CHIADO v. LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Plaintiff: SANDRA CHIADO
Defendant: LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Case Number: 3:2019cv00093
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Notice of Settlement filed by SANDRA CHIADO ); Wrong event used, the correct event is "STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL" - No need to refile, docket entry corrected by case manager and case terminated. (ggs)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULTION OF DISMISSAL by SANDRA CHIADO (CATES, PATRICK) Modified on 12/9/2019 (ggs).
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 12/5/2019. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 11/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(lap)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON identifying Corporate Parent LINCOLN NATIONAL CORPORATION, Corporate Parent The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company for LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON. (CLINARD, FORREST)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT(S) Civil Cover Sheet by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON re #1 Notice of Removal, (CLINARD, FORREST)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON (ggs)
October 31, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE. (ggs)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Sandra Chiado Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3303054, $400 filed by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON (Attachments: #1 Removal Documents Process, complaint)(CLINARD, FORREST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHIADO v. LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Represented By: FORREST K CLINARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA CHIADO
Represented By: PATRICK BOYD CATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?