SKYLINE TRACE APARTMENTS LP v. NIBCO INC
Plaintiff: Skyline Trace Apartments, LP and SKYLINE TRACE APARTMENTS LP
Defendant: NIBCO INC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00062
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 1/25/2021. Dispositive motions due by 2/24/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 07/29/20. (ans)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by NIBCO INC re #8 MOTION to Remand (Henry, Christian)
July 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by SKYLINE TRACE APARTMENTS LP filed by PAUL EDWIN NYSTROM, III. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(NYSTROM, PAUL)
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 7/30/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 06/29/20. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order: Proposed Scheduling and Discover Order)(ans)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 Jurisdictional Statement by SKYLINE TRACE APARTMENTS LP (NYSTROM, PAUL)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SKYLINE TRACE APARTMENTS LP identifying other affiliate GATEWAY SKYLINE TRACE LLC and SKYLINE TRACE LIMITED PARTNER INVESTOR LLC. (NYSTROM, PAUL) Modified on 6/26/2020 to add other affiliates. (ggs).
June 22, 2020 REMARK: Attorney ANASTASIA ALLMON terminated. New counsel substituted in the State Court Action in place of Ms. Allmon. (ggs)
June 18, 2020 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL ANASTASIA ALLMON - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (nop)
June 4, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by NIBCO INC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. Plaintiff SKYLINE TRACE APARTMENTS LP, please file a Jurisdictional Statement immediately. (ggs)
June 4, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by NIBCO INC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Plaintiff SKYLINE TRACE APARTMENTS, LP please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (ggs)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to NIBCO INC (ggs)
June 4, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL ANASTASIA ALLMON - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. (ggs)
June 4, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by NIBCO INC ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE. (ggs)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Jurisdictional Statement by NIBCO INC (Henry, Christian)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NIBCO INC (Henry, Christian)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Skyline Trace Apartments, LP Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3480743, $400 filed by NIBCO INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Sheriff's Entry of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Answer, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - NIBCO's Discovery Requests to Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - P's Responses to NIBCO's Discovery Requests, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Motion to Withdraw - P, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Entry of Appearance - P, #8 Exhibit Joint Motion to Extend Discovery, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Order Extending Discovery)(Henry, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SKYLINE TRACE APARTMENTS LP v. NIBCO INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyline Trace Apartments, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SKYLINE TRACE APARTMENTS LP
Represented By: PAUL EDWIN NYSTROM, III
Represented By: CHARLES M FERGUSON, JR
Represented By: ANASTASIA ALLMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIBCO INC
Represented By: Christian Goodloe Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?