JERNIGAN v. PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC
Plaintiff: CAROLYN JERNIGAN
Defendant: PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC and PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC doing business as PIZZA HUT
Case Number: 3:2019cv00108
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney SUNNITA BLOUNT terminated Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 1/21/2020 (mdb)
January 17, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #13 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by CAROLYN JERNIGAN ); Notice to Counsel LATOYA A. HUTCHINSON - Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER. (ggs)
January 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LATOYA A HUTCHINSON on behalf of CAROLYN JERNIGAN Attorney LATOYA A HUTCHINSON added to party CAROLYN JERNIGAN(pty:pla) (HUTCHINSON, LATOYA)
January 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CAROLYN JERNIGAN filed by SUNNITA BLOUNT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Motion to Withdraw)(BLOUNT, SUNNITA)
January 15, 2020 Filing 11 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(d)(3), Defendant has until February 18, 2020 to answer Plaintiff's complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 1/15/2020. (mdb)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CAROLYN JERNIGAN. as to All Defendants (BLOUNT, SUNNITA)
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC filed by Mary Anne Ackourey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Packet and Receipt, #2 Exhibit B - December 23, 2019 Email, #3 Exhibit C - January 10, 2020 Email, #4 Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Ackourey, Mary)
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by AMY COMBS BENDER on behalf of PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC Attorney AMY COMBS BENDER added to party PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC(pty:dft) (BENDER, AMY)
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary Anne Ackourey on behalf of PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC Attorney Mary Anne Ackourey added to party PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC(pty:dft) (Ackourey, Mary)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CAROLYN JERNIGAN as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Jernigan vs Palmetto proof of certified mailing return receipt for service)(BLOUNT, SUNNITA)
December 11, 2019 Filing Fee (IFP Denied) Paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3337878, $400 (BLOUNT, SUNNITA)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 12-3-19. (rcg)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by CAROLYN JERNIGAN issued at the direction of the Court. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/2/2019. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(ggs)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC. (ggs)
December 2, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint (IFP), filed by Carolyn Jernigan ); Notice to Counsel - SUNNITA BLOUNT Your contact information (address, telephone and fax numbers and possibly e-mail) in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER. (ggs)
December 2, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint (IFP), filed by Carolyn Jernigan ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE, corrections made by case manager. (ggs)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carolyn Jernigan filed by SUNNITA BLOUNT.(BLOUNT, SUNNITA)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against Palmetto Restaurant Operations, Inc. filed by Carolyn Jernigan (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff Letter to EEOC, #4 Exhibit EEOC Letter to Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit EEOC Right to Sue Letter, #6 Exhibit GA Department of Labor Letter)(BLOUNT, SUNNITA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JERNIGAN v. PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC
Represented By: Mary Anne Ackourey
Represented By: AMY COMBS BENDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PALMETTO RESTAURANT OPERATIONS INC doing business as PIZZA HUT
Represented By: Mary Anne Ackourey
Represented By: AMY COMBS BENDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLYN JERNIGAN
Represented By: SUNNITA BLOUNT
Represented By: LATOYA A HUTCHINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?