LAMMEY v. SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION

Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN LAMMEY
Defendant: SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
Case Number: 3:2019cv00048
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alicia Ann Timm on behalf of SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION Attorney Alicia Ann Timm added to party SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION(pty:dft) (Timm, Alicia)
June 26, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #26 Notice (Other) filed by SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION ); Joint entries of attorney appearance are not permitted. Only the attorney whose CM/ECF user name and password used to log into the system will be added to the case. Additionally, the wrong event was used, the correct event is "Notice of Attorney Appearance." NO NEED TO REFILE the Notice of Appearance for Douglas "Lee" Clayton. A Notice of Attorney Appearance must be filed for Alicia A. Timm only. (ggs)
June 26, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE Joint Notice of Entry of Appearance of Counsel of Douglas Lee Clayton and Alicia A. Timm by SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION (CLAYTON, DOUGLAS)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by RICHARD LOMUSCIO (nop)
June 24, 2019 Filing 24 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3194575, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(LOMUSCIO, RICHARD)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by MAURA C SMITH (nop)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JEFFREY M BEYER (nop)
June 11, 2019 Filing 21 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3183877, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(SMITH, MAURA)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by BROOKS H LEONARD (nop)
June 11, 2019 Filing 19 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3183862, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(BEYER, JEFFREY)
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3183809, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(LEONARD, BROOKS)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by BRIAN E O'DONNELL (nop)
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3183791, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(O'DONNELL, BRIAN)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #13 Motion for Withdrawal as Attorney for Plaintiff Christian Lammey. Attorney JONATHAN K TYCKO terminated. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 6/6/19. (acs)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Extending The Time Within Which Defendant May Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint re #1 Complaint, by SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION (CLAYTON, DOUGLAS)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CHRISTIAN LAMMEY filed by ANDREA R GOLD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(GOLD, ANDREA)
June 4, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #12 Acknowledgment of Service filed by CHRISTIAN LAMMEY ); Wrong event used, the correct event is "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED" - No need to refile, docket entry corrected by case manager. (ggs)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION, filed by CHRISTIAN LAMMEY. (SEGUI, HARPER) Modified on 6/4/2019 to correct event (ggs).
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by HASSAN A ZAVAREEI, ANDREA R GOLD (Attachments: #1 Signed PHV Petition) (nop)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CHRISTIAN LAMMEY Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3170284, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(GOLD, ANDREA)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE by CHRISTIAN LAMMEY Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-3170274, $100 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Zavareei, Hassan)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by ADAM A EDWARDS (nop)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Georgia Attorney Admission Fee Met by RACHEL SOFFIN (nop)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by LISA A WHITE (nop)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by GREG FREDERICK COLEMAN (ans)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by LISA A WHITE (ans)
May 14, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL LISA A WHITE - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (ggs)
May 13, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL HASSAN A ZAVAREEI, ANDREA GOLD, GREGORY F COLEMAN, RACHEL SOFFIN, ADAM A EDWARDS, DANIEL K BRYSON, JONATHAN K TYCKO - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (ggs)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CHRISTIAN LAMMEY (ggs)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION. (ggs)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3158406, $400 filed by CHRISTIAN LAMMEY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statutory Notice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(SEGUI, HARPER) Modified on 5/13/2019 to edit docket text. (ggs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAMMEY v. SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN LAMMEY
Represented By: RACHEL SOFFIN
Represented By: HARPER T SEGUI
Represented By: GREGORY F COLEMAN
Represented By: JONATHAN K TYCKO
Represented By: HASSAN A ZAVAREEI
Represented By: DANIEL K BRYSON
Represented By: ADAM A EDWARDS
Represented By: ANDREA GOLD
Represented By: ANDREA R GOLD
Represented By: GREG FREDERICK COLEMAN
Represented By: LISA A WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
Represented By: JEFFREY M BEYER
Represented By: Alicia Ann Timm
Represented By: DOUGLAS LEE CLAYTON
Represented By: MAURA C SMITH
Represented By: RICHARD LOMUSCIO
Represented By: BRIAN E O'DONNELL
Represented By: BROOKS H LEONARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?