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GRP MADISON LLC. (ggs)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GREENFUELS ENERGY LLC. (ggs)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC. (ggs)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-3090240, $400 filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Notice of Intent to Sue Letter, #3 Summons Summons to GRP Madison, LLC, #4 Summons Summons to Georgia Renewable Power, LLC, #5 Summons Summons to GreenFuels Energy, LLC)(SNIFF, TYLER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MICHAEL et al v. GRP MADISON LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC
Represented By: EDWIN SCHWARTZ
Represented By: Richard A. Horder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRP MADISON LLC
Represented By: EDWIN SCHWARTZ
Represented By: Richard A. Horder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENFUELS ENERGY LLC
Represented By: EDWIN SCHWARTZ
Represented By: Richard A. Horder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HILLARY A MICHAEL
Represented By: TYLER JOSEPH SNIFF
Represented By: DONALD D J STACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM T RUSSELL
Represented By: TYLER JOSEPH SNIFF
Represented By: DONALD D J STACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA R MICHAEL
Represented By: TYLER JOSEPH SNIFF
Represented By: DONALD D J STACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?