Mays v. City of Union Point et al
Plaintiff: JAVONEE MAYS
Defendant: CITY OF UNION POINT GEORGIA, JOHN DOE, ROBERT CASH, HARVEY STEWART and KEVIN JOSEPH MALLOY
Case Number: 3:2019cv00084
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Pursuant to Local Rule 6.1 Extending Time by ROBERT CASH, CITY OF UNION POINT GEORGIA, JOHN DOE, KEVIN JOSEPH MALLOY, HARVEY STEWART (CUNNINGHAM, PEARSON)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAVONEE MAYS as to HARVEY STEWART. (WINDHAM, BEN) Modified on 11/18/2019 to correct docket entry to reflect defendant served.(ggs).
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to CITY OF UNION POINT GEORGIA. (ggs)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to KEVIN JOSEPH MALLOY. (ggs)
November 11, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #5 Notice (Other - Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement) filed by JAVONEE MAYS ); Wrong event used - No need to refile, the correct event is "CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT". Additionally, non-corporate parties are not required to file a corporate disclosure statement. (ggs)
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by JAVONEE MAYS (WINDHAM, BEN)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JAVONEE MAYS (ggs)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HARVEY STEWART. (ggs)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ROBERT CASH. (ggs)
October 8, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by Javonee Mays ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE, docket corrected by case manager. (ggs)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3282958, $400 filed by Javonee Mays (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(WINDHAM, BEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. City of Union Point et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF UNION POINT GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT CASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARVEY STEWART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN JOSEPH MALLOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAVONEE MAYS
Represented By: BEN F WINDHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?